Y.H. v. Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Plaintiff: Y.H., by and through her Guardian Nathan Harris, individually and on behalf of similarly situated individuals and Y. H.
Defendant: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv00998
Filed: May 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
2 Judge: Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Mootness, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration #19 Amended Notice of Motion filed by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/23/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Jacobson, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #21 by Deputy Clerk of Court. The hearing time as noticed by counsel is incorrect. Counsel is directed to review Judge Sykes' Law and Motion Schedule, available on the Court's website under Judges' Procedures and Schedule. Counsel is further directed to re-notice the motion [ECF 19] for the correct time. (iva)
July 15, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Mootness, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iva)
July 12, 2022 Filing 20 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Jacobson, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Mootness, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/23/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Jacobson, #2 Declaration of James Burroughs, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Order) (Jacobson, Jeffrey)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Please refer to Order for complete details., (iva)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-151) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Sykes, Sunshine Suzanne, this case is transferred from Judge David O. Carter to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-00998 SSS(ADSx). (rn)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., designating Ryan M Salzman as local counsel. (lom)
May 30, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 5/26/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33366330) filed by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Salzman, Ryan)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S Jacobson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc., designating Ryan M Salzman as local counsel. (bm)
May 27, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33366330) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration #10 . ( Motion set for hearing on 9/19/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
May 26, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33366330) filed by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Salzman, Ryan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Set Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Salzman, Ryan)
May 25, 2022 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. answer now due 7/1/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc..(Salzman, Ryan)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Y. H., (Turin, Yevgeniy)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE DAVID O. CARTER by Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
May 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (sh)
May 17, 2022 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Y. H.[FILED IN STATE COURT ON 05/03/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc. identifying Activision Blizzard, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Salzman, Ryan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Salzman, Ryan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022-01257732-CU-BT-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-33312836 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action, #2 Declaration of O. Salik ISO Notice of Removal) (Attorney Ryan Matthew Salzman added to party Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Salzman, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Y.H. v. Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.H., by and through her Guardian Nathan Harris, individually and on behalf of similarly situated individuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y. H.
Represented By: Yevgeniy Y. Turin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blizzard Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Salzman
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?