Denise Goodard et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Petitioner: Denise Goodard and Victor Goodard
Case Number: 8:2022cv01109
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
2 Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO CONDUCT IN-PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BEFORE BANKRUPTCY JUDGE SCOTT C. CLARKSON by Judge Cormac J. Carney: The Court therefore DIRECTS the parties to participate in an in-person settlement conference before Bankruptcy Judge Scott C. Clarkson, who has significant experience and expertise in resolving Lemon Law cases. The parties are directed to contact Bankruptcy Judge Clarkson's CRD within the next seven days to find a mutually convenient time for the settlement conference. Counsel are further DIRECTED to notify the Court of the settlement conference outcome within three days of its conclusion. (see document for further details) (bm)
October 16, 2023 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Petitioners Denise Goodard, Victor Goodard. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Petitioners for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Petitioners Denise Goodard and Victor Goodard. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Denise Goodard(pty:pet), Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Victor Goodard(pty:pet))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 9, 2023 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Grace Dolin counsel for Petitioner Denise Goodard. Ariel Harman-Holmes is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Denise Goodard. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Related Dates #19 . ( Discovery cut-off 10/12/2023., Non Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2023., (Private Mediation) 10/20/2023., Jury Trial continued to 2/13/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney., Pretrial Conference continued to 2/5/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney.) SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
July 6, 2023 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related Dates filed by Plaintiffs Denise Goodard. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth A. LaRocque, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial and Related Dates)(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
July 6, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Petitioners Denise Goodard, Victor Goodard. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Denise Goddard and Victor Goddard for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Denise Goddard and Victor Goddard. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Denise Goodard(pty:pet), Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Victor Goodard(pty:pet))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 7/6/2023. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 8/28/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 7/20/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2023 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2023 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
August 25, 2022 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Petitioners Denise Goodard, Victor Goodard.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
July 26, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on September 1, 2022. (rrp)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-01109-CJC-(DFMx). (dve)
July 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:22-cv-01109 JVS(DFMx). (rn)
June 28, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
June 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
June 28, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA North America Holdings LLC; FCA Holdco B.V.; Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Suarez, Jeanette)
June 28, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Suarez, Jeanette)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Denise Goodard, Victor Goodard, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 6/7/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 6, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (lh)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Denise Goodard, Victor Goodard, (Dolin, Tionna)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Denise Goodard, Victor Goodard. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioners Denise Goodard, Victor Goodard. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-33408232 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Denise Goodard, Victor Goodard. (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Denise Goodard(pty:pet), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Victor Goodard(pty:pet))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denise Goodard et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Denise Goodard
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Goodard
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Jeanette Catuira Suarez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?