Kent Salveson v. Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ.
Plaintiff: Kent Salveson
Defendant: Hal Kessler and Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ.
Case Number: 8:2022cv00310
Filed: February 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 22 Evidentiary Objections opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 filed by Defendant Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ. (Smith, Marc)
April 25, 2022 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Hall Ross Kessler, Esq. in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 filed by Defendant Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ. (Smith, Marc)
April 25, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 filed by Defendant Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ. (Smith, Marc)
April 17, 2022 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 filed by Plaintiff Kent Salveson. (Balonick, Barney)
April 17, 2022 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 filed by Plaintiff Kent Salveson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Balonick, #2 Declaration Salveson)(Balonick, Barney)
April 4, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
April 4, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on June 9, 2022. (rrp)
April 1, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ, identifying Hal Ross Kessler, Esq.. (Smith, Marc)
April 1, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #13 filed by Defendant Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ. (Attachments: #1 RJN 2, #2 RJN 3, #3 RJN 4, #4 RJN 5)(Smith, Marc)
April 1, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ. Motion set for hearing on 5/9/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 of Hal Ross Kessler, #2 of Craig S. Berman) (Attorney Marc Smith added to party Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ(pty:dft)) (Smith, Marc)
March 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: The document was not properly saved to pdf. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Proof of service of summons and complaint. Other error(s) with document(s): Service under FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed is incorrect. Service was not executed upon the clerks office for this defendant.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
March 14, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Kent Salveson, upon Defendant Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ served on 3/11/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Balonick, Barney)
March 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of interested parties. The document was uploaded but not properly saved as a pdf document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
March 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE notice of interested parties filed by plaintiff Kent Salveson. (Balonick, Barney)
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kent Salveson. (Balonick, Barney)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
February 26, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Kent Salveson. (Balonick, Barney)
February 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32856373 - Fee: $402, filed by plainitff Kent Salveson. (Attorney Barney H Balonick added to party Kent Salveson(pty:pla))(Balonick, Barney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent Salveson v. Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Salveson
Represented By: Barney H Balonick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal Ross Kessler, ESQ.
Represented By: Craig S Berman
Represented By: Marc Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?