Joaquin Alvarado v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joaquin Alvarado
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Huntington Beach Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01848
Filed: November 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 6, 2022 Filing 33 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court - Central Justice Center. Case number: 30-02021-01208307-CU-BC-NJC. (jp)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Motion to Remand (Mot. #16 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. This action is hereby REMANDED to the Superior Court of California (County of Orange), Case No. 30-2021-01208307-CU-BC-CJC. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) See document for further information. (jp)
May 6, 2022 Filing 31 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Before the Court is Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Case to the State of California for the County of Orange #16 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for at 10:30 a.m., is VACATED, and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (droj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 26, 2022 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Joaquin Alvarado for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Joaquin Alvarado(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 22, 2022 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to of the State of California for the County of Orange #16 filed by Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado. (Law, Daniel)
April 22, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to of the State of California for the County of Orange #16 filed by Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado. (Law, Daniel)
April 15, 2022 Filing 27 Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to of the State of California for the County of Orange #16 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF CANDACE J. FRAZIER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FCA US LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND)(Frazier, Candace)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth re Stipulation for Protective Order #24 . See document for further details. (et)
March 7, 2022 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Josephine L. Staton - Effective Monday, March 21, 2022, Judge Josephine L. Staton will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 8A, on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8A of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. For additional information regarding mandatory chambers copies and the use of Zoom hearings in civil matters, please refer to Judge Staton's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website: https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-josephine-l-staton. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 28, 2022 Filing 24 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant FCA US LLC FCA US LLC.(Sachs, Michael)
February 17, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant FCA US LLC FCA US LLC.(Sachs, Michael)
February 15, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Benjamin Sachs counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Michael B. Sachs as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Sachs, Michael)
January 13, 2022 Filing 21 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (mku)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than May 26, 2023. (mku)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 1/14/2022 is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 3/15/2022. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 11/4/2022. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 11/18/2022. Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: 11/18/2022. Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: 12/16/2022. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 1/13/2023. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 5/26/2023. Last Day to File Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions: 6/30/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2023 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
December 30, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado.. (Kuemerle, Karin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to of the State of California for the County of Orange #16 filed by Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado. (Kuemerle, Karin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to of the State of California for the County of Orange filed by Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Karin Kuemerle in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Kuemerle, Karin)
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel A Law on behalf of Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Joaquin Alvarado(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Joaquin Alvarado(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
November 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2022 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Sachs, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC. (Sachs, Michael)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (eva)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:21-cv-01848 JLS (ADSx). (ghap)
November 5, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC, Huntington Beach Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Joaquin Alvarado. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/1/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap)
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant FCA US LLC identifying FCA US LLC as Corporate Parent. (Sachs, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of James Sheridan IN SUPPORT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 1441(B) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Sachs, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of MICHAEL SACHS IN SUPPORT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1332 AND 1441(B) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Sachs, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Sachs, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, case number 30-2021-01208307-CU-BC-NJC Receipt No: ACACDC-32285904 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Michael Benjamin Sachs added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Sachs, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joaquin Alvarado v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joaquin Alvarado
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Sachs
Represented By: Candace Jin Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Beach Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?