Terri L. Stiles et al v. John Clifford et al
Plaintiff: Terri L. Stiles and Ahmad Alkayali
Defendant: John Clifford, Steven Smith, David R. Chaffee, Fatma Boukhari, Sarah Quadri, Darren Rude and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 8:2022cv00469
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Fatma Boukhari, Sarah Quadri. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Michael D Adams added to party Fatma Boukhari(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D Adams added to party Sarah Quadri(pty:dft)) (Adams, Michael)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Re Request to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss #16 and Motion to Dismiss Case #15 by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: In light of the Request to Withdraw [Dkt 16] filed on May 18, 2022, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 12] is hereby vacated and the hearing scheduled for May 24, 2022, at 10:00 am is taken off calendar. The hearing on Defendants' new Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 15] is hereby continued to Tuesday, July 5, 2022, at 10:00 am before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick in Courtroom 6B of the United States Courthouse in Santa Ana. Briefing deadlines for the motion are automatically extended under Local Rule 7-11. Vacating #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (es)
May 18, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST to Withdraw NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #12 filed by defendants John Clifford, Darren Rude, Steven Smith. Request set for hearing on 5/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Clifford, John)
May 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by attorney for defendants John Clifford, Darren Rude, Steven Smith. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants John Clifford, Steven Smith, and Darren Rude, #2 Proposed Order) (Clifford, John)
May 2, 2022 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Fatma Boukhari, David R. Chaffee, John Clifford, Does, Sarah Quadri, Darren Rude, Steven Smith amending Complaint - (Referred) #1 , filed by plaintiff Ahmad Alkayali(es)
April 21, 2022 Filing 13 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #12 . The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #12 is hereby continued to Tuesday 05/24/2022 at 10:00 am, and will take place before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick in Courtroom 6B of the U.S. Courthouse in Santa Ana. Briefing deadlines for the motion are automatically extended under Local Rule 7-11.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nbo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant John Clifford, Darren Rude, Steven Smith. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Steven C Smith added to party John Clifford(pty:dft), Attorney Steven C Smith added to party Darren Rude(pty:dft), Attorney Steven C Smith added to party Steven Smith(pty:dft)) (Smith, Steven)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fatma Boukhari answer now due 5/20/2022; Sarah Quadri answer now due 5/20/2022, re Complaint - (Referred), #1 filed by Defendants Fatma Boukhari; Sarah Quadri.(Attorney Seth Morgan Jessee added to party Fatma Boukhari(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Morgan Jessee added to party Sarah Quadri(pty:dft))(Jessee, Seth)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-00469 JGB(DFM). (rn)
March 29, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
March 24, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant Darren Rude. (car)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant Sarah Quadri. (car)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant Fatma Boukhari. (car)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant Steven Smith. (car)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant John Clifford. (car)
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant David R. Chaffee. (car)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Ahmad Alkayali, Terri L. Stiles (car)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Filing fee $402 PAID) filed by Plaintiffs Ahmad Alkayali, Terri L. Stiles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car) Modified on 3/29/2022 (car).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terri L. Stiles et al v. John Clifford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri L. Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Alkayali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Clifford
Represented By: John S. Clifford
Represented By: Steven C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Smith
Represented By: John S. Clifford
Represented By: Steven C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Chaffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fatma Boukhari
Represented By: Michael D Adams
Represented By: Seth Morgan Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Quadri
Represented By: Michael D Adams
Represented By: Seth Morgan Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Rude
Represented By: John S. Clifford
Represented By: Steven C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?