Nathan Ables et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Ables and Jennifer Ables
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2022cv00147
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Joint Request for Leave of Plaintiff and Defendant to Appear for Remotely #27 is denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong,. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for DECEMBER 8, 2022, is hereby VACATED. The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/3/2024 at 9:00 AM. The Jury Trial is set for 4/22/2024 at 8:30 AM. The discovery cut-off is 10/11/2023. The last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/24/2024. (See document for further details) (yl)
December 2, 2022 Filing 27 Joint REQUEST for Leave of Plaintiff and Defendant to Appear for Remotely filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Request set for hearing on 12/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Mayo, James)
November 22, 2022 Filing 26 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ables, Nathan Ables. Amendment to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #25 (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
November 22, 2022 Filing 25 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ables, Nathan Ables.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd)
August 31, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
August 30, 2022 Filing 22 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeffery J Fadeff added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Fadeff, Jeffery)
August 29, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
August 29, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reshma A Bajaj on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Reshma A Bajaj added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Bajaj, Reshma)
August 29, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Patrick Mayo on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney James Patrick Mayo added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Mayo, James)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: granting #17 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Spencer Peter Hugret for FCA US LLC. Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot terminated. (yl)
August 3, 2022 Filing 17 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Spencer Hugret in place of attorney Matthew M. Proudfoot filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Proudfoot, Matthew)
July 28, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiffs Jennifer Ables, Nathan Ables. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ables and Nathan Ables. (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Jennifer Ables, Nathan Ables. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Nathan Ables and Jennifer Ables for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs' Nathan Ables and Jennifer Ables. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Jennifer Ables(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Nathan Ables(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
February 24, 2022 Filing 14 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement Pursuant to Reassignment Order filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Ables, Nathan Ables (Kuemerle, Karin)
February 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Please refer to the attached order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-011) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge David O. Carter to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-00147-MEMF-ASx. (vp)
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiffs Jennifer Ables, Nathan Ables (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Jennifer Ables(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Nathan Ables(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
January 31, 2022 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
January 28, 2022 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 #1 . (et)
January 28, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants FCA US LLC., Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Nathan Ables, Jennifer Ables. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/16/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, (Proudfoot, Matthew)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew M Proudfoot on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Proudfoot, Matthew)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Matthew M. Proudfoot re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2021-01236733-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-32699112 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court) (Attorney Matthew M Proudfoot added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Proudfoot, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nathan Ables et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Ables
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ables
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Matthew M Proudfoot
Represented By: James Patrick Mayo
Represented By: Jeffery J Fadeff
Represented By: Reshma A Bajaj
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?