Trung Huynh v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Trung Huynh
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Ken Grody Ford and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01768
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #33 Joint Stipulation to Resolve Costs and Expenses and Request for Entry of Judgment. Judgment entered in the amount of $28,500, payable to Plaintiffs' counsel, Strategic Legal Practices, APC., within 60 days. (twdb)
March 16, 2023 Filing 33 REQUEST for Judgment for Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses filed by Trung Huynh Trung Huynh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Resolve Costs and Expenses and Request for Entry of Judgment) (Dolin, Tionna)
February 27, 2023 Filing 32 JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney, in favor of Trung Huynh against Ford Motor Company Pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68. Related to: REQUEST #30 . (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb)
February 27, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: REQUEST #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
February 24, 2023 Filing 30 Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiff Trung Huynh (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabieian, Debora) Modified on 2/27/2023 (twdb).
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES. The parties have advised the Court that they have reached a settlement. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the pretrial conference set for February 27, 2023 and the trial set for March 7, 2023. (twdb)
January 27, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice (Other) #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 12, 2023 Filing 27 Notice Notice of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Trung Huynh. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 15, 2022 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT on Alternative Dispute Resolution Status - Joint filed by Plaintiff Trung Huynh. (Whang, Steven)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Joint Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order #23 . ( All Discovery cut-off 12/19/2022.) (twdb)
October 20, 2022 Filing 24 [PROPOSED ORDER, filed as] STIPULATION for Order Order re Joint Stip to Modify Scheduling Order Ford Motor Company.(Won, Jonathan) Modified on 10/21/2022 (twdb).
October 20, 2022 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Discovery Cut-off Ford Motor Company.(Won, Jonathan)
October 19, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven Whang counsel for Plaintiff Trung Huynh. Adding Steven Whang as counsel of record for Trung Huynh for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Trung Huynh. (Attorney Steven Whang added to party Trung Huynh(pty:pla))(Whang, Steven)
July 28, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tionna Dolin on behalf of Plaintiff Trung Huynh (Dolin, Tionna)
July 28, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Trung Huynh. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Trung Huynh. (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Trung Huynh. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Trung Huynh for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Trung Huynh. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Trung Huynh(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 10, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiff Trung Huynh. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Trung Huynh for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Trung Huynh. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Trung Huynh(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 29, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Trung Huynh. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Trung Huynh. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 10/27/2022. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 12/19/2022. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 11/10/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2023 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2023 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
December 30, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 court days, filed by Plaintiff Trung Huynh.. (Kuemerle, Karin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on January 6, 2022. (rrp)
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:21-cv-01768 CJC (DFMx). (ghap)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form, #7 . Document # 7 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk failed to attach the entire image of the new action. (ghap)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 10/25/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 8] NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:21-cv-01768 CJC (DFMx). (ghap) Modified on 10/25/2021 (ghap).
October 21, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trung Huynh, upon Defendant Ford Motor Company served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/7/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
October 21, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company, Ken Grody Ford. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Trung Huynh. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/29/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO WON DECLARATION) (ghap) Modified on 10/25/2021 (ghap).
October 21, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Trung Huynh, upon Defendant Ken Grody Ford served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessica Acedo, Receptionist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/7/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
October 21, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Ken Grody Ford without prejudice filed by plaintiff Trung Huynh. (FILE IN STATE COURT ON 9/21/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C TO WON DECLARATION) (ghap)
October 21, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON A)(ghap)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation. Amendment to Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 (Won, Jonathan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior, case number 30-2021-01208017-CU-BC-NJC with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 10/21/2021, receipt number 32194764), filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation.(Won, Jonathan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #1 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 10/21/2021. (Won, Jonathan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation, identifying State Street Corporation; BlackRock, Inc.; The VanGuard Group. (Won, Jonathan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior, case number 30-2021-01208017-CU-BC-NJC with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 10/21/2021, receipt number 32194764), filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of H. Paul Efstratis in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration of Jonathan Won in Support of Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Removal) (Attorney Jonathan Won added to party Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation(pty:dft))(Won, Jonathan)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, a Delaware corporation. (Won, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trung Huynh v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trung Huynh
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Steven Whang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jonathan Won
Represented By: Harry Paul Efstratis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Grody Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?