Luz H. Guzman v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: LUZ GUZMAN and Luz H. Guzman
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY, David Wilsons Ford of Orange and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01655
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
2 Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court - Central Justice Center. Case number: 30-02021-01196651-CU-BC-CJC. (jp)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #11 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Motion is GRANTED. This action will be remanded to state court forthwith. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) See document for further information. (jp)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #11 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for June 23, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., is VACATED, and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #11 filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K)(Law, Daniel)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #11 filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. (Law, Daniel)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Luz H. Guzman(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #11 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of M. Mortenson)(Jun, Patricia)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice of Electronic Filing re Scheduling Order,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #26 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 23 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #25 , Statement #24 e-mailed to Karin Kuemerle bounced due to 550-5.4.1 Recipient address rejected. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 12/5/2023 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/16/2023 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 9/8/2022. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 7/20/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions: 8/24/2023. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 9/7/2023. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 10/26/2023. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 11/2/2023. (See document for further information). (jp)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STATEMENT Case Management filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court hereby RESETS the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #11 for June 23, 2022 at 10:00 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Please refer to Order for complete details. (jp)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Luz H. Guzman for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Luz H. Guzman(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 22-074) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Slaughter, Fred W., this case is transferred from Judge Josephine L. Staton to the calendar of Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01655-FWS-ADSx. (sn)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Josephine L. Staton - Effective Monday, March 21, 2022, Judge Josephine L. Staton will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 8A, on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8A of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. For additional information regarding mandatory chambers copies and the use of Zoom hearings in civil matters, please refer to Judge Staton's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website: https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-josephine-l-staton. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than March 31, 2023. (dca)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (dca)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 2/25/2022 is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 4/22/2022. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 1/20/2023. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 2/3/2023. Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: 2/3/2023. Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: 3/3/2023. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 3/24/2023. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 3/31/2023. Last Day to File Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions: 9/15/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2023 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman.. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman, identifying Luz H. Guzman and Strategic Legal Practices, APC. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #11 filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. Motion set for hearing on 7/8/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Luz H. Guzman(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2022 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (dca)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants David Wilsons Ford of Orange, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman. Filed in State Court on 10/6/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 10/8/2021 (car).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Luz H. Guzman pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to David Wilsons Ford of Orange Without prejudice. Filed in State Court on 9/7/2021 Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. Filed in State Court on 6/9/2021 submitted with Attachment 6 to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney David M Keithly added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(car)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, (Mortenson, Michael)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Mortenson, Michael)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from ORANGE, case number 30-2021-01196651-CU-BCCJC Receipt No: ACACDC-32113596 - Fee: $402, filed by DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mortenson, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of M. Mortenson, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of M. Mortenson) (Attorney Michael Donn Mortenson added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Mortenson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luz H. Guzman v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUZ GUZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz H. Guzman
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Donn Mortenson
Represented By: Patricia H Jun
Represented By: David M Keithly
Represented By: Craig A Taggart
Represented By: Patricia H. Jun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wilsons Ford of Orange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?