Lambe Bobby Papoulias et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lambe Bobby Papoulias and Androniki Papoulias
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: David Coher
Case Number: 8:2022cv01094
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
2 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Joint Stipulation for Order to Continue Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Expenses and Jurisdiction #35 . The Court continues the filing deadline of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses from October 11, 2023 to December 11, 2023; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
October 6, 2023 Filing 35 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Jurisdiction from October 11, 2023 to December 11, 2023 Re: Judgment, #34 filed by Plaintiffs Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna)
September 27, 2023 Filing 34 JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias against FCA US LLC., in the amount of $159,597.63 pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (twdb)
September 27, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: REQUEST to Enforce Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Two requests are filed, one lacking a proposed order. The request #31 should have been withdrawn. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
September 26, 2023 Filing 32 REQUEST to Enforce Judgment filed by Plaintiff Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias. (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT) (Dolin, Tionna)
September 26, 2023 Filing 31 REQUEST to Enforce Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiff Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias. (Dolin, Tionna)
September 18, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled #29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Document not properly saved as a pdf document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
September 18, 2023 Filing 29 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) David Coher: Mediation held on September 18, 2023 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Coher, David)
August 9, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Lambe Bobby Papoulias. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Lambe Bobby Papoulias for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF Lambe Bobby Papoulias. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 8, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiff Lambe Bobby Papoulias. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Lambe Bobby Papoulias for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Lambe Bobby Papoulias. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Lambe Bobby Papoulias(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
August 7, 2023 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi counsel for Plaintiffs Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias. Adding Rabiya Tirmizi as counsel of record for Lambe Bobby Papoulias, Androniki Papoulias for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Lambe Bobby Papoulias, Androniki Papoulias. (Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Androniki Papoulias(pty:pla), Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Lambe Bobby Papoulias(pty:pla))(Tirmizi, Rabiya)
May 9, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiffs Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Lambe Bobby Papoulias and Androniki Papoulias. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Androniki Papoulias(pty:pla), Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Lambe Bobby Papoulias(pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
December 7, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) David Coher has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 9/14/2023. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 11/13/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 9/28/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2024 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2024 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
October 6, 2022 Filing 21 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 15, 2022 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
September 15, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #13 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fraudulent Inducement - Concealment Claim [Dkt. 13]. Defendant shall file an answer to Plaintiffs remaining claims by September 15, 2022. (twdb)
August 29, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pltfs Cause of Action for Faudulent Inducement - Concealment Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) #13 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
August 22, 2022 Filing 16 Opposition In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pltfs Cause of Action for Faudulent Inducement - Concealment Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) #13 filed by Plaintiffs Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias. (Law, Daniel)
August 22, 2022 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Androniki Papoulias and Lambe Bobby Papoulias for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Androniki Papoulias and Lambe Bobby Papoulias. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Androniki Papoulias(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Lambe Bobby Papoulias(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
July 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on October 13, 2022. (rrp)
July 5, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Pltfs Cause of Action for Faudulent Inducement - Concealment Pursuant to FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum iso 12b6 Motion, #2 Declaration of Atty iso 12b6 Motion, #3 Exhibit to Atty Decl, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service) (Lambert, Sarah)
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:22-cv-01094 CJC(KESx). (rn)
July 1, 2022 Filing 11 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
July 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Lambert, Sarah)
July 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric D Sentlinger on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Eric D Sentlinger added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Sentlinger, Eric)
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lambe Bobby Papoulias, Androniki Papoulias, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 6/7/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 2, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (ghap)
June 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap)
June 2, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias, (Dolin, Tionna)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Androniki Papoulias, Lambe Bobby Papoulias. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-33401730 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Lambe Bobby Papoulias, Androniki Papoulias. (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Androniki Papoulias(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Lambe Bobby Papoulias(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambe Bobby Papoulias et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lambe Bobby Papoulias
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Androniki Papoulias
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Eric D Sentlinger
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: David Coher
Represented By: David B Coher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?