Peter Moses Gutierrez v. Amplify Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr., Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, East Meets West Excursions, Mike Owens, Michael Jensen, Patrick Mahoney, Jolynn Mahoney, Steven Rosansky, Gina Rosansky, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc., Steve Legere, Newport Surfrider, LLC, James Whelan, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Blue Pacific Fisheries, Ivar Southern, Linda Southern, Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc., San Pedro Bait Co., Donald C. Brockman, Heidi M. Jacques, Gregory Hexberg, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Endless Sun Surf School, Clint Carroll Surf School, Learn To Surf LLC, Goff Tours, Zacks By The Beach, Ziggys On Main, Bobs Lemonade, Main St. Eyewear & Boutique, Coachs Mediterranean Grill & Bar, Cold Stone Creamery, Bradley Bitton d/b/a Brads Live Local Lobster, Kirk Schoonover, Joshua Tucker, Josh Hernandez, John Crowe, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Tyler Wayman, Ketcham Tackle LLC and N.S.T., a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, MICHAELANGELO SAINT THOMAS
Defendant: Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company, LLC, Doe Corps, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, Dordellas Finance Corp., Capetanissa Maritime Corporation of Liberia, MSC Danit, Beta Operating Company, LLC a Delaware, limited liability company (consolidated complaint #197) doing business as Beta Offshore, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd., COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd. and M/V MSC DANIT
Petitioner: Christopher Hamm, Randal Klein and Todd Snyder
Consolidated Plaintiff: Beyond Business Incorporated d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle, Charlie's Gyros, Inc., Jennifer Taylor, Greg Taylor and Beyond Business Incorporated doing business as Big Fish Bait and Tackle
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Amplify Energy Corp. and SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY
Cross Defendant: Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Cosco Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation and Dordellas Finance Corporation
3Rd Party Defendant: V. Ships Greece Ltd., V.Ships Greece Ltd., Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor doing business as Marine Exchange of Southern California, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Roes, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., M/V Beijing, Roes 1-5, Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd, Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd and Roes 6-10
Special Master: Daniel Garrie, James L. Smith and Bradley O'Brien
Intervenor Plaintiff: Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., Ascot Underwriting Inc., QBE European Co Operations (Lloyds's Syndicate 1036), NAVIGATORS UNDERWRITING AGENCY LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1221), MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), AEGIS LONDON (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1225), TALBOT UNDERWRITING LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1183), ANTARES SYNDICATE 1274 (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1274), AXIS CORPORATE CAPITAL UK LTD (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1686), MUNICH RE SYNDICATE LIMITED (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 0457), THE CHAUCER GROUP (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1084), TRAVELERS SYNDICATE MANAGEMENT LTD (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 5000) and HCC International Insurance Co. PLC
Intervenor Defendant: Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Mediterranean Shipping Company, S.A., DOES 1-5, COSTAMARE SHIPPING CO., S.A., DOES 6-10 and Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California
Cross Claimant: Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor
Case Number: 8:2021cv01628
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 754 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document, #753 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 753 Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Pending Motions as Moot re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #469 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Third-Party Complaint #468 (Orsini, Kevin)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 752 Notice OF [PROPOSED] PLANS OF DISTRIBUTION FOR THE FISHER CLASS, PROPERTY CLASS, AND WATERFRONT TOURISM CLASS filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Plan of Distribution Fishers, #2 Exhibit 2 - [Proposed] Plan of Distribution Real Property, #3 Exhibit 3 - [Proposed] Plan of Distribution Waterfront Tourism)(Hazam, Lexi)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 751 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT by Judge David O. Carter, re Order #750 . Final Approval Hearing 9/14/23. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #739 Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 749 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: STATUS CONFERENCE; MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL OF PRELIMINARY CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND DIRECTION OF NOTICE #739 . The Court approves the parties Preliminary Class Action Settlement as proposed #739 . The Courts written order to issue. Status Conference is continued to September 14, 2023 at 7:30 AM. Status Conference set for 9/14/2023 at 07:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER GRANTING SUBROGATED INSURERS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF FROM INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER, RULE I, FOR JUNE 12, 2023 STATUS CONFERENCE; MEMORANDUM AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES #747 by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. J. Clifton Hall, attorney for Intervenors Subrogated Insurers, is relieved from Rule I of this Court's Standing Order (see ECF 11, at 2) for purposes of the June 12, 2023 Status Conference (see ECF 725) due to a previously scheduled business trip. 2. Brooke L. Bentley, Mr. Hall's co-counsel, shall appear on Mr. Hall's behalf for the June 12, 2023 Status Conference. (lom)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 747 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from FROM INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER, RULE I, FOR JUNE 12, 2023 STATUS CONFERENCE re Order, Set/Reset Hearing #740 filed by Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Hall, James)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: GRANTING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF FROM INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER (ECF 11), RULE I, FOR THE JUNE 12, 2023 STATUS CONFERENCE #743 . David A. Tong, Mr. Peacocks Partner, shall appear on Mr. Peacocks behalf for the June 12, 2023 Status Conference. (twdb)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #744 Cosco Shipping Lines Co. LTD.'S Ex Parte Application for Relief From Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter, Rule I, For June 12, 2023 Status Conference. Philip R. Lempriere, Mr. Politis co-counsel, shall appear on Mr. Politis behalf for the June 12, 2023 Status Conference. (twdb)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 744 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Initial Standing Order re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 filed by Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas S. Politis, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Politis, Nicholas)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 743 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER, RULE I, FOR JUNE 12, 2023 STATUS CONFERENCE re Order, Set/Reset Hearing #740 filed by Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 742 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Hazam, Lexi)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 741 Notice NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 1715 filed by Defendants/Third-Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF OMID H. NASAB REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH THE CLASS ACTION FAIRNESS ACT, 28 U.S.C. 1715, #2 Exhibit A)(Nasab, Omid)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue June 5, 2023 Status Conference to June 12, 2023 #733 . ( Status Conference continued to 6/12/2023 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 739 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Preliminary Class Action Settlement and Direction of Notice filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. Motion set for hearing on 6/12/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lexi J. Hazam ISO Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit 1 to Hazam Declaration - Settlement Agreement and Exhibits (Proposed Orders and Judgment), #3 Exhibit 2 to Hazam Declaration - Apr. 24, 2023 Tr. of Hearing re Amplify Settlement Final Approval, #4 Declaration of Layn R. Phillips ISO Preliminary Approval, #5 Declaration of Gina Intrepido-Bowden and Exhibits (Notice Plan), #6 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement) (Hazam, Lexi)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 738 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO AMPLIFY ENERGY CORPORATION, BETA OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, AND SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY by Judge David O. Carter. Related to: Judgment #734 . Judgment is hereby entered in this case as to Plaintiffs and the Settlement Classes claims in accordance with the Courts April 24, 2023, Final Approval Order as to all claims against Amplify in this Action. Plaintiffs and the Settlement Classes claims against Amplify are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 737 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES by Judge David O. Carter. The parties as listed below are hereby ordered to process and promptly make payment on the Special Masters invoices (attached herein). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 736 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/24/2023 at 8:37 a.m. re Transcript #735 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dhs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 735 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/24/2023 at 8:37 a.m. ****Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE HINO-SPAAN at: WEBSITE www.debbiehinospaan.com; E-mail, dhinospaan@yahoo.com before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Additional formats of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available to be purchased at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.** Redaction Request due 5/30/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2023. (dhs)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 734 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO AMPLIFY ENERGY CORPORATION, BETA OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, AND SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 733 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from June 5, 2023 to June 12, 2023 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Larson, Stephen)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 732 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher William Keegan counsel for Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Katherine Epstein is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 731 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran for Court Reporter. Court will contact Maxwell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Hazam, Lexi)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 730 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Reporter. Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keegan, Christopher)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 729 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Third Party Defendant COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Robert Zwillich at rzwillich@cravath.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Orsini, Kevin)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER Granting Final Approval of Proposed Settlement by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 727 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #664 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Approval of Plaintiffs' Plans of Distribution. Accordingly, the Court finds that the Fisher, Property, and Waterfront Tourism Plans are fair and reasonable and meet the standard for approval under Rule 23(e). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #665 Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards Under Rule 23(H). 1. Class Counsel is awarded 25 percent of the total settlement amount, or $12.5 million, in attorneys fees and $$1,291,067.91 in costs. 2. Each of the seventeen Class Representatives is awarded $10,000 in service awards. 3. The Court finds that these amounts are warranted and reasonable for the reasons set forth in the moving papers before the Court, at the Final Approval Hearing, and the reasons stated in this Order. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 725 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report on or before May 22, 2023 at 12:00 pm, regarding any issues that may remain outstanding in this case or any related proceedings before this Court. The Court SCHEDULES a status conference on June 5, 2023 at 8:30 AM to discuss any remaining issues. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. ( Status Conference set for 6/5/2023 AT 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 724 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: SETTLEMENT; MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFFS #665 ; MOTION FOR ORDER FOR GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PLAINTIFFS' PLANS OF DISTRIBUTION #664 . The Court approves the parties class action settlement agreement as proposed. The Courts written order to issue. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (twdb)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 723 Notice of Re-Allocation of Special Master Panel Fees filed by Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). (Hall, James)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 721 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher William Keegan counsel for Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Alanna R. Horan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 722 Stipulated ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. All other motions in the Limitation Action and the Gutierrez Action are hereby withdrawn as moot by the parties and no further action on those motions is required. These motions are: a. Limitation Action: Dkt. Nos. 210, 212, 260-268, 269-272, 280, 281, 285, 310-311, 313-315, 317, 320, 324, 327, 331, 341-342, 350, 360, and 377. b. Guiterrez: Dkt. Nos. 228-229, 310, 317, 386, 453-55, 464-465, 492-497, 513, 514, 541, 711, and 716. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 720 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: PAYMENT OF SPECIAL MASTERS' FEES. The Court, having considered the report by the Special Masters Panel attached herein, ORDERS all parties to complete payment of all billed fees or submit of specific objections thereto, on or before April 24, 2023. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 719 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Intervenors' Original Complaint #711 filed by Intervenor Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California. (Cicala, Conte)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 718 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: MOTION TO STRIKE SUPPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DR. KRISHNAMURTHY by Special Master. (twdb)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #285 filed by Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #284 filed by Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Cosco Beijing, COSCO Beijing. CCA # 22-55625 and 22-55629. The parties' stipulated motion to dismiss is granted. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). All parties shall bear their own costs and fees on appeal. This order constitutes the mandate of the court.(mat)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 716 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence re Marine Exchange during Limitation Trial filed by Intervenor Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California. Motion set for hearing on 4/17/2023 at 08:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Cicala, Conte)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 715 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Intervenors' Original Complaint #711 filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Ascot Underwriting Inc., MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), Intervenor Defendant Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Genuine Disputes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Attorney James Clifton Hall, III added to party MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000)(pty:intvp))(Hall, James)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 714 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corporation, M/V BEIJING, MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L., V. Ships Greece Ltd. filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Amplify Energy Corp..(Keegan, Christopher)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 713 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Angel Tang Nakamura counsel for Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Third Party Defendants MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L.. Joseph P. Klemme is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., MSC Danit, in rem, Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.r.L., MSC Shipmanagement Ltd.. (Nakamura, Angel)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 712 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT by Special Master. (twdb)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 711 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Intervenors' Original Complaint filed by Intervenor Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California. Motion set for hearing on 4/17/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, #2 Declaration of James Kipling Louttit, #3 Proposed Judgment) (Cicala, Conte)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 710 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES (January 2023). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil E. Giles to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Ascot Underwriting Inc., MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), Intervenor Defendant Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London An #706 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER by District Judge David O. Cater GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany L. Sukiennik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Pai #705 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 707 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER DISMISSING as moot MOTION to Dismiss #302 , #304 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 706 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil E. Giles to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Ascot Underwriting Inc., MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), Intervenor Defendant Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399 (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/16/2023, Receipt No. 34967595) filed by Plaintiff-Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 705 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brittany L. Sukiennik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34965809) filed by Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Application NY, #2 Proposed Order Application Pro Hac Vice Brittany L. Sukiennik) (Peacock, Albert)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 704 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES. (twdb)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Witness List filed by Defendant-In-Intervention Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California.. (Cicala, Conte)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 702 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: DEFINITION OF ISSUES TO BE ADDRESED IN LIMITATION ACTION TRIAL by Special Master. (twdb)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 701 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: INSPECTION OF MSC SIMULATOR AND SAN PEDRO BAY SIMULATION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 700 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Plaintiffs' Plans of Distribution #664 filed by Plaintiff Banzai Surf Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Amended Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Plaintiffs' Plans of Distribution)(Hazam, Lexi)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 699 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #665 , Expenses, and Service Awards filed by Plaintiff Banzai Surf Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Amended Proposed] Order Granting Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards)(Hazam, Lexi)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 698 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #666 filed by Plaintiff Banzai Surf Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Lexi J. Hazam in Support of Motions for Approval, #2 Supplemental Declaration of Gretchen Eoff re Class Notice Plan Implementation and Settlement Admin. Status, #3 [Amended Proposed] Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement)(Hazam, Lexi)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 697 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER - APONTES DEPOSITIONS. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURHTER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint,, #453 JURY DEMAND RESERVED filed by Defendant-in-Intervention Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor, Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California.(Cicala, Conte)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ANSWER to Amended Third-Party Complaint,, #455 JURY DEMAND RESERVED filed by Third Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor, Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California.(Attorney Conte C Cicala added to party Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California(pty:intvd))(Cicala, Conte)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 694 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/6/2023 VOL 2 re Transcript #693 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (aa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 693 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/6/2023 VOL 2. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2023. (aa)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER CLARIFYING SCOPE OF LIMITATION ACT TRIAL by Judge David O. Carter (see attached for further details). (pj)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 691 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: APONTE DEPOSITIONS. (twdb)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 689 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Catherine R. Hodges at catherine.hodges@arnoldporter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Hughes, Jonathan)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 688 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Catherine R. Hodges at catherine.hodges@arnoldporter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Hughes, Jonathan)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 687 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Amanda Janks at ajanks@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Hazam, Lexi)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 686 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Amanda Janks at ajanks@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Hazam, Lexi)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 685 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Keegan, Christopher)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 684 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Reporter. Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keegan, Christopher)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 690 MINUTES OF Status Conference RE Case Administration held before Judge David O. Carter: The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Court hears arguments re case administration and claims. The Court's written order to issue. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker and Court Smart. (twdb)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 683 SPECIAL MASTERS' REASONED ORDER RE: INSPECTION OF FACILITIES by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 682 SPECIAL MASTERS' REASONED ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF POTENTIAL LIMITATION ACT TRIAL WITNESSES by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 681 SPECIAL MASTERS' REASONED ORDER RE: CLAWBACK OF MALHOTRA-PARLATO EMAIL by Judge David O. Carter. (twdb)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 680 SPECIAL MASTERS' REASONED ORDER RE: AMPLIFY CHALLENGE TO CLAWBACK OF BEIJING PARTIES' STATEMENT OF FACTS by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENTS FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING #298 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #466 . For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Marine Exchanges Motions to Dismiss (Dkts. 298, 466) as to Amplifys Second Amended Complaint and as to the Subrogated Insurers Complaint in Intervention. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 678 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from FROM INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER, RULE I, FOR THE FEBRUARY 6, 2023, STATUS CONFERENCE re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #629 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Aitken, Darren)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 677 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/3rd Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #676 served on January 27, 2023. (Keegan, Christopher)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 676 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Amplifys Memorandum in Response to Scope of Limitation Trial under seal #675 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Amplifys Memorandum in Response to Scope of Limitation Trial, #2 Exhibit 23)(Keegan, Christopher)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 675 APPLICATION to file document Amplifys Memorandum in Response to Scope of Limitation Trial under seal filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Amplifys Memorandum in Response to Scope of Limitation Trial, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Proposed Order Granting Amplifys Application For Leave To File Under Seal Its Memorandum In Response To Scope Of Limitation TriaL, #4 Proposed Order Regarding Scope of Limitation Trial)(Keegan, Christopher)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 674 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated Response Brief on the Scope of the Limitation Trial (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Scope of Limitation Trial)(Andrews, Patrick)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 673 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT Subrogated Insurers Responsive Brief On The Scope And Procedure Of The April 24, 2023 (Phase I) Limitation Trial filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs Ascot Underwriting Inc., MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), Intervenor Defendant Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Patrick O'Leary In Support Of Subrogated Insurers' Responsive Brief On The Scope And Procedure Of The April 24, 2023 Limitation Trial, #2 Proposed Order Approving Subrogated Insurers' Position On The Scope And Procedure Of The April 24, 2023 Limitation Trial)(Popham, Mitchell)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 672 BRIEF filed by Third-Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. Response Brief re Scope of Limitation Trial (Cicala, Conte)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 671 RESPONSE filed by Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. Response Brief re Scope of Trial (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Scope of Trial)(Politis, Nicholas)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 670 DISCLOSURE [Proposed] Order re Expert Disclosures filed by ThirdParty Defendant Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd (Politis, Nicholas)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 669 DECLARATION of Stephen G. Larson in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #665 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Plaintiffs' Plans of Distribution #664 and NOTICE of MOTION AND MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #666 filed by Plaintiff Banzai Surf Company, LLC. (Hazam, Lexi)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 668 DECLARATION of Wylie A. Aitken in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #665 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Plaintiffs' Plans of Distribution #664 and NOTICE of MOTION AND MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #666 filed by Plaintiff Banzai Surf Company, LLC. (Hazam, Lexi)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 667 DECLARATION of Lexi J. Hazam in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #665 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Plaintiffs' Plans of Distribution #664 and NOTICE of MOTION AND MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement #666 filed by Plaintiff Banzai Surf Company, LLC. (Hazam, Lexi)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 666 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #665 filed by Plaintiffs Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Final Approval of Proposed Settlement)(Hazam, Lexi)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 665 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards Under Rule 23(H)) (Hazam, Lexi)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 664 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Plaintiffs' Plans of Distribution filed by plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. Motion set for hearing on 4/24/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hazam, Lexi)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 663 DECLARATION of Kevin J. Orsini in support of APPLICATION to file document Amplify's Memorandum Regarding Scope of Limitation Trial under seal #648 DECLARATION OF KEVIN J. ORSINI IN SUPPORT OF AMPLIFY'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS MEMORANDUM REGARDING SCOPE OF LIMITATION TRIAL filed by Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V Beijing, V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Orsini, Kevin)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 662 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: REQUESTED CLASS PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED TO VESSEL INTERESTS AND VESSEL INTERESTS REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER IN REGARD THERETO. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 661 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: AMPLIFY, CLASS PLAINTIFFS AND SUBROGATED INSURERS OBJECTION TO BEIJING CLAWBACK. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 660 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: INSPECTION OF FACILITIES. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 659 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: DEPOSITION OF POTENTIAL LIMITATION ACT TRIAL WITNESSES. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 658 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: CLAWBACK OF MALHOTRA-PARLATO EMAIL. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 657 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: CLAWBACK OF KONTES-SARIKAVAZIS CHAT. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 656 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: CLAWBACK OF BEIJING ENTITIES' MAJOR INCIDENTS POLICY. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 655 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: CLAWBACK OF BEIJING ENTITIES' INCIDENT REVIEWS. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 654 DECLARATION of Jonathan W. Hughes re APPLICATION to file document Amplify's Memorandum Regarding Scope of Limitation Trial under seal #648 - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN W. HUGHES IN SUPPORT OF AMPLIFYS APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS MEMORANDUM REGARDING SCOPE OF LIMITATION TRIAL filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited. (Hughes, Jonathan)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 653 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 652 DECLARATION of GRETCHEN EOFF re Order on Motion for Order #599 DECLARATION OF GRETCHEN EOFF REGARDING CLASS NOTICE PLAN IMPLEMENTATION filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Dunlavey, Wilson)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 651 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, served on 1/18/2023. (Keegan, Christopher)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 650 BRIEF filed by Third-Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. Re Scope of Limitation Trial (Cicala, Conte)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 649 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Amplify's Memorandum Regarding Scope of Limitation Trial under seal #648 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Keegan, Christopher)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 648 APPLICATION to file document Amplify's Memorandum Regarding Scope of Limitation Trial under seal filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, ThirdParty Plaintiff Beta Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 647 BRIEF filed by Class Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. on the Scope of the Limitation Trial (Andrews, Patrick)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 646 BRIEF filed by Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). Subrogated Insurers' Brief On The Scope And Procedure Of The April 24, 2023 Limitation Trial (Popham, Mitchell)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 645 BRIEF filed by Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. on Scope of Limitation Trial (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Scope of Limitation Act Trial)(Politis, Nicholas)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 644 Text Only Entry Order GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Molly J. Henry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. #638 , First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andreas Moffett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., Third Party Defendant Mediterranean Shipping #640 and APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alanna R. Horan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY #641 by Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #642 EX PARTE APPLICATION instructing Deposition of Yevgen Yakubov to Proceed in the United States Upon Disembarkation. See Order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (ts)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 642 Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief Order Instructing Deposition of Yevgen Yakubov To Proceed in the United States Upon Disembarkation AEGIS LONDON (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1225), ANTARES SYNDICATE 1274 (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1274), AXIS CORPORATE CAPITAL UK LTD (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1686), Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, HCC International Insurance Co. PLC, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), MUNICH RE SYNDICATE LIMITED (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 0457), Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., NAVIGATORS UNDERWRITING AGENCY LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1221), QBE European Co Operations (Lloyds's Syndicate 1036), TALBOT UNDERWRITING LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1183), THE CHAUCER GROUP (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1084), TRAVELERS SYNDICATE MANAGEMENT LTD (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 5000). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party AEGIS LONDON (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1225)(pty:intvp), Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party ANTARES SYNDICATE 1274 (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1274)(pty:intvp), Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party AXIS CORPORATE CAPITAL UK LTD (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1686)(pty:intvp), Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party HCC International Insurance Co. PLC(pty:intvp), Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000)(pty:intvp), Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party MUNICH RE SYNDICATE LIMITED (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 0457)(pty:intvp), Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party NAVIGATORS UNDERWRITING AGENCY LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1221)(pty:intvp), Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party QBE European Co Operations (Lloyds's Syndicate 1036)(pty:intvp), Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party TALBOT UNDERWRITING LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1183)(pty:intvp), Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party THE CHAUCER GROUP (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 1084)(pty:intvp), Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch added to party TRAVELERS SYNDICATE MANAGEMENT LTD (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 5000)(pty:intvp)) (Bentch, Jeffrey)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 641 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alanna R. Horan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34623151) filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Holscher, Mark)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 640 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andreas Moffett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., ThirdParty Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company S A (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34614125) filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from DC Bar) (Nakamura, Angel)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 639 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: SUPERVISORY CONTROL AND DATA ACQUISITION (SCADA) by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 638 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Molly J. Henry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34590710) filed by Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re PHV Application of Henry) (Politis, Nicholas)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter granting APPLICATIONS of Non-Resident Attorney Emily Orler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l. #584 , Non-Resident Attorney Herbert H. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. #609 , and Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Klemme to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., ThirdParty Defendant Mediterranean Shipping C #634 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 636 SPECIAL MASTERS' REASONED ORDER RE: CLASS PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITIONS by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 634 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph Klemme to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., ThirdParty Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company S A (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34567926) filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from New York Bar, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company S A (pty:3pd)) (Nakamura, Angel)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 635 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES. (twdb)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 633 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE DEPOSITIONS OF AMPLIFY'S OUTSIDE DIRECTORS by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 632 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: JANUARY 17, 2023 HEARING, by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 631 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V. Ships Greece Ltd., Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V Beijing, V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Orsini, Kevin)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER Amending the Case Schedule by Judge David O. Carter. Fact Depositions 1/20/23; Expert Reports Due 2/3/23; Expert Rebuttal Reports Due 3/3/23; Close of Expert Discovery 3/24/23 (no change); Trial 4/24/23 (no change). (twdb)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 629 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: STATUS CONFERENCE. The Court SETS a Status Conference for February 6, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for all parties are required to appear. The Court additionally ORDERS the parties to provide a joint status report to the Special Masters Panel on or before January 24, 2023. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. ( Status Report due by 1/24/2023.) (twdb)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 628 Text Only Order GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Noah Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. #627 by Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 627 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Noah Jarrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34514183) filed by Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Politis, Nicholas)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 625 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Cross-Claimant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Cicala, Conte)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 624 Letter Motion requesting that the Court waive the requirement of Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 filed by Movants Christopher Hamm, Randal Klein, Todd Snyder (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Pro Hac Vice Application of Gregory Laufer, #2 Exhibit B - [Proposed] Pro Hac Vice Application of Daniel Kramer, #3 Proposed Order)(Haag, Melinda) Modified on 12/20/2022 (twdb).
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 623 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Melinda L Haag on behalf of Movants Christopher Hamm, Randal Klein, Todd Snyder (Attorney Melinda L Haag added to party Christopher Hamm(pty:mov), Attorney Melinda L Haag added to party Randal Klein(pty:mov), Attorney Melinda L Haag added to party Todd Snyder(pty:mov))(Haag, Melinda)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nathaniel Edward Haas counsel for Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Adding Nathaniel E. Haas as counsel of record for Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Attorney Nathaniel Edward Haas added to party Amplify Energy Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel Edward Haas added to party Amplify Energy Corp.(pty:3pp), Attorney Nathaniel Edward Haas added to party Beta Operating Company, LLC(pty:3pp), Attorney Nathaniel Edward Haas added to party Beta Operating Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel Edward Haas added to party SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel Edward Haas added to party SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY(pty:3pp))(Haas, Nathaniel)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Notice OF [PROPOSED] PLANS OF DISTRIBUTION FOR THE FISHER CLASS, PROPERTY CLASS, AND WATERFRONT TOURISM CLASS filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Plan of Distribution Fishers, #2 Exhibit 2 - [Proposed] Plan of Distribution Real Property, #3 Exhibit 3 - [Proposed] Plan of Distribution Waterfront Tourism)(Hazam, Lexi)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 620 SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER RE: SEARCH OF JORGE LEON DOCUMENTS by Special Master(s) James Smith, Daniel Garrie and Bradley O'Brien. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 619 SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER RE: SHIPPING DEFENDANTS COMMON INTEREST AGREEMENTS by Special Master(s) James Smith, Daniel Garrie and Bradley O'Brien. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 618 SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER RE: PRESERVATION DEPOSITION NOTICES TO AMPLIFY by Special Master(s) James Smith, Daniel Garrie and Bradley O'Brien. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 617 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION by Special Master(s) James Smith, Daniel Garrie and Bradley O'Brien. See order for details. (lom)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 616 SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER RE: PERSONAL DEVICE OF KONSTANTINOS KONSTANTAKOPOULOS by Special Master(s) James Smith, Daniel Garrie and Bradley O'Brien. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 615 SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER RE: MOBILE DEVICE PRODUCTION by Special Master(s) James Smith, Daniel Garrie and Bradley O'Brien. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 614 SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER RE: CUSTODIAL SEARCH FOR DOCUMENTS CONCERNING STAFFING REDUCTION by Special Master(s) James Smith, Daniel Garrie and Bradley O'Brien. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 613 SPECIAL MASTERS ORDER RE: CLASS PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITIONS by Special Master(s) James Smith, Daniel Garrie and Bradley O'Brien. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 612 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: APEX DEPOSITIONS by Special Master(s) James Smith, Daniel Garrie and Bradley O'Brien. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 611 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: JOHN "JOCK" MAWSON DEPOSITION by Special Master(s) Daniel Garrie, James L. Smith, Bradley O'Brien. (lom)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 610 STATUS REPORT -December 15, 2022 Joint Status Report filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., Third Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 609 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Herbert H. Ray to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34482881) filed by Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Politis, Nicholas)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorneys Andrew D. Huynh #591 , Allison C. Tilden #592 , Benjamin Gruenstein #593 , Vanessa A. Lavely #594 , and Melissa A. Syring #602 to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V. Ships Greece Ltd. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 607 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #605 , Notice of Appearance #606 , Notice of Appearance #604 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 606 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jay Allen Sayles on behalf of Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (Attorney Jay Allen Sayles added to party COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (pty:dft))(Sayles, Jay)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 605 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Mahoney on behalf of Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (Attorney Michael Mahoney added to party COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (pty:dft))(Mahoney, Michael)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 604 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Philip R Lempriere on behalf of Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (Attorney Philip R Lempriere added to party COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (pty:dft))(Lempriere, Philip)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 603 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1715 filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 602 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa A. Syring to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V. Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34448689) filed by DEFENDANT Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit CA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 601 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) By Judge David O. Carter: RE MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Motion To Challenge Clawback By Dordellas Parties, And Application For Leave To Submit Documents For In Camera Review #530 . On November 21, 2022, the Special Master Panel issued an order granting the Dordellas Parties clawback request and ordered Amplify to return the email at issue to the Dordellas Parties. Accordingly, the Court DENIES AS MOOT Amplifys Motion to Challenge Clawback. (Dkt. #530 ). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 600 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company for Court Reporter. Court will contact Dianne Meek at dianne.meek@arnoldporter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Hughes, Jonathan)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #476 Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement. The following schedule is hereby ordered: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Regarding Non-Waiver of Lack Personal Jurisdiction or Other Rights or Defenses of Former CrewMembers #587 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 597 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V Beijing, V. Ships Greece Ltd. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Keith Kaplan at kkaplan@cravath.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Orsini, Kevin)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 596 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran for Court Reporter. Court will contact Maxwell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Hazam, Lexi)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 595 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Reporter. Court will contact Jessica Rodriguez at jessica.rodriguez@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keegan, Christopher)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 594 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Vanessa A. Lavely to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34430163) filed by DEFENDANT Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 593 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin Gruenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34430072) filed by DEFENDANT Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 592 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison C. Tilden to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34429930) filed by DEFENDANT Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 591 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew D. Huynh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V. Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34429872) filed by DEFENDANT Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert) Modified on 12/6/2022 (kdu).
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 626 MINUTES OF MOTION TO INTERVENE #421 ; MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION #386 ; MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #464 #465 ; MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AND COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION #466 #467 ; MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT #468 ; MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #469 ; MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #470 ; MOTION FOR ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND DIRECTION OF NOTICE UNDER RULE 23(E) #476 ; MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENORS' ORIGINAL COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION #496 ; MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENORS' ORIGINAL COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION #497 ; MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENOR PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION ECF (453) #492 ; MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENOR PLAINTIFFS' ORIGINAL COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #493 ; MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT ECF (454) #494 ; MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT ECF (455) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #495 Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter. The Court hears arguments. All motions are taken under submission. The Courts written order to issue. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (lom)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 590 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Thomas M Fedeli counsel for Intervenor Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California. Adding Thomas M. Fedeli as counsel of record for Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor dba Marine Exchange of Southern California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Cross-Claimant/Third-Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor dba Marine Exchange of Southern California. (Attorney Thomas M Fedeli added to party Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California(pty:intvd))(Fedeli, Thomas)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 589 SPECIAL MASTERS' CLARIFICATION ORDER OF SEARCHING PERSONAL DEVICES by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (rolm)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting Non-Resident Attorneys Danica B. Denny #571 , T. Patrick O'Leary #573 , J. Dwight LeBlanc III #572 , and Patrick J. McShane #569 to Appear Pro Hac Vice Vice on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Ascot Underwriting Inc., MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), Intervenor Defendant Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 587 STIPULATION for Order Regarding Non-Waiver of Lack Personal Jurisdiction or Other Rights or Defenses of Former Crewmembers filed by Former Crewmembers M/V MSC DANIT.(Attorney Marc R Greenberg added to party M/V MSC DANIT (pty:dft))(Greenberg, Marc)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to CORRECT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #489 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #342 #514 filed by Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). (Popham, Mitchell)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 585 Corrected NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to CORRECT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #343 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #344 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #342 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #490 #513 filed by Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). (Popham, Mitchell)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 584 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Emily Orler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-34412301) filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from DC Bar, #2 Proposed Order) (Nakamura, Angel)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 583 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER REQUESTING ATTENDANCE OF NTSB AND USCG AT MOTIONS HEARING. The Court REQUESTS representatives from the National Transportation Safety Board and U.S. Coast Guard to appear in Court on December 5, 2022, at 9:00 A.M. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (twdb)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 581 Notice of Withdrawal of Objection,, #576 filed by Third-Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Orsini, Kevin)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 580 Notice of Withdrawal of Objection,, #575 filed by Third-Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Orsini, Kevin)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 579 Notice of Withdrawal of Objection,, #574 filed by Defendant Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER REFERRING REQUEST TO AMEND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE TO SPECIAL MASTERS #562 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 578 STATUS REPORT November 30, 2022 Joint Status Report filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 577 REPLY in Support of Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/20/2023 #562 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Hazam, Lexi)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 576 OBJECTIONS to Order #444 , Order #480 ("Notice of Objection and Objection to Special Master Panel Orders") filed by Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lillian S. Grossbard, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Order)(Orsini, Kevin)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 575 OBJECTIONS to Order #559 ("Notice of Objection and Objection to Special Masters' Production Order") filed by Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lillian S. Grossbard, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Orsini, Kevin)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 574 OBJECTIONS to Order #556 - Special Master Panel's Orders Regarding Crewmember Personal Devices filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., Third Party Defendants MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan W. Hughes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Jonathan)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 573 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney T. Patrick O'Leary to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Ascot Underwriting Inc., MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), Intervenor Defendant Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399 (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34394071) filed by Plaintiffs Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 572 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney J. Dwight LeBlanc III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Ascot Underwriting Inc., MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), Intervenor Defendant Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399 (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34394054) filed by Plaintiffs Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 571 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Danica B. Denny to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Ascot Underwriting Inc., MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), Intervenor Defendant Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399 (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34394002) filed by Claimants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wilson Mudge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l. #566 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 569 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick J. McShane to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiffs Ascot Underwriting Inc., MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), Intervenor Defendant Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399 (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34393938) filed by Claimants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 568 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/20/2023 #562 filed by Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V Beijing, V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin J. Orsini)(Orsini, Kevin)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 567 OPPOSITION re: Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/20/2023 #562 filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., ThirdParty Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan W. Hughes)(Hughes, Jonathan)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 566 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wilson Mudge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34387119) filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from DC Bar, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from Maryland Bar) (Nakamura, Angel)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 565 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #564 served on November 28, 2022. (Keegan, Christopher)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 564 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Amplify's Reply to the Dordellas Parties' Response to Amplify's Motion to Challenge Clawback under seal #563 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Keegan, Christopher)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 563 APPLICATION to file document Amplify's Reply to the Dordellas Parties' Response to Amplify's Motion to Challenge Clawback under seal filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document, #2 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
November 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 562 Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 1/20/2023 filed by Class Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lexi J. Hazam, #2 Proposed Order) (Hazam, Lexi)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 561 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V Beijing, V. Ships Greece Ltd. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Keith Kaplan at kkaplan@cravath.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Nasab, Omid)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 560 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran for Court Reporter. Court will contact Amanda Janks at ajanks@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Hazam, Lexi)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 559 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: PRODUCTION OF 2022 DOCUMENTS by Special Master (twdb)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 558 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: CUSTODIAL INTERVIEWS by Special Master (twdb)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 557 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: ITALIAN SEARCH TERMS by Special Master (twdb)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 556 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: PERSONAL DEVICE IMAGING by Special Master (twdb)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 555 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: AMPLIFY'S MOTION TO CHALLENGE CLAWBACK by Special Master (twdb)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 554 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Reporter. Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keegan, Christopher)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 552 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Motion To Challenge Clawback By Dordellas Parties, And Application For Leave To Submit Documents For In Camera Review #530 filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., Third Party Defendants MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katie Scott, #2 Exhibit A)(Hughes, Jonathan)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 551 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor Plaintiffs' Original Complaint in Intervention for Failure to State a Claim #493 filed by Intervenor Defendant Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. (Politis, Nicholas)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 550 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiffs' Second Amended Third-Party Complaint ECF #455 for Failure to State a Claim #495 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (Politis, Nicholas)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 549 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ECF #454 for Failure to State a Claim #494 filed by Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. (Politis, Nicholas)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter granting Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison Rumsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Third Party Defendants MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping #544 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 547 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Marine Exchange Crossclaim filed by Defendant/Third-Party Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V Beijing, V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Marine Exchange Crossclaim)(Attorney Kevin J. Orsini added to party M/V Beijing (pty:dft))(Orsini, Kevin)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 553 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: MOTION FOR ORDER ON PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND DIRECTION OF NOTICE UNDER RULE 23(E) #476 . The Court approves agreement. Order to issue. Final approval date set for April 24, 2023 at 8:30 AM. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (twdb)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 546 [AMENDED PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND DIRECTION OF NOTICE UNDER RULE 23(E) #476 [Dates inserted per direction of the Court] filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Hazam, Lexi)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 545 STATUS REPORT ("Joint Status Report") filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Hazam, Lexi)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 544 Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison Rumsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Third Party Defendants MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/7/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34284638) filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from Colorado Bar, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from DC Bar) (Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L.(pty:3pd)) (Nakamura, Angel)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 543 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT by Judge David O. Carter. The document is stricken for the reasons stated in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies [Dkt. 528]. (ts)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 541 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #538 Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., Ascot Underwriting Inc., and Underwriters of Lloyds Of London's Notice of Joinder of Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company, LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company Memorandum In Opposition To COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss (ECF 538) filed by Defendant-Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Popham, Mitchell)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 542 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: SHIPPING PARTIES' MOTION TO QUASH 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONS REGARDING PRESERVATION by Special Master. (twdb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue November 16, 2022 Hearings on Certain Motions to December 5, 2022 #529 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Motion continued to 12/5/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, re Stipulation RE Cosco (Cayman) mercury Co. LTD. Dismissal Without Prejudice, Evidence, and Tolling #504 . COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd. and COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd. terminated. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 538 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiffs' Second Amended Third-Party Complaint ECF #455 for Failure to State a Claim #495 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ECF #454 for Failure to State a Claim #494 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Larson, Stephen)
November 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 530 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Motion To Challenge Clawback By Dordellas Parties, And Application For Leave To Submit Documents For In Camera Review filed by Defendants/Third Party Plaintffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Motion set for hearing on 12/12/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Trogdon Declaration, #2 Exh. 1, #3 Exh. 2, #4 Exh. 3, #5 Exh. 4, #6 Exh. 5, #7 Exh. 6, #8 Exh. 7, #9 Exh. 8, #10 Exh. 9, #11 Exh. 10, #12 Exh. 11, #13 Exh. 12, #14 Exh. 13, #15 Exh. 14, #16 Exh. 15, #17 Exh. 16, #18 Exh. 17, #19 Proposed Order re Clawback, #20 Proposed Order re in Camera Review) (Keegan, Christopher)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 529 Joint STIPULATION to Continue NOVEMBER 16, 2022 HEARINGS ON CERTAIN MOTIONS to DECEMBER 5, 2022 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Larson, Stephen)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER OF SPECIAL MASTER PANEL DEPOSITION PROTOCOL by Special Master (twdb)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 535 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: CLAIM FILING by Special Master (twdb)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 534 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: PIPELINE INSPECTION DOCUMENTS by Special Master (twdb)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 533 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: PERSONAL DEVICE MESSAGING APPS by Special Master (twdb)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 532 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DEFICIENCIES by Special Master (twdb)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 531 SPECIAL MASTERS' FOLLOW UP ORDER RE: 2022 PRODUCTIONS, by Special Master (twdb)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison Rumsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l. (Pro #523 . The following error(s) was/were found: Application and proposed order are inconsistent. Application only lists Dordellas Finance Crop. and MSC Mwediterranean Shipping Company S.A. while proposed order has Dordellas Finance Corp. and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., and Third Party Defendants MSC DANIT, Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.R.L. and terminated defendant MSC Shipmanagement Ltd. (lt) Modified on 11/16/2022 (lt).
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 527 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., ThirdParty Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. correcting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #526 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Corrected)(Hughes, Jonathan)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 526 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Crossclaim, #478 filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Jonathan)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 525 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Intervenors' Original Complaint in Intervention #496 filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., ThirdParty Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. (Hughes, Jonathan)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 524 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Intervenors' Original Complaint in Intervention #497 ("Third-Party Defendants Costamere Shipping Co., S.A. and V. Ships Greece Ltd.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Intervenors' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6)") filed by Defendants Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Orsini, Kevin)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 523 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 11/15/2022, SEE DOCKET NUMBER 543.] Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison Rumsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/7/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-34284638) filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from Colorado Bar, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from DC Bar) (Nakamura, Angel) Modified on 11/15/2022 (ts). Modified on 11/15/2022 (ts).
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 522 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allison Rumsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34284638) filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party MSC Shipmanagement Limited (pty:dft), Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l. (pty:dft)) (Nakamura, Angel)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter granting First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M. Odell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Third Party Defendants MSC Danit, Mediterranean Ship #512 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 520 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: DORDELLAS REQUEST FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING PERSONAL DEVICE IMAGING by Special Master Bradley O'Brien. This Special Master Panel ("SMP") Order addresses the Dordellas Parties' letter of October 24, 2022 requesting a protective order specifying that the Dordellas Parties are not required to collect, image, and search crewmembers' personal devices. See order for details. (lom)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 519 STATUS REPORT ("Joint Status Report") filed by Defendants Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Orsini, Kevin)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter granting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael Paul Addis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd. #373 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER by DISTRICT JUDGE DAVID O. CARTER granting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Damaris Hernandez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd. #406 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER by DISTRICT JUDGE DAVID O. CARTER granting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryon L. Little to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd., COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. #498 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 515 Text Only Entry. ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter granting the APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Yates to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY #463 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ts) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 514 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #489 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #342 filed by Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Popham, Mitchell)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 513 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #343 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #344 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #342 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #490 filed by Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Popham, Mitchell)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 512 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M. Odell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Third Party Defendants MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34251654) filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from Texas Bar) (Attorney Christopher M. Odell added to party Dordellas Finance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher M. Odell added to party MSC Danit(pty:3pd), Attorney Christopher M. Odell added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher M. Odell added to party MSC Shipmanagement Limited (pty:dft), Attorney Christopher M. Odell added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L.(pty:3pd)) (Odell, Christopher)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 511 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #469 filed by Third Party Defendants Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Orsini, Kevin)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 510 REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #470 filed by Defendants Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Orsini, Kevin)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 509 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Complaint #467 filed by Defendants MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 508 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Third-Party Complaint #468 filed by Defendants MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 507 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Third Party Complaint and Complaint in Intervention #466 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. (Cicala, Conte)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 506 Notice of Withdrawal of Objection, #502 filed by Third Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Danit, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 505 Notice filed by Third Party Defendants COSTAMARE SHIPPING CO., S.A., Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. ("Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Objection and Objection to Special Master Panel Orders") (Orsini, Kevin)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 504 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendants / Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Beta Operating Company, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) Stipulation Re COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd. Dismissal Without Prejudice, Evidence, and Tolling as to COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation RE Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. LTD. Motions to Dismiss #488 . Amplify and Class Plaintiffs may file their oppositions to COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd.s Motions to Dismiss the Amplifys and Class Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaints, ECF Nos. 464, 465, by 6:00 PM PT on Wednesday, October 26, 2022; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 502 OBJECTIONS ("Notice of Objection and Objection to Special Master Panel Orders") filed by Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V Beijing, V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lillian S. Grossbard, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order)(Orsini, Kevin)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 501 OBJECTIONS - NOTICE OF OBJECTION AND OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTER PANEL'S ORDERS REGARDING CREWMEMBER PERSONAL DEVICES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., Third Party Defendants MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan W. Hughes, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Jonathan)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 500 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #341 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #486 Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., Ascot Underwriting Inc., and Underwriters of Lloyds Of London's Notice of Joinder of Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company, LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company Memorandum In Opposition To Marine Exchange Of Los Angeles-Long Beach Motion to Dismiss And Request For Judicial Notice (ECF 341), and Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company, LLC and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company Memorandum in Opposition To Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor Motion to Dismiss (ECF 486) filed by Defendant-Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000). Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Popham, Mitchell)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 499 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd. Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendant/Third Party Defendant Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Conner, Lisa)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 498 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryon L. Little to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd., COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34220501) filed by Defendant COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd., COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re PHV Application of Little) (Politis, Nicholas)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 497 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Intervenors' Original Complaint in Intervention filed by Defendants/Third-Party Defendants Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orsini, Kevin)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 496 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Intervenors' Original Complaint in Intervention filed by Defendants/Third-Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., M/V MSC DANIT, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party M/V MSC DANIT (pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company S A (pty:3pd)) (Hughes, Jonathan)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 495 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiffs' Second Amended Third-Party Complaint ECF #455 for Failure to State a Claim filed by Third-Party Defendant Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Xu Lei, #2 Proposed Order) (Politis, Nicholas)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ECF #454 for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Xu Lei, #2 Proposed Order) (Politis, Nicholas)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 493 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor Plaintiffs' Original Complaint in Intervention for Failure to State a Claim filed by Intervenor Defendant Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Xu Lei, #2 Proposed Order) (Politis, Nicholas)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 492 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor Plaintiffs Original Complaint in Intervention ECF #453 filed by Intervenor Defendant COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Xu Lei, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nicholas S Politis added to party COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd.(pty:intvd)) (Politis, Nicholas)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #470 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Complaint #467 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Hazam, Lexi)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 490 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #469 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 489 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Third-Party Complaint #468 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 488 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition Brief filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 487 DECLARATION of Kate Epstein In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Third Party Complaint and Complaint in Intervention #466 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Third Party Complaint and Complaint in Intervention #466 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Keegan, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 485 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND DIRECTION OF NOTICE UNDER RULE 23(E) #476 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 484 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs-Intervenors MARKEL INTERNATIONAL LTD. (LLOYDS SYNDICATE 3000), Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399. upon COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/21/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Lisa M. Conner. (Bentch, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 483 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, John Crowe, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, East Meets West Excursions, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, LBC Seafood, Inc., Tyler Wayman. upon COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/4/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Nicholas Politis. (Hazam, Lexi)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 482 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES. (twdb)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Regarding Non-Waiver of Personal Jurisdiction or Other Defenses #474 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 481 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: GOVERNMENT RELATED PRODUCTIONS by Judge David O. Carter. (twdb)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 480 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: DISCOVERY AND PRESERVATION by Judge David O. Carter. (twdb)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 478 CROSSCLAIM against Cross-Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, V. Ships Greece Ltd.; NO, filed by Cross-Claimant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor.(Cicala, Conte)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 477 DECLARATION of Wylie A. AItken in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND DIRECTION OF NOTICE UNDER RULE 23(E) #476 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Banzai Surf Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:conpla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Bongos III Sportfishing LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Bongos Sportfishing LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party John Crowe(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Josh Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Quality Sea Food, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Tyler Wayman(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Chandralekha Wickramasekaran(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran(pty:pla))(Aitken, Darren)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 476 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND DIRECTION OF NOTICE UNDER RULE 23(E) filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wylie Aitken, #2 Declaration of Layn R. Phillips, #3 Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #9 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #10 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #11 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #12 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #13 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #14 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Lexi Hazam, #15 Declaration of Jennifer Keough and Exhibits A to L, #16 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement) (Larson, Stephen)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 475 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited. (Hughes, Jonathan)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 474 STIPULATION for Relief from Regarding Non-Waiver of Personal Juirisdiction or Other Defenses filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARINGS ON PENDING MOTIONS [302, 304, 310, 386, 464, 465, 466] AND PRELIMINARY CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT APPROVAL #387 by Judge David O. Carter. The Court is in receipt of Amplifys Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 455) and SETS the following briefing schedule per the Parties stipulation (Dkt. 452): Motions to dismiss the amended complaints are due on or by October 17, 2022. Any oppositions to said motions to dismiss are due on or by October 24, 2022. Reply briefs in support of said motions to dismiss are due on October 31, 2022. The hearing for these motions will be held on November 16, 2022, at 9:00 A.M. The Court REQUESTS that a representative from the National Transportation Safety Board be present at the motions hearing. (Dkt. 459). The Court further SETS a hearing for preliminary approval of the class action settlement reached by Amplify and Class Plaintiffs on November 16, 2022, at 1:00 P.M. All other hearings are hereby VACATED. (rolm)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 470 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendants Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orsini, Kevin)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 469 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants/Third-Party Defendants Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orsini, Kevin)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 468 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Third-Party Complaint filed by Defendants MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hughes, Jonathan)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 467 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Complaint filed by Defendants MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l.. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party MSC Shipmanagement Limited (pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l. (pty:dft)) (Hughes, Jonathan)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 466 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Third Party Complaint and Complaint in Intervention filed by Third Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kipling Louttit, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Declaration E to Declaration, #7 Proposed Order) (Cicala, Conte)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 465 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Plaintiffs' Second Amended Third-Party Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Third-Party Defendant Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Xu Lei, #2 Proposed Order) (Politis, Nicholas)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 464 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Xu Lei, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Nicholas S Politis added to party COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd.(pty:dft)) (Politis, Nicholas)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 463 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James Yates to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34137232) filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Holscher, Mark)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 473 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10-03-2022, 11:00AM & 2:44PM re Transcript #472 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jmo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 472 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10-03-2022, 11:00AM & 2:44PM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS Certified Transcription, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2023. (jmo)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 461 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER FOLLOWING OCTOBER 3, 2022 HEARING by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) Modified on 10/7/2022 (twdb).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 460 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company for Court Reporter. Court will contact Dianne Meek at dianne.meek@arnoldporter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Hughes, Jonathan)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 458 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V.Ships Greece Ltd. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Robert Zwillich at rzwillich@cravath.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Nasab, Omid)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 457 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Maxwell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Hazam, Lexi)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 456 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Jessica Rodriguez at jessica.rodriguez@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Keegan, Christopher)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 455 Second AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT against Defendants/Third-Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd, Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corporation, M/V BEIJING, MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Shipmanagement Limited, Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L., V.Ships Greece Ltd. amending Amended Third-Party Complaint,, #277 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Beta Operating Company, LLC, Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY(Keegan, Christopher)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 462 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES (twdb)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 454 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation of Liberia, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, V. Ships Greece Ltd., Mediterranean Shipping Company S.r.l., MSC Shipmanagement Limited, COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd., COSCO (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd., M/V MSC DANIT, M/V Beijing amending Consolidated Complaint,,,, #102 , filed by Plaintiffs Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, John Crowe, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, East Meets West Excursions, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, LBC Seafood, Inc., Tyler Wayman(Larson, Stephen)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 453 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against Defendants-In-Intervention Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd, Cosco Beijing, Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L., Roes 1-5, Roes 6-10, V. Ships Greece Ltd., filed by Plaintiffs Intervenors Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399.(Popham, Mitchell)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MINUTES OF Status Conference Re Settlement Agreement held before Judge David O. Carter: Also present, AUSA Daniel Beck. The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Court ORDERS the National Transportation Safety Board be present at the motions hearing set for November 16, 2022 (Dkt. 452). Special Masters' Order to be issued. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Stipulation Regarding Class Plaintiffs' and Amplify's Second Amended Complaints and ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule by Judge David O. Carter. The Court SETS the following briefing schedule: Amendments to Class Plaintiffs complaint and Amplifys third-party complaint are due on or by October 5, 2022. Any motions to dismiss the amended complaints are due on or by October 12, 2022. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #421 MOTION to Intervene by Markel International Insurance Company, LTD., Ascot Underwriting Inc., and Underwriters At Lloyd's of London. The copy of the complaint in intervention attached as Exhibit E to the declaration of Jeffrey T. Bentch in support of the Motion shall be filed by Subrogated Insurers in the instant action within 7 days of this Order. (twdb)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Notice of Permit Verification Letter filed by Non-Party United States of America. (Beck, Daniel)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 449 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: LITIGATION HOLDS AND PRESERVATION by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (bm)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER REQUESTING GOVERNMENT APPEARANCE by Judge David O. Carter: To ensure that the National Transportation Safety Board ("NTSB") investigation is moving forward and that the parties are providing any relevant data, the Court REQUESTS a representative of the NTSB appear in court during the hearing on November 16, 2022, at 9:00 am. (bm)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 447 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: DANIT CUSTODIANS by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (bm)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 446 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: CUSTODIAL DISCOVERY ISSUES by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (bm)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 445 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE: CRIMINAL DISCOVERY by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (bm)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 444 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: PRODUCTION FROM PERSONAL DEVICES, by Special Master (twdb)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 443 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: PRODUCTION OF 2022 DOCUMENTS by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (bm)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING DEFENDANTS CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORPORATION, V.SHIPS GREECE, LTD., AND COSTAMARE SHIPPING CO.S MOTIONS TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION [305, 306, 307]. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION, re: #305 , #306 , #307 . (twdb)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 441 STATUS REPORT and Agenda for October 3, 2022, SMP Hearing filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Hazam, Lexi)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Notice of Consultation Letter by National Marine Fisheries Service filed by non-party United States of America. (Beck, Daniel)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 439 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation for Order #436 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 438 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William Colin Mullen on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. (Attorney William Colin Mullen added to party Ascot Underwriting Inc.(pty:intvd), Attorney William Colin Mullen added to party Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399(pty:intvd), Attorney William Colin Mullen added to party Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.(pty:intvd))(Mullen, William)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 437 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Ronald Rutan on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. (Attorney David Ronald Rutan added to party Ascot Underwriting Inc.(pty:intvd), Attorney David Ronald Rutan added to party Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399(pty:intvd), Attorney David Ronald Rutan added to party Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.(pty:intvd))(Rutan, David)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Joint STIPULATION for Order regarding Class Plaintiffs' and Amplify's Second Amended Complaints filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Larson, Stephen)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 435 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #421 filed by Third Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L.. (Attorney Joseph A Walsh, II added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L.(pty:3pd))(Walsh, Joseph)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 434 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #421 ("M/V Beijing's Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to Intervene (ECF No. 421)") filed by ThirdParty Defendant M/V BEIJING. (Orsini, Kevin)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 433 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #421 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Larson, Stephen)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 432 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #421 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 431 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene #421 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. (Cicala, Conte)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #425 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399 and for Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., designating Mitchell J. Popham as local counsel. (lom)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #424 Non-Resident Attorney J. Clifton Hall, III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399 and for Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., designating Mitchell J. Popham as local counsel. (lom)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #423 Non-Resident Attorney Brooke L. Bentley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399 and for Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., designating Mitchell J. Popham as local counsel. (lom)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #422 Non-Resident Attorney Robert E. Freehill APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399 and for Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., designating Mitchell J. Popham as local counsel. (lom)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 426 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert E. Freehill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel I #422 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel In #425 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney J. Clifton Hall, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel #424 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brooke L. Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel In #423 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 425 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey T. Bentch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34010952) filed by Proposed Defendant Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 424 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney J. Clifton Hall, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34010929) filed by Proposed Defendant Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 423 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brooke L. Bentley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34010905) filed by Proposed Defendant Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 422 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert E. Freehill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34010849) filed by Proposed Defendant Intervenors Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399, Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Popham, Mitchell)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 421 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene filed by Proposed Defendant Intervenors Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd., Ascot Underwriting Inc., Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Thomas Upton ISO Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Thomas Upton, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Thomas Upton, #5 Declaration of James Short ISO Motion to Intervene, #6 Exhibit C to Declaration of James Short, #7 Declaration of James Villiers ISO Motion to Intervene, #8 Exhibit D to Declaration of James Villiers, #9 Declaration of Jeffrey Bentch ISO Motion to Intervene, #10 Exhibit E to Declaration of Jeffrey Bentch) (Attorney Mitchell J. Popham added to party Markel International Insurance Company, Ltd.(pty:intvd), Attorney Mitchell J. Popham added to party Ascot Underwriting Inc.(pty:intvd), Attorney Mitchell J. Popham added to party Certain Insurers At Lloyd's of London And London Markets Subscribing To Policy No. B0180ME2001399(pty:intvd)) (Popham, Mitchell)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #400 Non-Resident Attorney Patrick I. Andrews APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc et al plaintiffs, designating Stephen G. Larson as local counsel. (twdb)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #399 Non-Resident Attorney Avery S. Halfon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, designating Stephen G. Larson as local counsel. (twdb)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean O Morris counsel for Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. Adding Sean Morris as counsel of record for Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. (Attorney Sean O Morris added to party Dordellas Finance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Sean O Morris added to party MSC Danit(pty:dft), Attorney Sean O Morris added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company(pty:dft))(Morris, Sean)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 417 STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Notice of Submission to Special Master Panel filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 415 STATUS REPORT filed by ThirdParty Defendant Dordellas Finance Corporation. (Hughes, Jonathan)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 414 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES. (twdb)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER REQUESTING GOVERNMENT APPEARANCE. The Court REQUESTS representatives from the United States Army Corps of Engineers and the National Marine Fisheries Service to appear in court on October 3, 2022, at 10:00 am. ( Hearing set for 10/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 412 STATUS REPORT Class Action Plaintiffs and Amplifys September 12, 2022, Discovery Status Report To Special Master Panel filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 411 STATUS REPORT of REGARDING THE SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE TO BE GIVEN IN THE CONSOLIDATED LIMITATION ACTION filed by ThirdParty Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Peacock, Albert)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 410 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Beta Operating Company, LLC, Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. upon Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2022, answer due 11/7/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Nicholas S. Politis. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #372 Non-Resident Attorney Lillian S. Grossbard APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of M/V Beijing, et al, designating David A. Tong as local counsel. (twdb)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 408 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/8/22 11:12 A.M. re Transcript #407 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (apr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 407 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/8/22 11:12 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2022. (apr)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 406 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Damaris Hernandez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33958015) filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix New York Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 405 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Third Party Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., M/V BEIJING, V.Ships Greece Ltd. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Robert Zwillich at rzwillich@cravath.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Nasab, Omid)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 404 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Catherine Hodges at catherine.hodges@arnoldporter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Hughes, Jonathan)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 403 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Jessica Rodriguez at jessica.rodriguez@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 402 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Maxwell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (McNabb, Kelly)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 400 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Patrick I. Andrews to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Donald C. Brockman, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33953078) filed by Plaintiffs Donald C. Brockman, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Larson, Stephen)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 399 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Avery S. Halfon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Donald C. Brockman, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33952935) filed by Plaintiffs Donald C. Brockman, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Larson, Stephen)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 401 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge David O. Carter: Granting #383 #384 MOTIONS to Lift Stay. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. The Court will be setting a status conference for October 17, 2022, at 4:00 pm. (leave to advance trial) Any motions filed by the parties should be set for that date. Status Conference set for 10/17/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher William Keegan counsel for Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Gavin Tisdale is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: GRANTING #392 Plaintiffs' EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Initial Standing Order. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 396 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Costamare Shipping Company S.A. and V.Ships Greece Ltd. #383 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - August 24 Hr'g Tr.)(Hazam, Lexi)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Stay of Proceedings against Costamare Shipping and V.Ships Greece #384 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Third-Party Defendant Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd, identifying COSCO Shipping Lines Co. Ltd.; China Shipowners Mutual Assurance Association; West of England P&I Club. (Politis, Nicholas)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO STAY #328 , #329 , #337 , #339 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Initial Standing Order following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter, Rule I, for September 8, 2022, Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Lift Stay filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen G. Larson, #2 Proposed Order) (Larson, Stephen)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Stay of Proceedings against Costamare Shipping and V.Ships Greece #384 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Costamare Shipping Company S.A. and V.Ships Greece Ltd. #383 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Omid H. Nasab)(Orsini, Kevin)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 STATUS REPORT September 1, 2022 Status Report filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/25/2022 (6:44 p.m. to 11:34 p.m.) re Transcript #388 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (aa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/25/2022 (6:44 p.m. to 11:34 p.m.). Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC.., phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2022. (aa)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the settling parties to submit a finalized settlement agreement by October 17, 2022. In the alternative, the Court ORDERS the settling parties appear before the Court on October 17, 2022 at 9:00 am to show cause why a finalized settlement agreement has not been reached. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. ( Show Cause Hearing set for 10/17/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Specially-Appearing Third-Party Defendant Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 10/31/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Xu Lei in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Nicholas S Politis added to party Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd(pty:3pd)) (Politis, Nicholas)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Margaret Stando at mstando@peacockpiper.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Peacock, Albert)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Stay of Proceedings against Costamare Shipping and V.Ships Greece filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Motion set for hearing on 9/8/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Powel Declaration, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Ex. 3, #5 Proposed Order) (Keegan, Christopher)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Lift Stay re Costamare Shipping Company S.A. and V.Ships Greece Ltd. filed by Class Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. Motion set for hearing on 9/8/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 5/26/22 Email from A. Peacock, #2 Exhibit B - Hr'g Tr., #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Lifting Stay) (Hazam, Lexi)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO LIFT STAY by Judge David O. Carter. At the last hearing, the Class Plaintiffs represented to the Court that they intended to file a Motion to Lift Stay, and the Court set an expedited briefing schedule for the Motion. Accordingly, the Court sets a hearing on the Motion to Lift Stay for Thursday, September 8, 2022 at 9 am. (lom)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #369 Non-Resident Attorney Katherine Epstein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company, designating Mark Holscher as local counsel. (lom)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Jonathan Hughes at jonathan.hughes@arnoldporter.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Hughes, Jonathan)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Kristin Orsland at korsland@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Hazam, Lexi)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT by Judge David O. Carter. On August 24, 2022, Defendant Amplify Energy Corp. and the Class Plaintiffs informed the Court that they had reached a tentative settlement. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the settling parties into a Status Conference with the Special Master Panel on Wednesday, August 31, 2022 at 1 pm PST. The settling parties are to notify the Court of a good faith estimate of when they expect to submit their settlement agreement for the Courts consideration. (lom)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MINUTES OF MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT #151 #298 ; MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT COSCO BEIJING #302 ; MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP, RULE 12(B)(6) FILED BY SPECIALLY APPEARING THIRD PARTY DEFENDANTS DORDELLAS FINANCE CORPORATION, MSC DANIT, MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY #304 ; MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORPORATION #305 ; MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FILED BY DEFENDANT COSTAMARE SHIPPING CO. S.A #306 ; MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FILED BY DEFENDANT V. SHIPS GREECE LTD. #307 held before Judge David O. Carter. All motions #151 #298 #302 #304 #305 #306 #307 are taken under submission. The Court's written order to issue. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (lom)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MINUTES OF MOTION TO STAY CASE PENDING FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT PENDING RESOLUTION OF NINTH CIRCUIT APPEAL #328 #337 ; MOTION TO STAY CASE PENDING FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT PENDING RESOLUTION OF NINTH CIRCUIT APPEAL #329 #339 ; held before Judge David O. Carter. Motion to stay case pending first amended third-party complaint pending resolution of ninth circuit appeal #337 and Motion to stay case pending first amended third-party complaint pending resolution of ninth circuit appeal #339 are taken under submission. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (lom)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #305 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #306 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #307 (Peacock, Albert)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael Paul Addis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33862890) filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lillian S. Grossbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33862819) filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #363 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of M/V Beijing, et al, designating David A. Tong as local counsel. (twdb)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #364 Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of M/V Beijing, et al, designating David A. Tong as local counsel. (twdb)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Katherine Epstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33851809) filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 NY Cert. of Good Standing, #2 DC Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Holscher, Mark)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/16/2022, Receipt No. 33822943) filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Joseph Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/16/2022, Receipt No. 33822905) filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V.Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, R #363 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V.Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Rec #364 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (sbou)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: HEARING ON MOTIONS [151, 298, 302, 304, 305, 306, 307, 328, 329]. The Court CONTINUES the hearing on the Motions to Dismiss. (time change only) ( Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Omid H. Nasab to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V.Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33822943) filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V.Ships Greece Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33822905) filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 STATUS REPORT of August 15, 2022 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third Party Plaintiffs Beta Operating Company, LLC, Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, upon Third Party Defendant Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd served on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon HSM Corporate Services Ltd., Registered Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons returned. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6) #304 filed by Third Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. (Walsh, Joseph)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 DECLARATION of ALBERT E. PEACOCK, III IN SUPPORT OF [ECF356, ECF357, AND ECF358 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #305 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #306 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #307 filed by ThirdParty Defendant V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Peacock, Albert)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #307 filed by ThirdParty Defendant V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Peacock, Albert)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #306 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.. (Peacock, Albert)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #305 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Peacock, Albert)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT PENDING RESOLUTION OF NINTH CIRCUIT APPEAL RESCHEDULING ECF328 hearing from 8/22/22 #337 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Dordellas Finance Corporation. (Walsh, Joseph)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT PENDING RESOLUTION OF NINTH CIRCUIT APPEAL #328 and #337 filed by Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Peacock, Albert)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 REPLY IS IN OPPOSITION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED THIRD- PARTY COMPLAINT #302 filed by ThirdParty Defendant COSCO Beijing. (Peacock, Albert)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 REPLY Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Thrid-Party Complaint #298 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. (Cicala, Conte)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #330 Non-Resident Attorney Lauren Daniel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Dordellas Finance Corp,. et al, designating Angel Tang Nakamura as local counsel. (twdb)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #327 Non-Resident Attorney Gavin Tisdale APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp., Defendants, designating Mark Holscher as local counsel. (twdb)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #251 Non-Resident Attorney Meredith Pohl APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp., Defendants, designating Mark Holscher as local counsel. (twdb)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES (twdb)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MEMORANDUM in Opposition To Motions For Stays Pending Appeals filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 DECLARATION of K. Ross Powell re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #343 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #345 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #344 filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7, #8 Ex. 8, #9 Ex. 9, #10 Ex. 10, #11 Ex. 11, #12 Ex. 12, #13 Ex. 13, #14 Ex 14, #15 Ex. 15, #16 Ex. 16, #17 Ex. 17, #18 Ex. 18, #19 Ex. 19, #20 Ex. 20, #21 Ex. 21, #22 Ex. 22, #23 Ex. 23, #24 Ex. 24, pt.1, #25 Ex. 24, pt. 2, #26 Ex. 25, pt. 1, #27 Ex. 25, pt. 2, #28 Ex. 26, #29 Ex. 27, #30 Ex. 28, #31 Ex. 29, #32 Ex. 30, #33 Ex. 31, #34 Ex. 32, #35 Ex. 33, #36 Ex. 34, #37 Ex. 35, #38 Ex. 36, #39 Ex. 37, #40 Ex. 38, #41 Ex. 39, #42 Ex. 40, #43 Ex. 41)(Keegan, Christopher)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #307 filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #306 filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #305 filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED THIRD- PARTY COMPLAINT #302 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6) #304 ; Joinder #317 filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Thrid-Party Complaint #298 filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 STATUS REPORT of August 1, 2022 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending First Amended Third-Party Complaint Pending Resolution of Ninth Circuit Appeal Rescheduling ECF 329 hearing from 8/22/2022 to 8/25/2022 filed by Specially Appearing Defendants and Third-Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Walsh, Joseph)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT PENDING RESOLUTION OF NINTH CIRCUIT APPEAL RESCHEDULING ECF328 hearing from 8/22/22 filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Peacock, Albert)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/15/2021 at 9:44 a.m.; 12/15/2021 at 10:51 a.m.; 12/15/2021 at 11:15 a.m. re Transcript #335 , #333 , #334 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dhs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 TRANSCRIPT Vol. 6 of 6, for proceedings held on 12/15/2021 at 11:15 a.m. ****Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE HINO-SPAAN at: WEBSITE www.debbiehinospaan.com; E-mail, dhinospaan@yahoo.com before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Additional formats of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available to be purchased at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.** Redaction Request due 8/19/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2022. (dhs)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 TRANSCRIPT Vol. 4 of 6, for proceedings held on 12/15/2021 at 10:51 a.m. ****Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE HINO-SPAAN at: WEBSITE www.debbiehinospaan.com; E-mail, dhinospaan@yahoo.com before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Additional formats of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available to be purchased at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.** Redaction Request due 8/19/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2022. (dhs)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT Vol. 2 of 6, for proceedings held on 12/15/2021 at 9:44 a.m. ****Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE HINO-SPAAN at: WEBSITE www.debbiehinospaan.com; E-mail, dhinospaan@yahoo.com before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After that date, it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Additional formats of the transcript (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance) are also available to be purchased at any time through the Court Reporter. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.** Redaction Request due 8/19/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2022. (dhs)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Third-Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company re #285 (Walsh, Joseph)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 SPECIAL MASTER PANEL'S ORDER RE: ESI PROTOCOL. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lauren C. Daniel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, ThirdParty Defendant MSC Danit (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33696399) filed by Defendant Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from NY Bar and DC Bar, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party MSC Danit(pty:3pd)) (Nakamura, Angel)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: JULY 27 and AUGUST 5, 2022, HEARINGS. (twdb)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending First Amended Third-Party Complaint Pending Resolution of Ninth Circuit Appeal filed by Specially Appearing Defendants and Third-Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Walsh, Joseph)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT PENDING RESOLUTION OF NINTH CIRCUIT APPEAL filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V. Ships Greece Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gavin R. Tisdale to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33687669) filed by Defendants/Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 DC Cert. of Good Standing, #2 NY Cert. of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Holscher, Mark)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Approving Joint Discovery Coordination Stipulation #313 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Katie J. L. Scott counsel for Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. Adding Katie J.L. Scott as counsel of record for DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., and MSC DANIT, in rem for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., and MSC DANIT, in rem. (Attorney Katie J. L. Scott added to party Dordellas Finance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Katie J. L. Scott added to party MSC Danit(pty:dft), Attorney Katie J. L. Scott added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company(pty:dft))(Scott, Katie)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan W. Hughes counsel for Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. Adding Jonathan W. Hughes as counsel of record for DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., and MSC DANIT, in rem for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., and MSC DANIT, in rem. (Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party Dordellas Finance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party MSC Danit(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company(pty:dft))(Hughes, Jonathan)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Angel Tang Nakamura counsel for Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. Adding Angel Tang Nakamura as counsel of record for DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., and MSC DANIT, in rem for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., and MSC DANIT, in rem. (Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party Dordellas Finance Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party MSC Danit(pty:dft), Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company(pty:dft))(Nakamura, Angel)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing re #284 (Voss, Tara)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #319 . The following error was found: INCORRECT EVENT ENTRY OF "MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT" USED FOR THE TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION FORM (G-126). TO e-FILE A G-126 FORM: CIVIL EVENT>>OTHER FILINGS>>APPEAL DOCUMENTS>>DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL>>(UPLOAD G-126 FORM). You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript Designation Form in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Approving Stipulation Regarding Non-Waiver of Personal Jurisdiction or Other Defenses #316 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Transcript Designation Form filed by Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #284 (Peacock, Albert)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING NON-WAIVER OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR OTHER DEFENSES #316 by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS SO ORDERED that Entry into the Protective Order [ECF 87], Electronically Stored Information Production Protocol [ECF 99], Removal and Preservation of Portion of San Pedro Pipeline Stipulation [ECF 121], and the Coordinated Discovery Stipulation shall not waive any Partys defenses or rights including, but not limited to any personal jurisdiction defense. No Party to this Stipulation shall use the fact of the Third-Party Defendants entry into the Protective Order [ECF 87], Electronically Stored Information Production Protocol [ECF 99], Removal and Preservation of Portion of San Pedro Pipeline Stipulation [ECF 121], and the Coordinated Discovery Stipulation to argue that such Third-Party Defendant has waived any defenses or rights, including any personal jurisdiction defense. (rolm)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6) #304 AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 12(B)(6) [ECF 304] FILED BY DEFENDANTS AND THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS DORDELLAS FINANCE CORP., MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A., AND MSC DANIT (IN REM) filed by ThirdParty Defendant COSCO Beijing. (Peacock, Albert)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Joint STIPULATION for Order NON-WAIVER OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION OR OTHER DEFENSES filed by DEFENDANT Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd, Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corporation, M/V BEIJING, MSC Danit, Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, V. Ships Greece Ltd..(Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd(pty:3pd), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd(pty:3pd), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor(pty:3pd))(Peacock, Albert)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Discovery #313 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 STATUS REPORT July 15, 2022 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Joint Discovery Coordination Stipulation filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Blue Pacific Fisheries, Bobs Lemonade, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Bradley Bitton d/b/a Brads Live Local Lobster, Donald C. Brockman, Jack Buttler, Clint Carroll Surf School, Coachs Mediterranean Grill & Bar, Cold Stone Creamery, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Endless Sun Surf School, Goff Tours, Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, Josh Hernandez, Gregory Hexberg, Heidi M. Jacques, Michael Jensen, Joshua Tucker, Ketcham Tackle LLC, Kirk Schoonover, LBC Seafood, Inc., Learn To Surf LLC, Steve Legere, Jolynn Mahoney, Patrick Mahoney, Main St. Eyewear & Boutique, N.S.T., a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, MICHAELANGELO SAINT THOMAS, Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc., Newport Surfrider, LLC, Mike Owens, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Gina Rosansky, Steven Rosansky, San Pedro Bait Co., Ivar Southern, Linda Southern, Tyler Wayman, James Whelan, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Zacks By The Beach, Ziggys On Main.(Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Ketcham Tackle LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party N.S.T., a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, MICHAELANGELO SAINT THOMAS(pty:pla))(Hazam, Lexi)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by 3rd Party Plaintiffs Beta Operating Company, LLC, Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. upon Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/23/2022, answer due 9/21/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Capt. Antonio Maresca. (Keegan, Christopher)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS #298 . The Court previously consolidated hearings on all motions related to the First Amended Third-Party Complaint to streamline Court and party efforts. ( Motion hearing continued to 8/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Thrid-Party Complaint #298 RE-NOTICE filed by ThirdParty Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Cicala, Conte)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation PERMITTING THE RELEASE OF FISHER AND FISH INDUSTRY INFORMATION BY THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF FISH & WILDLIFE #301 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED THIRD- PARTY COMPLAINT #302 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #305 , Order #303 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #306 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6) #304 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #307 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by DEFENDANT V. Ships Greece Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by DEFENDANT Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.. Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by DEFENDANT Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP, Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Specially Appearing Third Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Danit, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Joseph A Walsh, II added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company(pty:dft)) (Walsh, Joseph)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED THIRD- PARTY COMPLAINT filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing. Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Peacock, Albert)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER / SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE OF SPECIAL MASTER JAMES SMITH, ESQ by Special Master. (twdb)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Release of Fisher and Fish Industry Information by the California Department of Fish & Wildlife filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE OF SPECIAL MASTER DANIEL GARRIE, ESQ filed by Special Master Daniel Garrie. (lom)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Thrid-Party Complaint filed by Third-Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. Motion set for hearing on 8/8/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kipling Louttit, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Cicala, Conte)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Continuing the Response Deadline for the Stipulating Third-Party Defendants and, Clarifying the Scope of Their Response Obligation in Light of ECF #245 , #294 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: JULY 11, 2022, HEARING by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 STATUS REPORT of July 1, 2022 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Joint STIPULATION to Continue THE RESPONSE DEADLINE FOR THE STIPULATING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS AND, TO CLARIFY THE SCOPE OF THEIR RESPONSE OBLIGATION IN LIGHT OF ECF 245 from July 5, 2022 to July 12, 2022 Re: Order #245 filed by DEFENDANT Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Danit, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, V. Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party MSC Danit(pty:3pd), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company S A (pty:3pd))(Peacock, Albert)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: JUNE 27, 2022 HEARING by Special Master. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-55625 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #285 as to Defendants Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. (twdb)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 22-55629 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #284 as to Third party defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, et al. (twdb)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: JULY 11, 2022 HEARING. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: JULY 11, 2022 HEARING. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE : JULY 11, 2022 HEARING. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING REMOTE DEPOSITIONS OF DEPONENTS OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS / THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORPORATION, V.SHIPS GREECE LTD. AND COSTAMARE SHIPPING CO. #270 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: MOTION HEARINGS. In light of Defendant Amplify Energy Corp.s First Amended Third-Party Complaint (Dkt. #277 ), the Court DENIES AS MOOT and VACATES the hearings for the following motions: #229 #226 , #252 , #256 , #169 , #194 , #195 , #226 , #227 , #228 #229 , #235 . The Court CONTINUES Defendant Amplify Energy Corp.s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Dkt. #151 ) to August 25, 2022 at 10:00 am. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Joint STIPULATION to Vacate JULY 11, 2022; ECF 169, 194, 195, 226, 227, 228, 229 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #226 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss ALL CAUSES OF ACTION #228 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT Third Party Complaint, #123 #229 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement #195 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) #194 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND MOTION TO QUASH #169 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #227 DUE TO FILING OF THE FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, Beta Operating Company, LLC, COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Amplify Energy Corp.(pty:3pp), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Beta Operating Company, LLC(pty:3pp), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Beta Operating Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party COSCO Beijing(pty:3pd), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party Dordellas Finance Corporation(pty:3pd), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company(pty:dft), Attorney Albert E Peacock, III added to party SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY(pty:3pp))(Peacock, Albert)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendants Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. Appeal of Order #245 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33525826.) (Attachments: #1 Order)(Walsh, Joseph)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. Appeal of Order #245 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33525025.) (Peacock, Albert)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Third-Party Complaint, #277 as to Third Party Defendant Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd. (twdb)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Third-Party Complaint, #277 as to Third Party Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L. (twdb)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 21 DAY Summons Issued on Third-Party Complaint #277 as to Third Party Defendant Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd. (twdb)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Third-Party Complaint,, #277 filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Third-Party Complaint,, #277 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Third-Party Complaint,, #277 filed by Third Party Plaintiff Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 First AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT against 3rd Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Cosco Beijing, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Danit, Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A, V.Ships Greece Ltd., Cosco (Cayman) Mercury Co. Ltd, Cosco Shipping Lines Co. Ltd, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.R.L. amending Third Party Complaint, #123 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Third Party Plaintiff Beta Operating Company, LLC, Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY(Keegan, Christopher)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #264 Defendants/Third Party Plaintiffs' MOTION For Leave to File First Amended Third-Complaint. (twdb)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 RESPONSE filed by ThirdParty Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harborto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #263 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO ORDER (Cicala, Conte)
June 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 DECLARATION of K. Ross Powell re MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #273 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5 pt. 1, #6 Ex. 5 pt. 2, #7 Ex. 6, #8 Ex. 7, #9 Ex. 8)(Keegan, Christopher)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #227 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #226 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Powell Decl., #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Ex. 3, #5 Ex. 4, #6 Ex. 5, #7 Ex. 6, #8 Ex. 7, #9 Ex. 8)(Keegan, Christopher)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND MOTION TO QUASH #169 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Powell Declaration, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex.2, #4 Ex. 3, #5 Ex. 4, #6 Ex. 5, #7 Ex. 6, #8 Ex. 7, #9 Ex. 8, #10 Ex. 9, #11 Ex. 10, #12 Ex. 11)(Keegan, Christopher)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Regarding Remote Depositions of Deponents of Specially Appearing Defendants / Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, V.Ships Greece Ltd. and Costamare Shipping Co. filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss ALL CAUSES OF ACTION #228 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Powell Declaration, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Ex. 3)(Keegan, Christopher)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT Third Party Complaint, #123 #229 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/23/2022 Vol. I and Vol. III re Transcript #266 , #265 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/23/2022 Vol. III. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). *Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.* Redaction Request due 7/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/23/2022 Vol. I. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL: DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). *Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline for Release of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any time through the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.* Redaction Request due 7/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Third Party Complaint, #123 filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Motion set for hearing on 7/18/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Powell Declaration, #3 Ex. 1, #4 Ex. 2, #5 Ex. 3, #6 Ex. 4, #7 Ex. 5, #8 Ex. 6, #9 Ex. 7, #10 Proposed Order) (Keegan, Christopher)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: SPECIAL MASTER FEE ALLOCATION. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Larson, Stephen)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 [MOTION RELATED PROPOSED ORDER, filed as]NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Third-Party Complaint #256 RE-NOTICE OF MOTION filed by ThirdParty Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cicala, Conte) Modified on 6/16/2022 (twdb).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Third-Party Complaint #256 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement #195 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A)(Keegan, Christopher)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) #194 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, ThirdParty Plaintiff Beta Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exh. 1, #2 Exh. 2)(Keegan, Christopher)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #255 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event and text content. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Third-Party Complaint filed by Third Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kipling Louttit, #2 Request for Judicial Notice) (Cicala, Conte)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 (Attorney Richard D McCune added to party Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr(pty:pla))(McCune, Richard)
June 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Briefing Deadlines And Continue The Hearing Date For Motions To Dismiss re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #226 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike THIRD-PARTY COM #252 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Dordellas Finance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ellen E. McGlynn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Walsh, Joseph)
June 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Briefing Deadlines And Continue The Hearing Date For Motions To Dismiss re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #226 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike THIRD-PARTY COM #252 filed by Third Party Defendants COSCO Beijing, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attorney Tara B Voss added to party COSCO Beijing(pty:3pd), Attorney Tara B Voss added to party Capetanissa Maritime Corporation(pty:3pd), Attorney Tara B Voss added to party Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.(pty:3pd), Attorney Tara B Voss added to party V.Ships Greece Ltd.(pty:3pd))(Voss, Tara)
June 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Briefing Deadlines And Continue The Hearing Date For Motions To Dismiss re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #226 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT Third Party Complaint, #123 #229 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement #195 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) #194 , Joinder (Motion Related), #235 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #227 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss ALL CAUSES OF ACTION #228 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND MOTION TO QUASH #169 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keegan, Christopher)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Meredith M. Pohl to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33404039) filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 DC Cert. of Good Standing, #2 TX Cert of Good Standing, #3 VA Cert of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Holscher, Mark)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #151 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 05/23/22 re Transcript #248 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (yja) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 05/23/22 Vol. II from 11:10am to 11:28am. Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO REPORTING, INC, phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 6/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2022. (yja)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Maxwell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dunlavey, Wilson)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Maxwell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Dunlavey, Wilson)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER RE: LIMITATION OF LIABILITY ACT by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Keegan, Christopher)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Reporter. Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keegan, Christopher)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MINUTES OF Status Conference RE: Related Admiralty Case held before Judge David O. Carter #171 : Case is called. The Court and counsel confer regarding issues to related admiralty case LA CV 22-02153-DOC-(JDEx). Court Reporter: Debbie Gale / Court Smart. (twdb)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 AMENDED NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Third-Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor, identifying TT Club Mutual Insurance Ltd; Fireman's Fund Insurance Company; United States Coast Guard. (Cicala, Conte)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER DATED MAY 19, 2022 by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #236 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr answer now due 6/13/2022, re Errata,, #197 filed by DEFENDANT Capetanissa Maritime Corporation.(Piper, Glen)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs' Jennifer Taylor, Greg Taylor, Charlie's Gyros, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Bentley, Gregory)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement #195 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) #194 filed by ThirdParty Defendant MSC Danit. (Attorney Joseph A Walsh, II added to party MSC Danit(pty:3pd))(Walsh, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 RESPONSE filed by ThirdParty Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor RESPONSIVE BRIEFING ON RELATED ADMIRALTY CASE (Cicala, Conte)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Supplemental Response Briefing on Related Admiralty Case BRIEF filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated Response to Supplemental Briefing on Related Admiralty Case (Hazam, Lexi)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by DEFENDANT Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. ON RELATED ADMIRALTY CASE SUBMITTED regarding Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,, #171 . (Piper, Glen)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER ADVANCING HEARINGS ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS #226 , #227 . The Court previously scheduled joint hearings on the multiple pending Motions to Dismiss for July 11, 2022. In the interests of efficiency, the Court on its own motion ADVANCES the hearings on Defendant V.Ships Greece Ltd.s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 226) and Defendant Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 227) from August 15, 2022 to July 11, 2022. (twdb)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT Third Party Complaint, #123 filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Piper, Glen)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss ALL CAUSES OF ACTION filed by DEFENDANT COSCO Beijing(NAMED AS M/V BEIJING AS THE FILER). Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Glen R Piper added to party COSCO Beijing(pty:3pd)) (Piper, Glen) Modified on 5/6/2022 (twdb).
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DEFENDANT Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.. Motion set for hearing on 8/15/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Piper, Glen)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DEFENDANT V.Ships Greece Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 8/15/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Piper, Glen)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #151 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Larson, Stephen)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 SUPPLEMENT Plaintiffs' Supplemental Briefing on Related Admiralty Case filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulations, #2 Exhibit B - Exemplar Stipulations)(Hazam, Lexi)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 223 SUPPLEMENT Amplify Defendants' Supplemental Briefing on Related Admiralty Case filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON RELATED ADMIRALTY CASE filed by ThirdParty Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,, #171 (Cicala, Conte)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by DEFENDANT Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. RELATED ADMIRALTY CASE SUBMITTED BY SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORPORATION regarding Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Terminate Hearings,,,, #171 . (McCullough, Juliette)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING DATE #214 by Judge David O. Carter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Amplify is granted leave to serve Capetanissa Maritime Corp. with discovery related to jurisdictional issues raised in its Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 169, including Requests for Production of Documents and a Subpoena for Deposition Testimony, to be responded to by Capetanissa no later than 21 days from the date of service. 2. The hearings on the Motion to Quash and Motion to Dismiss of Capetanissa Maritime Corp., ECF No. 169, are continued to July 11, 2022, to be heard with the other Motions to Dismiss in this matter. (lom)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING HEARING SCHEDULE AND BRIEFING DEADLINES FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS #207 by Judge David O. Carter. The Court hereby enters the following briefing schedule: 1. By no later than May 4, 2022, Plaintiffs will file their response to Amplify's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. 2. By no later than May 31, 2022, Amplify will file its reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. 3. By no later than June 13, 2022, Amplify will file its response to Dordellas and MSC's Motion to Dismiss Amplify's Third-Party Complaint and Motion for More Definite Statement. 4. By no later than June 27, 2022, Third-Party Defendants Dordellas and MSC will file their reply in support of their Motions, subject to the outcome of the May 23, 2022 hearing on the Dordellas case. 5. On July 11, 2022, this Court will hear Amplify's, Dordellas and MSCsMotions. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 218 DEFENDANT CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO AMPLIFYS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY AND AN ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING DATE ECF214 re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve Jurisdictional Discovery And An Order Continuing The Hearing Date #214 filed by ThirdParty Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Juliette Bowen McCullough added to party Capetanissa Maritime Corporation(pty:3pd))(McCullough, Juliette)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, John Crowe, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, East Meets West Excursions, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, LBC Seafood, Inc., Tyler Wayman, upon Defendant V. Ships Greece Ltd. served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon V. Ships Greece Ltd. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Larson, Stephen)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 216 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, John Crowe, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, East Meets West Excursions, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, LBC Seafood, Inc., Tyler Wayman, upon Defendant Costamare Shipping Co. S.A. served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Patton, Moreno & Asvat, the Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Larson, Stephen)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, John Crowe, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, East Meets West Excursions, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, LBC Seafood, Inc., Tyler Wayman, upon Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation of Liberia served on 4/22/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The LISCR Trust Co., the Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Larson, Stephen)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 214 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve Jurisdictional Discovery And An Order Continuing The Hearing Date filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/15/2021, 1/19/2022 and 4/13/2022 re Transcript #209 , #212 , #211 , #210 , #208 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 212 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/13/2022 Status V1. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL:DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). ****Transcript may onlybe viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline forRelease of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter orthrough PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any timethrough the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 5/18/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1/19/2022 Status. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL:DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). ****Transcript may onlybe viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline forRelease of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter orthrough PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any timethrough the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 5/18/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/15/2021 V5. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL:DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). ****Transcript may onlybe viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline forRelease of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter orthrough PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any timethrough the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 5/18/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 209 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/15/2021 V3. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL:DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). ****Transcript may onlybe viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline forRelease of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter orthrough PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any timethrough the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 5/18/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/15/2021 Vol. 1. Court Reporter: DEBBIE GALE. Contact via: WEBSITE: www.debbiegale.com or EMAIL:DebbieGaleCSR@gmail.com, 714-558-8141 (all requests must be in writing/no phone orders). ****Transcript may onlybe viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter DEBBIE GALE before the deadline forRelease of Transcript restriction. After transcript release date, it may be still be obtained from the Court Reporter orthrough PACER. (ASCII, Condensed, and Word Indexing/Concordance are also available for purchase at any timethrough the Court Reporter.) Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date.*** Redaction Request due 5/18/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 STIPULATION to Reschedule Stipulation Regarding Hearing Schedule And Briefing Deadlines For Motions To Dismiss filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 206 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #148 as to Defendant V. Ships Greece Ltd. (twdb)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 205 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #148 as to Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation of Liberia (twdb) Modified on 4/21/2022 (twdb).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 204 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #148 as to Defendants Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., (twdb) Modified on 4/21/2022 (twdb).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4/13/2022 12:19 P.M. to 12:34 P.M. & 3:16 P.M. to 3:53 P.M. re Transcript #201 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (aa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 4/13/2022 12:19 P.M. to 12:34 P.M. & 3:16 P.M. to 3:53 P.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2022. (aa)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Errata,, #197 , Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #148 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Errata,, #197 , Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #148 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Errata,, #197 , Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #148 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. correcting Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #148 PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - (Corrected) PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT)(Larson, Stephen)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement #195 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND MOTION TO QUASH #169 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) #194 . The hearings previously set for May 23, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. has been rescheduled to May 23, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. **TIME CHANGE ONLY** THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dca) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Specially Appearing Defendants and Third Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corporation, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Walsh, Joseph)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Specially Appearing Defendants and Third Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corporation, Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Joseph A Walsh, II added to party Dordellas Finance Corporation(pty:3pd), Attorney Joseph A Walsh, II added to party Mediterranean Shipping Company S A (pty:3pd)) (Walsh, Joseph)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 STATEMENT In Rem Appearance of the M/V MSC DANIT; Dordellas Finance Corp.'s Restricted Appearance (Suppl. Adm. Rule E(8)) and Verified Statement of Interest (Supp. Adm. Rule C(6)(A)) filed by Third Party Defendants Dordellas Finance Corporation, MSC Danit (Walsh, Joseph)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, on Costamare Shipping Co., S.A., Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, and V.Ships Greece Ltd served on Plaintiffs Consolidated Class Action Complaint, ECF No. 102; (2) Amplifys Third-Party Complaint Against Third-Party Defendants, ECF No. 123; (3) Summons on a Third-Party Complaint, ECF No. 133; and (4) Plaintiffs First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, ECF No. 148. (Powell, Kevin)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Third-Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor, identifying TT Club Mutual Insurance; Scottsdale Insurance; United States Coast Guard. (Cicala, Conte)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint, #123 filed by Third-Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor.(Cicala, Conte)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS RE SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES by Judge David O. Carter. The parties are hereby ordered to process and promptly make payment on the Special Masters invoices (attached herein). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 STATEMENT IN REM APPEARANCE OF THE M/V BEIJING; CAPET ANISSA MARITIME CORPORATION'S RESTRICTED APPEARANCE (SUPPL. ADM. RULE E(8)) AND VERIFIED STATEMENT OF INTEREST (SUPPL. ADM. RULE C(6)(A)) filed by ThirdParty Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation and the M/V BEIJING, (Piper, Glen)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #172 , Summons Request, #174 , Summons Request, #173 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #148 . The following error(s) was/were found: The parties should be listed on page one of the Amended Complaint, and not listed as et al. If there are too many parties add an attachment naming each plaintiff and defendant. We are unable to issue the summons # 172-174 because of the et al., on the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #148. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Keegan, Christopher)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request #172 , Summons Request #174 , Summons Request #173 . The following error(s) was/were found: Clerk is unable to issue summons on the First Consolidated Complaint. The First consolidate complaint do not name all parties in the caption, but have et als, see FRCP 10 Form of Pleadings. As result clerk cannot issue summons. Therefore, summon request has been forward to the Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #151 filed by Plaintiffs on behalf of all parties Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran.(Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Bongos III Sportfishing LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Bongos Sportfishing LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party John Crowe(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Josh Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Tyler Wayman(pty:pla))(Hazam, Lexi)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Reporter. Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keegan, Christopher)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE #149 by Judge David O. Carter. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS IN PART the Motion and allows the following alternative service of process: 1. On Defendant Costamare Shipping Company S.A. by mail, email, and fax on its registered agent in Panama; 2. On Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corp. of Liberia by mail on its registered agent in Liberia; 3. On Defendant V.Ships Greece, Ltd. by mail to its address of record in Bermuda; 4. On all three Defendants by email to their attorney in this District. (lom)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #166 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew S. Owen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company, designating Mark Holscher as local counsel. (twdb)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #167 Non-Resident Attorney McClain Thompson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company, designating Mark Holscher as local counsel. (twdb)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #168 Non-Resident Attorney Holly Trogdon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company, designating Mark Holscher as local counsel. (twdb)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, John Crowe, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, East Meets West Excursions, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, LBC Seafood, Inc., Tyler Wayman. upon MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/11/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Laurent Audaz. (Larson, Stephen)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, John Crowe, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, East Meets West Excursions, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, LBC Seafood, Inc., Tyler Wayman. upon Dordellas Finance Corp. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/11/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Clementina Diaz de Macias. (Larson, Stephen)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #148 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #148 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, #148 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MINUTES OF Status Conference and Motion for Order Authorizing Service of Defendants Costamare Shipping CO. S.A., Capetanissa Maritime Corp. of Liberia, and V.Ships Greece LTD., Pursuant to Rule 4(F)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Judge David O. Carter. Case called. Appearances made. Also present, Glen Piper on behalf of V. Ships Greece Ltd. and Conte Cicala on behalf of Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. The Court and counsel confer re new motion hearing dates and briefing deadlines. The Court hears arguments on Motion for authorizing Service of Defendants #149 . The Court's order to issue. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale/Court Smart. (rolm)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON RELATED ADMIRALTY CASE by Judge David O. Carter. On March 31, 2022, Dordellas Finance Corp. and MSC Mediterranean Shipping Co. S.A., owners of the motor vessel MSC Danit, filed case No. 2:22-cv-02153-DOC-JDE, seeking exoneration and limitation of liability under admiralty jurisdiction. That case was transferred to this Court on April 6, 2022. The Court now ORDERS all parties in this case and the related Dordellas case to submit supplemental briefing addressing the following issues, and any others the parties wish to address. All parties shall file simultaneous briefing by 4:00 pm Pacific Time on April 29, 2022. All parties shall file responsive briefing by 4:00 pm Pacific Time on May 9, 2022. The Court sets a hearing on these issues for May 23, 2022 at 10:00 am Pacific Time. The Court will continue the hearing on the Motions to Dismiss to a later date. See minute order for further details. (lom)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE Joint Notice of Mediation filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND MOTION TO QUASH filed by DEFENDANT Capetanissa Maritime Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order) (Piper, Glen)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Holly Trogdon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/17/2022, Receipt No. 32964688) filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing - DC, #2 Cert. of Good Standing - VA, #3 Proposed Order) (Holscher, Mark)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney McClain Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/15/2022, Receipt No. 32950905) filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing - DC, #2 Cert. of Good Standing - IL, #3 Cert. of Good Standing - NY, #4 Proposed Order) (Holscher, Mark)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew S. Owen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/18/2022, Receipt No. 32973200) filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing - DC, #2 Cert. of Good Standing - NY, #3 Cert. of Good Standing - TX, #4 Proposed Order) (Holscher, Mark)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark C Holscher counsel for Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Adding Mark Holscher as counsel of record for Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Third Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party Amplify Energy Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party Amplify Energy Corp.(pty:3pp), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party Beta Operating Company, LLC(pty:3pp), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party Beta Operating Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY(pty:dft), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY(pty:3pp))(Holscher, Mark)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #147 Non-Resident Attorney Ross Powell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC and San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company, designating Christopher W. Keegan as local counsel. (twdb)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REPLY in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS COSTAMARE SHIPPING CO. S.A., CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORP. OF LIBERIA, AND V.SHIPS GREECE LTD., PURSUANT TO RULE 4(F)(3) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE #149 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (Larson, Stephen)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #144 Non-Resident Attorney Matthew S. Owen APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp, Defendants. Terming Attorney Matthew S Owen. (twdb)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #141 Non-Resident Attorney Thompson McClain APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp, Defendants. (twdb)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #115 Non-Resident Attorney Sherief Morsy APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Beyond Business Incorporated, Plaintiff, designating Richard D. McCune as local counsel. (twdb) Modified on 3/30/2022 (twdb).
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Denying #143 Non-Resident Attorney Holly Trogdon APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amplify Energy Corp, Defendants. Terming Attorney Holly R Trogdon. (twdb)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #114 Non-Resident Attorney Elaine S. Kusel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Beyond Business Incorporated, Plaintiffs et al, designating Richard D. McCune as local counsel. (twdb)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Specially Appearing for Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co., S.A. and V.Ships Greece Ltd.,OPPOSITION TO JOINT MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE SERVICE [PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, 4(f)(3)] re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS COSTAMARE SHIPPING CO. S.A., CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORP. OF LIBERIA, AND V.SHIPS GREECE LTD., PURSUANT TO RULE 4(F)(3) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE #149 filed by Third Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., V.Ships Greece Ltd.. (Attorney Glen R Piper added to party Capetanissa Maritime Corporation(pty:3pd), Attorney Glen R Piper added to party Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.(pty:3pd), Attorney Glen R Piper added to party V.Ships Greece Ltd.(pty:3pd))(Piper, Glen)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS COSTAMARE SHIPPING CO. S.A., CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORP. OF LIBERIA, AND V.SHIPS GREECE LTD., PURSUANT TO RULE 4(F)(3) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE #149 . The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 4/18/2022 at 8:30 AM has been rescheduled. Motion Hearing reset to 4/13/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by 3rd Party Plaintiffs Beta Operating Company, LLC, Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, upon 3rd Party Defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christine Dohoroty - CFO in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Keegan, Christopher)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #151 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by 3rd Party Plaintiffs Beta Operating Company, LLC, Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. upon Dordellas Finance Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/11/2022, answer due 6/9/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Clementina Diaz de Macias. (Keegan, Christopher)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint #151 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY.(Keegan, Christopher)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keegan, Christopher)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by 3rd Party Plaintiffs Beta Operating Company, LLC, Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. upon MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/11/2022, answer due 6/9/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Laurent Audaz. (Keegan, Christopher)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS COSTAMARE SHIPPING CO. S.A., CAPETANISSA MARITIME CORP. OF LIBERIA, AND V.SHIPS GREECE LTD., PURSUANT TO RULE 4(F)(3) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. Motion set for hearing on 4/18/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Lukken, #2 Declaration of David C. Wright, #3 Exhibit 1 to Wright Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Wright Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Wright Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Wright Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Wright Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Wright Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Wright Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Wright Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Wright Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Wright Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Wright Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 to Wright Declaration, #15 Declaration of John D. Giffin, #16 Exhibit 1 to Giffin Declaration, #17 Exhibit 2 to Giffin Declaration, #18 Proposed Order) (Larson, Stephen)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, Capetanissa Maritime Corporation of Liberia, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY amending Consolidated Complaint,,,, #102 , filed by Plaintiffs Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, John Crowe, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, East Meets West Excursions, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, LBC Seafood, Inc., Tyler Wayman(Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Bongos III Sportfishing LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Bongos Sportfishing LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party John Crowe(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Josh Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Tyler Wayman(pty:pla))(Larson, Stephen)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ross Powell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32983489) filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing - DC, #2 Cert. of Good Standing - VA, #3 Proposed Order) (Keegan, Christopher)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amplify Energy Corp. answer now due 4/19/2022, re Third Party Complaint, #123 filed by Third-Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Conte C Cicala added to party Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor(pty:3pd))(Cicala, Conte)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew S. Owen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32973200) #144 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Holly R. Trogdon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/17/2022, Receip #143 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney McClain Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32950905) #141 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (sbou)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew S. Owen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32973200) filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing - DC, #2 Cert. of Good Standing - NY, #3 Cert. of Good Standing - TX, #4 Proposed Order) (Keegan, Christopher)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Holly R. Trogdon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/17/2022, Receipt No. 32964688) filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing - DC, #2 Cert. of Good Standing - VA, #3 Proposed Order) (Keegan, Christopher)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: In light of the Courts schedule, the Court DENIES Defendants Motion for a Continuance #140 . The Status Conference will remain as scheduled on April 13, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney McClain Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32950905) filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Cert. of Good Standing - DC, #2 Cert. of Good Standing - IL, #3 Cert. of Good Standing - NY, #4 Proposed Order) (Keegan, Christopher)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Status Conference from April 13, 2022 at 10:00 am to April 13, 2022 at 2:00 pm Re: Status Conference - optional html form,, Set/Reset Hearing,, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines, #120 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Motion set for hearing on 4/11/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keegan, Christopher)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES. SEE DOCUMENTS FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third-Party Plaintiffs Beta Operating Company, LLC, Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, upon Third-Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Captain J. Kipling (Kip) Louttit in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Keegan, Christopher)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, John Crowe, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, East Meets West Excursions, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, LBC Seafood, Inc., Tyler Wayman. upon Dordellas Finance Corp. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/24/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Clementina Diaz de Macias. (Larson, Stephen)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, John Crowe, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, East Meets West Excursions, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, LBC Seafood, Inc., Tyler Wayman. upon MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/24/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Laurent Audaz. (Larson, Stephen)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint #124 filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY.(Keegan, Christopher)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation Regarding Briefing Deadlines for the Amplify Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #134 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint, #123 as to Third Party Defendant Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. (twdb)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #123 filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint, #123 as to Third Party Defendant Marine Exchange of Los Angeles Long Beach Harbor. (twdb)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE REQUEST FOR INFORMATION AND MARCH 23, 2022 HEARING filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Blue Pacific Fisheries, Bobs Lemonade, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Bradley Bitton d/b/a Brads Live Local Lobster, Donald C. Brockman, Jack Buttler, Clint Carroll Surf School, Coachs Mediterranean Grill & Bar, Cold Stone Creamery, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Endless Sun Surf School, Goff Tours, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, Michael Jensen, Joshua Tucker, Ketcham Tackle LLC, Kirk Schoonover, LBC Seafood, Inc., Learn To Surf LLC, Steve Legere, Jolynn Mahoney, Patrick Mahoney, Main St. Eyewear & Boutique, N.S.T., a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, MICHAELANGELO SAINT THOMAS, Newport Surfrider, LLC, Mike Owens, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Gina Rosansky, Steven Rosansky, Tyler Wayman, James Whelan, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Zacks By The Beach, Ziggys On Main (filed on behalf of the Special Masters) (Hazam, Lexi)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/23/22 re Transcript #128 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gale, Debbie) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/23/2022 Status. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: DEBBIE GALE - debbiegale.com 714-55-8141, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/24/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2022. (Gale, Debbie)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint, #123 filed by Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Keegan, Christopher)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint #124 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keegan, Christopher)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants Capetanissa Maritime Corporation of Liberia, Costamare Shipping Co. S.A., Dordellas Finance Corp., MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company, MSC Danit, V.Ships Greece Ltd., COSCO Beijing, Marine Exchange of Los Angeles-Long Beach Harbor d/b/a Marine Exchange of Southern California ; Jury Demand, filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Beta Operating Company, LLC.(Keegan, Christopher)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Gregory Hexberg, Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc., San Pedro Bait Co., Ivar Southern, Linda Southern. (Hazam, Lexi)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: SPECIAL MASTERS' INVOICES. (twdb)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING AMENDED STIPULATION RE REMOVAL AND PRESERVATION OF PORTION OF SAN PEDRO BAN PIPELINE, by Judge David O. Carter #119 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Order RE: Hearings on Discovery and, Motions to Dismiss. The Court makes the following orders: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Status Conference set for 4/13/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Hearing on any Motion to Dismiss filed by the parties will be set for May 23, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Amended STIPULATION for Order on Amended Stipulation re Removal and Preservation of Portion of San Pedro Bay Pipeline filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY.(Attorney Christopher William Keegan added to party SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY(pty:dft))(Keegan, Christopher)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, East Meets West Excursions, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Bongos Sportfishing LLC, John Pedicini, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, John Crowe, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, Josh Hernandez, Quality Sea Food, Inc., LBC Seafood, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, Tyler Wayman, upon Defendant MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company served on 2/11/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BONNIE YERRY, Registered Agent, in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Larson, Stephen)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Status Conference set for 2/23/2022 has been ADVANCED to 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. **TIME CHANGE ONLY** THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven Gregory Tidrick counsel for Plaintiff N.S.T., a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, MICHAELANGELO SAINT THOMAS. Adding Joel B. Young as counsel of record for N.S.T., a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, MICHAELANGELO SAINT THOMAS for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff N.S.T., a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, MICHAELANGELO SAINT THOMAS. (Attorney Steven Gregory Tidrick added to party N.S.T., a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, MICHAELANGELO SAINT THOMAS(pty:pla))(Tidrick, Steven)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sherief Morsy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32779026) filed by Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (McCune, Richard)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elaine S. Kusel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32778958) filed by Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. (McCune, Richard)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 21 DAY Summons Issued re Consolidated Complaint, #102 as to defendant MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company. (twdb)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 21 DAY Summons Issued re Consolidated Complaint, #102 as to defendant Dordellas Finance Corp. (twdb)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 21 DAY Summons Issued re Consolidated Complaint, #102 as to defendant Costamare Shipping Co. S.A.. (twdb)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 21 DAY Summons Issued re Consolidated Complaint #102 as to defendant Capetanissa Maritime Corporation of Liberia. (twdb)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Consolidated Complaint,,,, #102 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Consolidated Complaint,,,, #102 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Consolidated Complaint,,,, #102 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Consolidated Complaint,,,, #102 filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Bongos III Sportfishing LLC, Bongos Sportfishing LLC, Donald C. Brockman, John Crowe, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Josh Hernandez, Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc., John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Tyler Wayman, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff James Whelan. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Casey, David)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Ketcham Tackle LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY. (Williams, Steven)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven Noel Williams on behalf of Plaintiff Ketcham Tackle LLC (Attorney Steven Noel Williams added to party Ketcham Tackle LLC(pty:pla))(Williams, Steven)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) WITH JURY DEMAND related to: #31 Amended Complaint/Petition,, filed by Plaintiffs East Meets West Excursions, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., John Pedicini, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Donald C. Brockman, Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Heidi M. Jacques, LBC Seafood, Inc.(Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Banzai Surf Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party East Meets West Excursions(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party John Pedicini(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Marysue Pedicini(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Quality Sea Food, Inc.(pty:pla))(Larson, Stephen)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Seyed Abbas Kazerounian and Jason A. Ibey as counsel of record filed by Plaintiffs Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proof of Service) (Kazerounian, Seyed)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #97 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation (for order). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RE: DOCUMENT AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION PRODUCTION PROTOCOL by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, re Stipulation for Order #96 . (see document for details) (hr)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Status Conference set for 2/23/2022 is rescheduled to 02:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. **TIME CHANGE ONLY**THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint STIPULATION re Removal and Preservation of Portion of San Pedro Bay Pipeline filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Keegan, Christopher)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Joint STIPULATION for Order RE: DOCUMENT AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION PRODUCTION PROTOCOL filed by Interim Co-Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Blue Pacific Fisheries, Bobs Lemonade, Bradley Bitton d/b/a Brads Live Local Lobster, Donald C. Brockman, Jack Buttler, Charlie's Gyros, Inc., Clint Carroll Surf School, Coachs Mediterranean Grill & Bar, Cold Stone Creamery, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Endless Sun Surf School, Daniel Garrie, Goff Tours, Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, Gregory Hexberg, Heidi M. Jacques, Michael Jensen, Joshua Tucker, Kirk Schoonover, LBC Seafood, Inc., Learn To Surf LLC, Steve Legere, Jolynn Mahoney, Patrick Mahoney, Main St. Eyewear & Boutique, Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc., Newport Surfrider, LLC, Bradley O'Brien, Mike Owens, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Gina Rosansky, Steven Rosansky, San Pedro Bait Co., James L. Smith, Ivar Southern, Linda Southern, Greg Taylor, Jennifer Taylor, James Whelan, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Zacks By The Beach, Ziggys On Main.(Hazam, Lexi)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: DEADLINES AND STATUS CONFERENCE #93 . The parties from the related criminal matter, 8:21-cr- 00226, were also present. With the parties agreement, the Court sets the following deadlines: SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Status Conference continued to 2/23/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTES OF Status Conference (Held and Continued) before Judge David O. Carter: The status conference is continued to February 24, 2022 at 8:30 AM. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale. (twdb)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED MINUTES OF Status Conference #93 (Held and Continued) before Judge David O. Carter. (lom)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Maxwell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dunlavey, Wilson)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Report of Special Master Panel Regarding January 14, 2022, Meeting with Counsel and ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. (twdb)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Reporter. Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keegan, Christopher)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: UPCOMING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter: On 1/12/2022, the Court issued an Order in the related criminal matter, United States v. Amplify Energy Corp. et al. (No. 8:21-cr-00226-DOC), stating the following: As per its prior Order in No. 8:21-cv-01628-DOC-JDE (Dkt. #44 ), the Court is holding a Status Conference on 1/19/2022 at 8:30 AM., to address discovery issues. The Court invites the parties in this related criminal matter to attend the Status Conference to discuss coordination of discovery between the cases. (jp)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge David O. Carter. The Court sets the Status Conference, as mentioned in Order #44 , for 1/19/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John D. Early re Stipulation for Protective Order #86 . (see document for details) (hr)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Banzai Surf Company, LLC, Beyond Business Incorporated, Blue Pacific Fisheries, Bobs Lemonade, Bradley Bitton d/b/a Brads Live Local Lobster, Donald C. Brockman, Jack Buttler, Charlie's Gyros, Inc., Clint Carroll Surf School, Coachs Mediterranean Grill & Bar, Cold Stone Creamery, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., East Meets West Excursions, Endless Sun Surf School, Daniel Garrie, Goff Tours, Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, Gregory Hexberg, Heidi M. Jacques, Michael Jensen, Joshua Tucker, Kirk Schoonover, LBC Seafood, Inc., Learn To Surf LLC, Steve Legere, Jolynn Mahoney, Patrick Mahoney, Main St. Eyewear & Boutique, Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc., Newport Surfrider, LLC, Bradley O'Brien, Mike Owens, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Quality Sea Food, Inc., Gina Rosansky, Steven Rosansky, San Pedro Bait Co., James L. Smith, Ivar Southern, Linda Southern, Greg Taylor, Jennifer Taylor, James Whelan, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran, Zacks By The Beach, Ziggys On Main.(Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Banzai Surf Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Blue Pacific Fisheries(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Bobs Lemonade(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Bradley Bitton d/b/a Brads Live Local Lobster(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Jack Buttler(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Clint Carroll Surf School(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Coachs Mediterranean Grill & Bar(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Cold Stone Creamery(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Endless Sun Surf School(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Daniel Garrie(pty:sm), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Goff Tours(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Gregory Hexberg(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Joshua Tucker(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Kirk Schoonover(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Learn To Surf LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Steve Legere(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Main St. Eyewear & Boutique(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Newport Surfrider, LLC (pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Bradley O'Brien(pty:sm), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Quality Sea Food, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party San Pedro Bait Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party James L. Smith(pty:sm), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Ivar Southern(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Linda Southern(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party James Whelan(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Zacks By The Beach(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Ziggys On Main(pty:pla))(Hazam, Lexi)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kelly K. McNabb on behalf of Plaintiffs Blue Pacific Fisheries, Donald C. Brockman, Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Gregory Hexberg, Heidi M. Jacques, Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc., San Pedro Bait Co., Ivar Southern, Linda Southern (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Appearance PHV)(Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Blue Pacific Fisheries(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Gregory Hexberg(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party San Pedro Bait Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Ivar Southern(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly K. McNabb added to party Linda Southern(pty:pla))(McNabb, Kelly)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SPECIAL MASTERS' ORDER RE: JANUARY 14, 2022 HEARING by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 (Attorney James Thomas Brett added to party Jack Buttler(pty:pla), Attorney James Thomas Brett added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney James Thomas Brett added to party Steve Legere(pty:pla), Attorney James Thomas Brett added to party Quality Sea Food, Inc.(pty:pla))(Brett, James)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Erica A Maharg counsel for Plaintiffs Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc., Steve Legere, Quality Sea Food, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiffs Quality Sea Food, Inc.; Jack Buttler; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Steve Legere. (Attorney Erica A Maharg added to party Jack Buttler(pty:pla), Attorney Erica A Maharg added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Erica A Maharg added to party Steve Legere(pty:pla), Attorney Erica A Maharg added to party Quality Sea Food, Inc.(pty:pla))(Maharg, Erica)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason Robert Flanders counsel for Plaintiffs Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc., Steve Legere, Quality Sea Food, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiffs Quality Sea Food, Inc.; Jack Buttler; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Steve Legere. (Attorney Jason Robert Flanders added to party Jack Buttler(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Robert Flanders added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Robert Flanders added to party Steve Legere(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Robert Flanders added to party Quality Sea Food, Inc.(pty:pla))(Flanders, Jason)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Christopher Maclear counsel for Plaintiffs Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc., Steve Legere, Quality Sea Food, Inc.. Adding Matthew C. Maclear as counsel of record for Quality Sea Food, Inc.; Jack Buttler; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Steve Legere for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Quality Sea Food, Inc.; Jack Buttler; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Steve Legere. (Attorney Matthew Christopher Maclear added to party Jack Buttler(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Christopher Maclear added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Christopher Maclear added to party Steve Legere(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Christopher Maclear added to party Quality Sea Food, Inc.(pty:pla))(Maclear, Matthew)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Seabold Casey, Jr counsel for Plaintiff James Whelan. Adding David S. Casey, Jr. as counsel of record for James Whelan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff James Whelan. (Attorney David Seabold Casey, Jr added to party James Whelan(pty:pla))(Casey, David)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff East Meets West Excursions for Court Reporter. Court will contact Maxwell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dunlavey, Wilson)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff East Meets West Excursions for Court Reporter. Court will contact Maxwell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dunlavey, Wilson)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Frederick Schenk counsel for Plaintiff James Whelan. Adding Frederick Schenk as counsel of record for James Whelan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff James Whelan. (Attorney Frederick Schenk added to party James Whelan(pty:pla))(Schenk, Frederick)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (G-120), #74 . The following error(s) was found: PLEASE FILE A G-120 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FORM FOR EACH COURT REPORTER. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Prado, Araceli) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff East Meets West Excursions for Court Reporter. Court will contact Maxwell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dunlavey, Wilson)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (G-120), #71 . The following error(s) was found: THIS HEARING WAS NOT DIGITALLY RECORDED. THE HEARING ON 12-15-21 WAS ATTENDED BY TWO COURT REPORTERS. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Montes, Janelly) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff East Meets West Excursions for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Maxell Lucas at mlucas@lchb.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Dunlavey, Wilson)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 (Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Banzai Surf Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Bobs Lemonade(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Bradley Bitton d/b/a Brads Live Local Lobster(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Clint Carroll Surf School(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Coachs Mediterranean Grill & Bar(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Cold Stone Creamery(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Endless Sun Surf School(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Goff Tours(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Joshua Tucker(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Kirk Schoonover(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Learn To Surf LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Main St. Eyewear & Boutique(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Zacks By The Beach(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah Brown added to party Ziggys On Main(pty:pla))(Brown, Hannah)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 (Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Banzai Surf Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Bobs Lemonade(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Bradley Bitton d/b/a Brads Live Local Lobster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Clint Carroll Surf School(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Coachs Mediterranean Grill & Bar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Cold Stone Creamery(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Endless Sun Surf School(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Goff Tours(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Joshua Tucker(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Kirk Schoonover(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Learn To Surf LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Main St. Eyewear & Boutique(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Zacks By The Beach(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party Ziggys On Main(pty:pla))(Weil, Kelly)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 (Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Banzai Surf Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Bobs Lemonade(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Bradley Bitton d/b/a Brads Live Local Lobster(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Clint Carroll Surf School(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Coachs Mediterranean Grill & Bar(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Cold Stone Creamery(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Endless Sun Surf School(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Goff Tours(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Joshua Tucker(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Kirk Schoonover(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Learn To Surf LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Main St. Eyewear & Boutique(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Zacks By The Beach(pty:pla), Attorney Gary A Praglin added to party Ziggys On Main(pty:pla))(Praglin, Gary)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 (Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Banzai Surf Company, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Endless Sun Surf School(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Clint Carroll Surf School(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Learn To Surf LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Goff Tours(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Zacks By The Beach(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Ziggys On Main(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Bobs Lemonade(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Main St. Eyewear & Boutique(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Coachs Mediterranean Grill & Bar(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Cold Stone Creamery(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Bradley Bitton d/b/a Brads Live Local Lobster(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Kirk Schoonover(pty:pla), Attorney Robert B Hutchinson added to party Joshua Tucker(pty:pla))(Hutchinson, Robert)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Wilson M Dunlavey on behalf of Plaintiffs Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc., Blue Pacific Fisheries, Ivar Southern, Linda Southern, Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc., San Pedro Bait Co., Donald C. Brockman, Heidi M. Jacques, Gregory Hexberg (Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Davey's Locker Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Blue Pacific Fisheries(pty:pla), Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Ivar Southern(pty:pla), Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Linda Southern(pty:pla), Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Newport Landing Sportfishing, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party San Pedro Bait Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Donald C. Brockman(pty:pla), Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Heidi M. Jacques(pty:pla), Attorney Wilson M Dunlavey added to party Gregory Hexberg(pty:pla))(Dunlavey, Wilson)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patricia Camille Guerra counsel for Plaintiff James Whelan. Adding Patricia Camille Guerra as counsel of record for James Whelan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff James Whelan. (Attorney Patricia Camille Guerra added to party James Whelan(pty:pla))(Guerra, Patricia)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gayle M Blatt counsel for Plaintiff James Whelan. Adding Gayle M. Blatt as counsel of record for James Whelan for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff James Whelan. (Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party James Whelan(pty:pla))(Blatt, Gayle)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Request and ORDER for Exemption from Pacer by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis A Bottini, Jr counsel for Plaintiff Newport Surfrider, LLC. Adding Francis A. Bottini, Jr. as counsel of record for Newport Surfrider, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Newport Surfrider, LLC. (Attorney Francis A Bottini, Jr added to party Newport Surfrider, LLC (pty:pla))(Bottini, Francis)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hannah E Mohr counsel for Plaintiffs Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc., Steve Legere, Quality Sea Food, Inc.. Adding Hannah E. Mohr as counsel of record for Quality Sea Food, Inc., Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc., Steve Legere for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Quality Sea Food, Inc., Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc., Steve Legere. (Attorney Hannah E Mohr added to party Jack Buttler(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah E Mohr added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah E Mohr added to party Steve Legere(pty:pla), Attorney Hannah E Mohr added to party Quality Sea Food, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mohr, Hannah)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul A Matiasic counsel for Plaintiffs Quality Sea Food, Inc., Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc., Steve Legere. Adding Paul A. Matiasic as counsel of record for Quality Sea Food, Inc.; Jack Buttler; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Steve Legere for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Quality Sea Food, Inc.; Jack Buttler; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Steve Legere. (Attorney Paul A Matiasic added to party Quality Sea Food, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul A Matiasic added to party Jack Buttler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul A Matiasic added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul A Matiasic added to party Steve Legere(pty:pla))(Matiasic, Paul)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Consent and Affidavit of Special Master Bradley O'Brien, Esq, filed by Special Master Bradley O'Brien. (twdb)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE Consent and Affidavit of Special Master Hon. James L. Smith (RET.). (twdb)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Consent and Affidavit of Special Master Daniel Garrie, Esq (twdb)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTERS by Judge David O. Carter. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lexi J Hazam counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Beyond Business Incorporated, Charlie's Gyros, Inc., Greg Taylor, Jennifer Taylor, Plaintiffs East Meets West Excursions, Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, Michael Jensen, Jolynn Mahoney, Patrick Mahoney, Mike Owens, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Gina Rosansky, Steven Rosansky, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. Adding Lexi J. Hazam, Interim Co-Lead Counsel as counsel of record for Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:conpla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Charlie's Gyros, Inc. (pty:conpla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party East Meets West Excursions(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Michael Jensen(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Jolynn Mahoney(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Patrick Mahoney(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Mike Owens(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party John Pedicini(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Marysue Pedicini(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Gina Rosansky(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Steven Rosansky(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Greg Taylor(pty:conpla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Jennifer Taylor(pty:conpla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Chandralekha Wickramasekaran(pty:pla), Attorney Lexi J Hazam added to party Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran(pty:pla))(Hazam, Lexi)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STATEMENT Defendants' Consent to Proposed Special Masters filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY (Keegan, Christopher)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Joseph Bedigian counsel for Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. Adding Andrew J. Bedigian as counsel of record for BEYOND BUSINESS INCORPORATED, d/b/a BIG FISH BAIT & TACKLE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff BEYOND BUSINESS INCORPORATED, d/b/a BIG FISH BAIT & TACKLE. (Attorney Andrew Joseph Bedigian added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:conpla))(Bedigian, Andrew)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rick Lloyd Richmond counsel for Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. Adding Rick Richmond as counsel of record for BEYOND BUSINESS INCORPORATED, d/b/a BIG FISH BAIT & TACKLE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff BEYOND BUSINESS INCORPORATED, d/b/a BIG FISH BAIT & TACKLE. (Attorney Rick Lloyd Richmond added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:conpla))(Richmond, Rick)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven E Bledsoe counsel for Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. Adding Steven E. Bledsoe as counsel of record for BEYOND BUSINESS INCORPORATED, d/b/a BIG FISH BAIT & TACKLE for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff BEYOND BUSINESS INCORPORATED, d/b/a BIG FISH BAIT & TACKLE. (Attorney Steven E Bledsoe added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:conpla))(Bledsoe, Steven)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew William Clark counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Charlie's Gyros, Inc., Greg Taylor, Jennifer Taylor. Filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs Charlie's Gyros, Inc., Jennifer Taylor, Greg Taylor. (Attorney Matthew William Clark added to party Charlie's Gyros, Inc. (pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew William Clark added to party Greg Taylor(pty:conpla), Attorney Matthew William Clark added to party Jennifer Taylor(pty:conpla))(Clark, Matthew)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Darren O. Aitken on behalf of Plaintiffs East Meets West Excursions, Michael Jensen, Jolynn Mahoney, Patrick Mahoney, Mike Owens, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Gina Rosansky, Steven Rosansky (Aitken, Darren)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Darren O. Aitken on behalf of Plaintiffs East Meets West Excursions, Michael Jensen, Jolynn Mahoney, Patrick Mahoney, Mike Owens, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini, Gina Rosansky, Steven Rosansky (Aitken, Darren)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Darren O. Aitken on behalf of Plaintiffs East Meets West Excursions, Mike Owens, Michael Jensen, Patrick Mahoney, Jolynn Mahoney, Steven Rosansky, Gina Rosansky, John Pedicini, Marysue Pedicini (Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party East Meets West Excursions(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Mike Owens(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Michael Jensen(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Patrick Mahoney(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Jolynn Mahoney(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Steven Rosansky(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Gina Rosansky(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party John Pedicini(pty:pla), Attorney Darren O. Aitken added to party Marysue Pedicini(pty:pla))(Aitken, Darren)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Consent to Special Masters' Appointment filed by Plaintiffs Beyond Business Incorporated, Charlie's Gyros, Inc., Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, Greg Taylor, Jennifer Taylor, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Larson, Stephen)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen Gerard Larson counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Beyond Business Incorporated, Charlie's Gyros, Inc., Greg Taylor, Jennifer Taylor, Plaintiffs Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. Adding Stephen G. Larson, Interim Co-Lead Counsel, as counsel of record for Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs and the Proposed Class. (Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:conpla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Charlie's Gyros, Inc. (pty:conpla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Greg Taylor(pty:conpla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Jennifer Taylor(pty:conpla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Chandralekha Wickramasekaran(pty:pla), Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran(pty:pla))(Larson, Stephen)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory L. Bentley counsel for Consol Plaintiffs Charlie's Gyros, Inc., Jennifer Taylor, Greg Taylor. Filed by Consolidated Plaintiff's Plaintiffs Charlie's Gyros, Inc., Jennifer Taylor, Greg Taylor. (Attorney Gregory L. Bentley added to party Charlie's Gyros, Inc. (pty:conpla), Attorney Gregory L. Bentley added to party Jennifer Taylor(pty:conpla), Attorney Gregory L. Bentley added to party Greg Taylor(pty:conpla))(Bentley, Gregory)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND APPOINTING INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL by Judge David O. Carter. All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, 8:21-cv-01628-DOC-JDE. Any party or counsel not listed on the low number case shall file a Notice of Appearance in that case. The consolidated complaint(s) shall be filed by Friday January 28, 2022. re Order #38 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark I Richards counsel for Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. Filed by Consolidated Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle. (Attorney Mark I Richards added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:conpla))(Richards, Mark)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James G Perry counsel for Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. Filed by Consolidated Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle. (Attorney James G Perry added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:conpla))(Perry, James)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David C Wright counsel for Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. Filed by Consolidated Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle. (Attorney David C Wright added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:conpla))(Wright, David)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard D McCune counsel for Consol Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated. Filed by Consolidated Plaintiff Beyond Business Incorporated d/b/a Big Fish Bait & Tackle. (Attorney Richard D McCune added to party Beyond Business Incorporated(pty:conpla))(McCune, Richard)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter.Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Montes, Janelly)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND APPOINTING INTERIM CO LEAD COUNSEL by Judge David O. Carter. All future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, 8:21-cv-01628-DOC-JDE. Any party or counsel not listed on the low number case shall file a Notice of Appearance in that case. The consolidated complaint(s) shall be filed by Friday January 28, 2022. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY for Court Reporter. Court will contact Adrienne Levin at adrienne.levin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Keegan, Christopher)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: Case is called. The Court and counsel confer re Interim co-lead counsel designation. Court Reporter: Debbie Gale, Debbie Hino-Spaan. (twdb)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Court Reporter.Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (ha)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason A Ibey counsel for Plaintiff Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr. Adding Jason A. Ibey as counsel of record for Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr.; Chanralekha Wickramasekaran; Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr.; Chanralekha Wickramasekaran; Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jason A Ibey added to party Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr(pty:pla))(Ibey, Jason)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian counsel for Plaintiff Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr. Adding Abbas Kazerounian as counsel of record for Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr.; Chanralekha Wickramasekaran; Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr.; Chanralekha Wickramasekaran; Rajasekaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRELIMINARY REPORT of IN SUPPORT OF CONSOLIDATION AND APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL filed by Plaintiffs Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Alex R. Straus, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Straus, Alex)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company, LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Peter Moses Gutierrez, Jr, Chandralekha Wickramasekaran, Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran(Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Chandralekha Wickramasekaran(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Rajaskaran Wickramasekaran(pty:pla))(Straus, Alex)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 28 days, filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Request: ADR Procedure Selection)(Keegan, Christopher)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CASE SCHEDULING #28 by Judge David O. Carter. In the event the Court consolidates some or all of the related cases, Plaintiffs in the putative class action cases shall file a consolidated amended complaint or complaints no later than 30 days after the appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. (See document for further details). (jp)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 60 days after consolidated amended complaint or complaint