Justin M. Zapata v. NBC et al
Plaintiff: Justin M. Zapata
Defendant: NBC, Saturday Night Live TV Show and Rapper Saweetie
Case Number: 8:2021cv01958
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, ORDERING Letter submitted by Plaintiff Justin M. Zapata received on 12/20/21 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Case terminated by Order filed 12/9/21. (twdb)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, ORDERING Argument Under Court Rule 2.11 Motion Forma Pauperis submitted by Plaintiff Justin M. Zapata received on 12/13/21 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Case terminated by Order filed 12/9/21. (twdb)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Denying #2 Notice of Filing Complaint Without Prepayment of Filing Fees or REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV-93). DENIED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (twdb)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES OR REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (CV-93). (et)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants NBC, Rapper Saweetie, Saturday Night Live TV Show pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick., filed by Plaintiff Justin M. Zapata. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justin M. Zapata v. NBC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin M. Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saturday Night Live TV Show
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapper Saweetie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?