Enrique Mandujano v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Enrique Mandujano
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc., DOES 1 through 50, inclusive and KEN GARFF AUTOMOTIVE, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv01912
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Complaint, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Enrique Mandujano. Motion set for hearing on 5/27/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Combined Motion for Leave to Amend and Motion to Remand to Orange County Superior Court, #2 Declaration of Eleazar D. Kim in Support of Plaintiff's Combined Motion for Leave to Amend and Motion to Remand to Orange County Superior Court, #3 Exhibit to Plaintiff's Combined Motion for Leave to Amend and Motion to Remand to Orange County Superior Court, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Combined Motion for Leave to Amend and Motion to Remand to Orange County Superior Court, #5 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties) (Kim, Eleazar)
December 22, 2021 Filing 28 Notice of Withdrawal of Amended Complaint/Petition #17 filed by Plaintiff Enrique Mandujano. (Kim, Eleazar)
December 17, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Remand Case to State Court,, #22 filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Nassihi, Amir)
December 17, 2021 Filing 26 Joint STIPULATION for Order Regarding Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt. 17) and Motion for Remand (Dkt. 22) filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc..(Nassihi, Amir)
December 14, 2021 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #17 as to Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. (lom)
December 14, 2021 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #17 as to Defendant KEN GARFF AUTOMOTIVE, LLC. (lom)
December 13, 2021 Filing 23 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Orange County Superior Court #22 currently set for January 14, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. to May 20, 2022 at 10:30 a.m.Counsel is reminded to refer to the list of CLOSED motion dates on Judge Statons Procedures and Schedules page prior to filing future motions.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 13, 2021 Filing 22 [WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL DATED ON 12/17/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #27 ] - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Enrique Mandujano. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand to Orange County Superior Court, #2 Declaration Eleazar D. Kim in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand to Orange County Superior Court, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Remand to Orange County Superior Court) (Kim, Eleazar). Modified on 12/21/2021 (jp).
December 13, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joan R Camagong counsel for Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. Adding Joan R. Camagong as counsel of record for Nissan North American, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attorney Joan R Camagong added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Camagong, Joan)
December 13, 2021 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #17 filed by Plaintiff Enrique Mandujano. (Kim, Eleazar)
December 13, 2021 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #17 filed by Plaintiff Enrique Mandujano. (Kim, Eleazar)
December 13, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Enrique Mandujano, identifying Enrique Mandujano; Nissan North America, Inc.; Ken Garff Automotive, LLC; Consumer Law Experts, P.C.; Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP. (Kim, Eleazar)
December 13, 2021 Filing 17 [DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER DKT NO. #28 ] - First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants DOES, Nissan North America, Inc., KEN GARFF AUTOMOTIVE, LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Enrique Mandujano(Kim, Eleazar). Modified on 12/28/2021 (jp).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
December 9, 2021 Filing 15 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01912-JLS(ADSx). (dta)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 2/7/2022 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/31/2022. (lb)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #11 served on December 6, 2021. (Nassihi, Amir)
November 30, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Yuri Yang counsel for Plaintiff Enrique Mandujano. Adding Yuri Yang as counsel of record for Enrique Mandujano for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney Yuri Yang. (Attorney Yuri Yang added to party Enrique Mandujano(pty:pla))(Yang, Yuri)
November 24, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
November 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
November 22, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. in Orange County Superior Court, attached as Exhibit B..(jtil)
November 22, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Enrique Mandujano in orange County Superior Court on 10/1/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., re Notice of Appearance #5 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Appearance #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on November 22, 2021. (Nassihi, Amir)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rodrigo E Salas on behalf of Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. (Attorney Rodrigo E Salas added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Salas, Rodrigo)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amy Patricia Maclear on behalf of Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. (Attorney Amy Patricia Maclear added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Maclear, Amy)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., identifying Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Nassihi, Amir)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Nassihi, Amir)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, case number 30-2021-01224272-CU-BC-WJC Receipt No: ACACDC-32367784 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amir Nassihi, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Answer, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Declaration of Robert A. Shields) (Attorney Amir M Nassihi added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nassihi, Amir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enrique Mandujano v. Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Mandujano
Represented By: Benjeman R Beck
Represented By: Eleazar D Kim
Represented By: Yuri Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Patricia Maclear
Represented By: Rodrigo E Salas
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Represented By: Joan R Camagong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN GARFF AUTOMOTIVE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?