Mission Viejo Florist, Inc. v. Mission Viejo Florist and Gifts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC.
Defendant: MISSION VIEJO FLORIST & GIFTS, INC., SEPIDEH MIANABY and Mission Viejo Florist and Gifts, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv01134
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Mission Viejo Florist, Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Tsai, Jennifer)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter, re Notice of Settlement #23 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb)
June 17, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Mission Viejo Florist, Inc.. (Camuti, Nathan)
June 16, 2022 Filing 22 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $1,000 into the registry of the Court from Grace Bjornstad. Re: Order on Motion to Amend/Correct #21 . Receipt number SA017892. (dve)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION UNDER FRCP RULE 60(a) by Judge David O. Carter #18 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the amount of the bond to be posted by Plaintiff shall be one thousand dollars ($1,000). (twdb)
June 14, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mission Viejo Florist, Inc., upon Defendant Sepideh Mianaby served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sepideh Mianaby in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tsai, Jennifer)
June 14, 2022 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mission Viejo Florist, Inc., upon Defendant Mission Viejo Florist and Gifts, Inc. served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mission Viejo Florist & Gifts, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tsai, Jennifer)
June 14, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Correct Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order,, #17 filed by Plaintiff Mission Viejo Florist, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Camuti, Nathan)
June 14, 2022 Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #7 Ex Parte APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order. The hearing on this Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue is set before this Court on Monday, June 27, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. Defendants shall file any opposition papers by 4:00 pm on June 17, 2022, and Plaintiff shall file any reply briefing by 4:00 pm on June 24, 2022. The TRO shall remain in effect until the Court rules on the preliminary injunction. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
June 9, 2022 Filing 16 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint. (dca)
June 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #3 , Notice of Appearance #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap)
June 9, 2022 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sepideh Mianaby. (ghap)
June 9, 2022 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mission Viejo Florist and Gifts, Inc. (ghap)
June 9, 2022 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
June 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lauren E Grochow on behalf of Plaintiff MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC. (Attorney Lauren E Grochow added to party MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC.(pty:pla))(Grochow, Lauren)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to trademark infringement filed by plaintiff MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration with Exhibits 1-2, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Tsai, Jennifer)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC., (Tsai, Jennifer)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC.. (Tsai, Jennifer)
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC.. (Tsai, Jennifer)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nathan Camuti on behalf of Plaintiff MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC. (Attorney Nathan Camuti added to party MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC.(pty:pla))(Camuti, Nathan)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC.. (Tsai, Jennifer)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33439120 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC.. (Attorney Jennifer Catherine Tsai added to party MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC.(pty:pla))(Tsai, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mission Viejo Florist, Inc. v. Mission Viejo Florist and Gifts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISSION VIEJO FLORIST, INC.
Represented By: Nathan Camuti
Represented By: Jennifer Catherine Tsai
Represented By: Lauren E Grochow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISSION VIEJO FLORIST & GIFTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPIDEH MIANABY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Viejo Florist and Gifts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?