Brenda Evans et al v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Minda Briaddy and Anthony Vacchio
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, -, Hyundai Motor America, Kia Corporation, Kia America, Inc. and Hyundai Motor Company
Case Number: 8:2022cv00300
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Lindenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Minda Briaddy, and Anthony Vacchio, designating Christopher R. Pitoun as local counsel #19 . (gk)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Minda Briaddy, and Anthony Vacchio, designating Christopher R. Pitoun as local counsel #18 . (gk)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE: STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Upon Stipulation #20 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Hyundai Motor America (HMA) will accept service of the Complaint and waive the formalities of service under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(d) with respect to the Complaint. Kia America, Inc. (KA) and HMA shall file their responsive pleadings by 5/27/2022. Should KA and/or HMA file a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, the deadline for Plaintiffs to file any opposition shall be 6/10/2022. Should KA and/or HMA file a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, the deadline for KA and/or HMA to file any reply in support thereof shall be 6/17/2022. See document for further details. (gk)
April 20, 2022 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION for Order regarding service of process filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Minahan, Michael)
April 13, 2022 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D. Lindenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33125246) filed by Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pitoun, Christopher)
April 13, 2022 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33125178) filed by Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pitoun, Christopher)
March 24, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hyundai Motor America answer now due 4/27/2022; Kia Corporation answer now due 4/27/2022; Kia America, Inc. answer now due 4/27/2022; Hyundai Motor Company answer now due 4/27/2022, filed by Defendants Hyundai Motor America; Kia Corporation; Kia America, Inc.; Hyundai Motor Company.(Attorney Michael Clemens Minahan added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Clemens Minahan added to party Hyundai Motor Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Clemens Minahan added to party Kia America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Clemens Minahan added to party Kia Corporation(pty:dft))(Minahan, Michael)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Minda Briaddy, and Anthony Vacchio, designating Christopher R. Pitoun as local counsel #13 . (gk)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel E. Fitzpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Minda Briaddy, and Anthony Vacchio, designating Christopher R. Pitoun as local counsel #14 . (gk)
March 9, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel E. Fitzpatrick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32922778) filed by Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pitoun, Christopher)
March 9, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32922774) filed by Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pitoun, Christopher)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon the filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:20-cv-01584 SB(JDEx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-00300 SB(JDEx). Signed by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr (rn)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Rachel E. Fitzpatrick. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steve W. Berman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
February 28, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
February 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
February 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio. Related Case(s): 8:20-cv-01584-SB-JDE (Loeser, Thomas)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio, identifying Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Minda Briaddy, Anthony Vacchio, Hyundai Motor Company, Hyundai Motor America, Kia Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Loeser, Thomas)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Minda Briaddy, Brenda Evans, Kericha Kennedy, Anthony Vacchio. (Loeser, Thomas)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32848199 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Vacchio, Brenda Evans, Minda Briaddy, Kericha Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony Vacchio Re: CLRA Venue) (Attorney Thomas E Loeser added to party Minda Briaddy(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas E Loeser added to party Brenda Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas E Loeser added to party Kericha Kennedy(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas E Loeser added to party Anthony Vacchio(pty:pla))(Loeser, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brenda Evans et al v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Evans
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lindenfeld
Represented By: Rachel E. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kericha Kennedy
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lindenfeld
Represented By: Rachel E. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minda Briaddy
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lindenfeld
Represented By: Rachel E. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Vacchio
Represented By: Thomas E Loeser
Represented By: Christopher Pitoun
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Fegan
Represented By: Jonathan D. Lindenfeld
Represented By: Rachel E. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Represented By: John H. Beisner
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Michael Clemens Minahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Corporation
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Represented By: John H. Beisner
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Michael Clemens Minahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia America, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Represented By: John H. Beisner
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Michael Clemens Minahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Represented By: Caroline Williams Van Ness
Represented By: John H. Beisner
Represented By: Lance A Etcheverry
Represented By: Michael Clemens Minahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?