Eric Everett v. MX Electronics Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ERIC EVERETT
Defendant: MX ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING, INC., MEMORY EXPERTS INTERNATIONAL (USA), INC., DOES 1-25, inclusive,, Memory Experts International USA, Inc. and DOES 1-25, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2022cv00802
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 7/25/2022 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/18/2022. (lb)
May 10, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Eric Everett. upon MX Electronics Manufacturing, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/5/2022; Memory Experts International USA, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/5/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. Waiver of Service signed by William D. Coffee. (Tsai, Jennifer)
April 14, 2022 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants MX Electronics Manufacturing, Inc., and Memory Experts International USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memory Experts Intl) (jtil)
April 14, 2022 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
April 13, 2022 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nathan Camuti on behalf of Plaintiff ERIC EVERETT (Attorney Nathan Camuti added to party ERIC EVERETT(pty:pla))(Camuti, Nathan)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ERIC EVERETT, (Tsai, Jennifer)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by ERIC EVERETT. (Tsai, Jennifer)
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff ERIC EVERETT. (Tsai, Jennifer)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff ERIC EVERETT. (Tsai, Jennifer)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ERIC EVERETT. (Tsai, Jennifer)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33115453 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF ERIC EVERETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney Jennifer Catherine Tsai added to party ERIC EVERETT(pty:pla))(Tsai, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eric Everett v. MX Electronics Manufacturing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC EVERETT
Represented By: Nathan Camuti
Represented By: Jennifer Catherine Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MX ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEMORY EXPERTS INTERNATIONAL (USA), INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memory Experts International USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?