Luis Serna et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: LUIS SERNA and SANDRA MOTA
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2022cv01254
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Filing 25 JUDGMENT #24 by Judge David O. Carter. Plaintiffs LUIS SERNA AND SANDRA MOTA (Plaintiffs) accepted Defendant FCA US, LLCs Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 on August 26, 2022. Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68. Accordingly, all hearings on calendar are hereby VACATED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (rolm)
August 26, 2022 Filing 24 REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiffs Sandra Mota, Luis Serna. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment) (Dolin, Tionna)
August 24, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/23/22 5:15 p.m. re Transcript #22 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (apr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 24, 2022 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/23/22 5:15 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2022. (apr)
August 24, 2022 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Sandra Mota, Luis Serna for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Kim Johnson at kjohnson@slpattorney.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Dolin, Tionna)
August 23, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (not held) before Judge David O. Carter. The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Courts continues the scheduling conference to Friday, August 26, 2022 at 4:00 PM. The Court ORDERS that all persons, parties, clients, and individuals with settlement authority be present for this hearing. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that the plaintiff bring the vehicle in question to the Courthouse. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
August 23, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Sandra Mota, Luis Serna. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Luis Serna and Sandra Mota for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Luis Serna and Sandra Mota. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Sandra Mota(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Luis Serna(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
August 18, 2022 Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Scheduling Conference has been ADVANCED to 8/23/2022 at 04:00 PM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 15, 2022 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Sandra Mota, Luis Serna.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reshma A Bajaj on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attorney Reshma A Bajaj added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Bajaj, Reshma)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
July 29, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC. (Mayo, James)
July 29, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury)(Mayo, James)
July 21, 2022 Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
July 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:22-cv-01254 DOC(ADSx). (rn)
July 14, 2022 Filing 10 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mayo, James)
July 14, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
July 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James Patrick Mayo on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney James Patrick Mayo added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Mayo, James)
July 14, 2022 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luis Serna, Sandra Mota, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 5, 2022 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (ghap)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap)
July 1, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff SANDRA MOTA, LUIS SERNA. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 1, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff SANDRA MOTA, LUIS SERNA, identifying FCA US LLC. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 1, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs SANDRA MOTA, LUIS SERNA. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33570216 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff LUIS SERNA, SANDRA MOTA. (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party SANDRA MOTA(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party LUIS SERNA(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Serna et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS SERNA
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA MOTA
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Mayo
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Reshma A Bajaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?