Mark McDonald et al v. Kristina D. Lawson et al
Plaintiff: Mark McDonald and Jeff Barke
Defendant: Kristina D. Lawson, Randy W. Hawkins, Laurie Rose Lubiano, Michelle Anne Bholat, David E. Ryu, Ryan Brooks, James M. Healzer, Asif Mahmood, Nicole A Jeong, Richard E. Thorp, Veling Tsai, Eserick Watkins and Robert Bonta
Petitioner: ACLU of Northern California and ACLU of Southern California
Intervenor: Emanuel McCray
Case Number: 8:2022cv01805
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2022 Filing 67 Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Daniel R Suhr re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge #18 . (jp)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTES ORDER DENYING Motion for Preliminary Injunction #35 and Dismissing Complaint #1 for Lack of Standing by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the court finds Plaintiffs lack Article III standing, and accordingly DENIES the Motion. Because Plaintiffs lack standing, the court further DISMISSES WITH LEAVE TO AMEND the Complaint (Dkt. 1). If Plaintiffs wish to file an amended complaint, Plaintiffs shall do so within thirty (30) days of this Order, or the court's dismissal will operate as a dismissal with prejudice without further notice. (jp)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTES ORDER DENYING Application's Motion for Intervention #45 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. See document for further information. (jp)
November 17, 2022 Filing 64 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUCTION re CA ASSEMBLY BILL 2098 #35 ; EMANUEL McCRAY'S MOTION TO INTERVENE RULE 24 #45 before Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Motion hearing held on Zoom. The court takes the matters under submission. Order to issue. Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (jp)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court is in receipt of the ACLU of Northern California and ACLU of Southern California's Application to File Amicus Brief (Dkt. #60 ). The court hereby GRANTS the Application. The Amicus Brief attached to the Application at Dkt. (60-1]) is DEEMED FILED as of 11/7/2022. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter granting #58 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R Suhr APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald, designating Mariah Gondeiro as local counsel. (jp)
November 7, 2022 Filing 61 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Emanuel McCray, Mark McDonald, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Opposition to Intervention #56 served on 11/04/2022. (Gondeiro, Mariah)
November 7, 2022 Filing 60 APPLICATION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amici Curiae ACLU of Northern California, ACLU of Southern California. Application set for hearing on 11/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Brief of Amici Curiae ACLU NorCal & SoCal ISO Mot. for Prelim. Inj., #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Hannah Meredith Kieschnick added to party ACLU of Northern California(pty:bkmov), Attorney Hannah Meredith Kieschnick added to party ACLU of Southern California(pty:bkmov)) (Kieschnick, Hannah)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTES ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Opposition #56 and Setting Briefing Schedule by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court ORDERS the following: (1) The Opposition (Dkt. 56-1), is deemed filed; (2) Plaintiffs shall file a proof of service as to proposed intervenor Emanuel McCray as soon as possible, and in no case later than 11/9/2022, at 11:59 PM.; and (3) If proposed intervenor Emanuel McCray wishes to file a brief in reply limited to the arguments raised in the Opposition, any such briefing must be filed on or before 11/14/2022, at 11:59 PM. (jp)
November 7, 2022 Filing 58 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Suhr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/2/2022, Receipt No. 34262820) filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gondeiro, Mariah)
November 4, 2022 Filing 57 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Suhr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34262820) #53 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. The document is stricken. Filer shall consult the Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application and correct all deficiencies prior to re-filing. (jp)
November 3, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Opposition to Intervention filed by Plaintiff Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. Motion set for hearing on 11/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Opposition to Intervention) (Stephens, Reilly)
November 3, 2022 Filing 55 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re CA Assembly Bill 2098 #35 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Stephens, Reilly)
November 3, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Suhr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34262820) #53 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
November 2, 2022 Filing 53 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Suhr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34262820) filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ISO Pro Hac Vice-Suhr) (Gondeiro, Mariah)
November 1, 2022 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christina Liza Sein counsel for Defendants Michelle Anne Bholat, Ryan Brooks, Randy W. Hawkins, James M. Healzer, Nicole A Jeong, Kristina D. Lawson, Laurie Rose Lubiano, Asif Mahmood, David E. Ryu, Richard E. Thorp, Veling Tsai, Eserick Watkins. Adding Christina Sein Goot as counsel of record for Kristina D. Lawson; Randy W. Hawkins; Laurie Rose Lubiano; Michelle Anne Bholat; David E. Ryu; Ryan Brooks; James M. Healzer; Asif Mahmood; Nicole A Jeong; Richard E. Thorp; Veling Tsai; and Eserick Watkins. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Kristina D. Lawson; Randy W. Hawkins; Laurie Rose Lubiano; Michelle Anne Bholat; David E. Ryu; Ryan Brooks; James M. Healzer; Asif Mahmood; Nicole A Jeong; Richard E. Thorp; Veling Tsai; and Eserick Watkins.. (Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party Michelle Anne Bholat(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party Ryan Brooks(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party Randy W. Hawkins(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party James M. Healzer(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party Nicole A Jeong(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party Kristina D. Lawson(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party Laurie Rose Lubiano(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party Asif Mahmood(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party David E. Ryu(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party Richard E. Thorp(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party Veling Tsai(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Liza Sein added to party Eserick Watkins(pty:dft))(Sein, Christina)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to the Complaint #49 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the court GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS the following: Defendants responses to the Complaint #1 shall be due thirty (30) days after the court issues its ruling on Plaintiffs now-pending Motion for a Preliminary Injunction #35 . (jp)
October 27, 2022 Filing 50 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re CA Assembly Bill 2098 #35 filed by Defendants Michelle Anne Bholat, Robert Bonta, Ryan Brooks, Randy W. Hawkins, James M. Healzer, Nicole A Jeong, Kristina D. Lawson, Laurie Rose Lubiano, Asif Mahmood, David E. Ryu, Richard E. Thorp, Veling Tsai, Eserick Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Nuovo, M.D., #2 Declaration of William Prasifka, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Liska, Kristin)
October 26, 2022 Filing 49 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Michelle Anne Bholat, Robert Bonta, Ryan Brooks, Randy W. Hawkins, James M. Healzer, Nicole A Jeong, Kristina D. Lawson, Laurie Rose Lubiano, Asif Mahmood, David E. Ryu, Richard E. Thorp, Veling Tsai, Eserick Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liska, Kristin)
October 26, 2022 Filing 48 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kristin A. Liska counsel for Defendants Michelle Anne Bholat, Robert Bonta, Ryan Brooks, Randy W. Hawkins, James M. Healzer, Nicole A Jeong, Kristina D. Lawson, Laurie Rose Lubiano, Asif Mahmood, David E. Ryu, Richard E. Thorp, Veling Tsai, Eserick Watkins. Adding Kristin A. Liska as counsel of record for Defendants for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Rob Bonta; Kristina D. Lawson; Randy W. Hawkins; Laurie Rose Lubiano; Michelle Anne Bholat; David E. Ryu; Ryan Brooks; James M. Healzer; Asif Mahmood; Nicole A Jeong; Richard E. Thorp; Veling Tsai; Eserick Watkins. (Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Michelle Anne Bholat(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Robert Bonta(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Ryan Brooks(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Randy W. Hawkins(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party James M. Healzer(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Nicole A Jeong(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Kristina D. Lawson(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Laurie Rose Lubiano(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Asif Mahmood(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party David E. Ryu(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Richard E. Thorp(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Veling Tsai(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin A. Liska added to party Eserick Watkins(pty:dft))(Liska, Kristin)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion to Intervene Rule 24, FRCP; Tenth Amendment; Declaration of Independence; Trety of Paris, Gr. Brit. -U.S., September 3, 1783, 8 Stat. 80; and Compromise of 1850 (An Act for the Admission of the State of California into the Union) #45 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court hereby sets a hearing for this Motion on 11/17/2022 at 10:00 AM. The hearing shall proceed on Zoom. See document for further information. (jp)
October 20, 2022 Filing 44 Text Only ORDER GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Reilly W. Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald #43 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 19, 2022 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Intervenor Emanuel McCray, re MOTION to Intervene #45 served on 10/16/2022. (jp)
October 19, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION to Intervene Rule 24, FRCP; Tenth Amendment; Declaration of Independence; Trety of Paris, Gr. Brit. -U.S., September 3, 1783, 8 Stat. 80; and Compromise of 1850 (An Act for the Admission of the State of California into the Union) filed by Intervenor Emanuel McCray. (jp)
October 19, 2022 Filing 43 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reilly W. Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/17/2022, Receipt No. 34160378) filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gondeiro, Mariah)
October 19, 2022 Filing 42 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reilly W. Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34160378) #39 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (1) The document is stricken. (2) Filer shall consult the Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hae Vice Application and correct all deficiencies prior to re-filing. (jp)
October 18, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reilly W. Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34160378) #39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 10/15/22, Dkt. 16. Other error(s) with document(s): Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 10/15/22, Dkt. 16. (lt)
October 18, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reilly W. Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34160378) #39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an Application not a Noticed Motion. See form caption. Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
October 17, 2022 Filing 39 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 10/19/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #42 ] - EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Reilly W. Stephens to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34160378) filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Gondeiro, Mariah) Modified on 10/19/2022 (jp).
October 11, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Errata #36 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. (2) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) - under Category - Miscellaneous Filings. (3) Errata event utilized in docketing this filing. Counsel shall use the SEARCH function on the CM/ECF toolbar for events if you are unsure of the events to use. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
October 7, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re CA Assembly Bill 2098 #35 Decl McDonald (Tyler, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re CA Assembly Bill 2098 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. Motion set for hearing on 11/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration McDonald ISO PI, #2 Declaration Barke ISO PI) (Tyler, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Errata Civil Case Cover Sheet (Tyler, Robert)
October 5, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Reilly Stephens on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel R. Suhr on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 31 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ryan Brooks. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 30 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Robert Bonta. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 29 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Eserick Watkins. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 28 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Veling Tsai. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 27 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Richard E. Thorp. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 26 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nicole A Jeong. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Asif Mahmood. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant James M. Healzer. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant David E. Ryu. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Michelle Anne Bholat. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Laurie Rose Lubiano. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Randy W. Hawkins. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kristina D. Lawson. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 18 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 5, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
October 4, 2022 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Tyler, Robert)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34094832 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Jeff Barke, Mark McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Robert H. Tyler added to party Jeff Barke(pty:pla), Attorney Robert H. Tyler added to party Mark McDonald(pty:pla))(Tyler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark McDonald et al v. Kristina D. Lawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McDonald
Represented By: Robert H. Tyler
Represented By: Daniel R. Suhr
Represented By: Mariah Gondeiro
Represented By: Reilly W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Barke
Represented By: Robert H. Tyler
Represented By: Daniel R. Suhr
Represented By: Mariah Gondeiro
Represented By: Reilly W. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina D. Lawson
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy W. Hawkins
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Rose Lubiano
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Anne Bholat
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Ryu
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Brooks
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Healzer
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asif Mahmood
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole A Jeong
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E. Thorp
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veling Tsai
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eserick Watkins
Represented By: Christina Sein Goot
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bonta
Represented By: Kristin A. Liska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Emanuel McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ACLU of Northern California
Represented By: Hannah Meredith Kieschnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ACLU of Southern California
Represented By: Hannah Meredith Kieschnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?