Marii Kroutilin v. FCA US, LLC.
Plaintiff: Marii Kroutilin
Defendant: FCA US, LLC. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2022cv00929
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2023 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Marii Kroutilin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 10, 2023 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Marii Kroutilin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Re Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates #31 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the court ORDERS the court's 9/30/2022, Scheduling Order #25 MODIFIED to read as follows (with changes indicated by italics): Jury Trial set for 2/6/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 1/11/2024 at 8:30 AM. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 7/21/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions: 10/20/2023. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 11/9/2023. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 12/14/2023. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 12/21/2023. (See document for further information). (jp)
June 6, 2023 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Marii Kroutilin(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
May 31, 2023 Filing 31 First STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Related Dates from Currently Set to As set forth in the stipulation. filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Marii Kroutilin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ariel Harman-Holmes, #2 Proposed Order)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
May 10, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Marii Kroutilin(pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
January 20, 2023 Filing 29 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #28 filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
January 6, 2023 Filing 28 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant FCA US, LLC. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dolin, Tionna)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS #17 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. The court GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs sixth cause of action for fraudulent inducementconcealment WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. The court DENIES AS MOOT Defendants Motion to Strike. Plaintiff shall file any amendment within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to FRCP 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2022 and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 12/5/2023 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 11/16/2023 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 4/6/2023. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 5/18/2023. Last Date to Hear Motions: 8/24/2023. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 9/7/2023. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 10/26/2023. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 11/2/2023. (See document for further information). (jp)
September 30, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reshma A Bajaj on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Reshma A Bajaj added to party FCA US, LLC.(pty:dft))(Bajaj, Reshma)
September 29, 2022 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 23, 2022 Filing 22 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Sixth Cause of Action #17 . The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for August 25, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and the Court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2022 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Sixth Cause of Acion #17 Supplemental Declaration filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Letter Attachment to Declaration)(Mayo, James)
August 11, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Sixth Cause of Acion #17 filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC.. (Mayo, James)
August 4, 2022 Filing 19 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Sixth Cause of Acion #17 filed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2022 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
July 25, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Sixth Cause of Acion filed by Defendant FCA US, LLC.. Motion set for hearing on 8/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Demand for Jury, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Interested Parties) (Mayo, James)
July 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US, LLC.(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
July 18, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Patrick Mayo on behalf of Defendant FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney James Patrick Mayo added to party FCA US, LLC.(pty:dft))(Mayo, James)
July 6, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin, upon Defendant FCA US, LLC. served on 7/5/2022, answer due 7/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation Inc., Registered Agent, authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter (mku)
May 9, 2022 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US, LLC. (jp)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Marii Kroutilin, identifying Marii Kroutilin. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 5, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:22-cv-00929 FWS (DFMx). (lh)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33238790 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Marii Kroutilin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015 Jeep Wrangler Warranty) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Marii Kroutilin(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marii Kroutilin v. FCA US, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marii Kroutilin
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC.
Represented By: James Patrick Mayo
Represented By: Reshma A Bajaj
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?