Dole Packaged Foods, LLC v. Kelly Cartter et al
Plaintiff: Dole Packaged Foods, LLC
Defendant: Kelly Cartter doing business as Hula Girls Shave Ice and Jason Lauderdale
Case Number: 8:2021cv01950
Filed: November 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1127
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Filing 20 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (jp)
January 14, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 1/14/2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp)
January 4, 2022 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC, upon Defendant Jason Lauderdale served on 12/10/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jason Lauderdale in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
January 4, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC, upon Defendant Kelly Cartter served on 12/10/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kelly Cartter dba Hula Girls Shave Ice in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
December 6, 2021 Filing 15 Text Only ORDER GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Sarah Edwards Holland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC #14 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sarah Edwards Holland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32420065) filed by plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 30, 2021 Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Kelly Cartter, Jason Lauderdale. (iv)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC, identifying Dole International Holdings, Inc.; Itochu Corporation. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet, Attachment 2 Certificate of Interested Parties, Attachment 3 Summons and Attachment 4 Report Re Trademark should all be e-filed separately and in their own event categories. Civil Cover Sheet is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. Attachment 2 Certificate of Interested Parties is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices. Summons is located under Civil Events Service Documents Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints and select Summons Request. Trademark Report is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings and select Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120). (car)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sarah Edwards Holland. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:21-cv-01950-JLS-ADSx. (car)
November 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32378873 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Report re Trademark) (Attorney Kollin J. Zimmermann added to party Dole Packaged Foods, LLC(pty:pla))(Zimmermann, Kollin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dole Packaged Foods, LLC v. Kelly Cartter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dole Packaged Foods, LLC
Represented By: Kollin J. Zimmermann
Represented By: Sarah Edwards Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Cartter doing business as Hula Girls Shave Ice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Lauderdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?