Pamela Lord v. Lowes Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PAMELA LORD
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC, Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01780
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case and for substitution #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2022 has been rescheduled to 1/31/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Pamela Lord. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gabriel M. Mendoza) (Mendoza, Gabriel)
December 15, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC.. (Rivera, Diana)
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Diana Michelle Rivera counsel for Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. Adding Diana M. Rivera as counsel of record for Defendant, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Defendant, Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attorney Diana Michelle Rivera added to party Lowes Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft))(Rivera, Diana)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by PLAINTIFF Pamela Lord.. (Mendoza, Gabriel)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
October 27, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Lowes Companies, Inc., Lowes Home Centers, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Pamela Lord. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/18/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 27, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/21/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 27, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Pamela Lord, upon Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC served on 9/27/2021, answer due 10/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendants in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/5/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 27, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/21/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 27, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Pamela Lord pursuant to Cal. Rules of Court, rules 3.760 and 3.770 as to Lowes Companies, Inc. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/26/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 (Re: Doc No. 1-5) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Lowe's Home Centers, LLC)(Forman, Stephanie)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4 DEFENDANT LOWES HOME CENTERS, LLCS CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC, (Forman, Stephanie)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC.. (Forman, Stephanie)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Forman, Stephanie)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01216572-CU-PO-NJC Receipt No: ACACDC-32223714 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Statement of Damages, #4 Exhibit D - Misc. Documents, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Proof of Service on Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, #6 Exhibit F - Lowe's Answer to Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - Lowe's Demand for Jury, #8 Exhibit H - Plaintiff's Purported Service on Lowe's Companies, Inc., #9 Exhibit I - Plaintiff's Proof of Service on Lowe's Companies, Inc., #10 Exhibit J - Conformed copy of Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of Lowe's Companies, Inc., #11 Proof of Service of Removal Docs on Opposing Counsel) (Attorney Stephanie Forman added to party LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC(pty:dft))(Forman, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pamela Lord v. Lowes Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA LORD
Represented By: Brian W Easton
Represented By: Gabriel Michael Cortez Mendoza
Represented By: Mani S Navab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWE'S HOME CENTERS, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Diana Michelle Rivera
Represented By: Roger Willner Backlar
Represented By: Stephanie Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?