Dale Sundby et al v. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dale Sundby and Edith Littlefield Sundby
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company and Does 1-X, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2022cv02005
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Filing 34 OBJECTIONS to REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company #28 , Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form, #33 , Objection #32 OBJECTION to OBJECTION filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale)
December 29, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company #28 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Motion to Dismiss was filed the next day, on 12/29/22 by defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. (bm) Modified on 12/29/2022 (bm).
December 29, 2022 Filing 32 OBJECTIONS filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary)
December 29, 2022 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary)
December 29, 2022 Filing 30 JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale)
December 29, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary)
December 28, 2022 Filing 28 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale)
December 14, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of other firm name or address information Changing Email. Filed by Plaintiffs Edith Littlefield Sundby, Edith Littlefield Sundby. (Sundby, Dale)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES: ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S EX PAZRTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF No. 21] (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John W. Holcomb. For the foregoing reasons, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: To the extent that the Sundbys seek the denial of the underlying Motion, the Sundbys' Application is GRANTED. Fidelity's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss, currently set for January 13, 2023, is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
December 6, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY SUPPLEMENT TO OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 For Failure to Comply with Local Rule 7-3 #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale)
December 6, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to FALSE STATEMENTS in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 For Failure to Comply with Local Rule 7-3 #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale)
December 6, 2022 Filing 23 OBJECTIONS filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary)
December 5, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 For Failure to Comply with Local Rule 7-3 #21 Supplemental Certificate of Service served on December 5, 2022. (Sundby, Dale)
December 5, 2022 Filing 21 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 For Failure to Comply with Local Rule 7-3 filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (Sundby, Dale)
November 29, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, re Notice (Other), #17 served on 11/29/22. (Rousso, Mary)
November 29, 2022 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, re Request for Judicial Notice #15 served on 11/28/22. (Rousso, Mary)
November 29, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 served on 11/28/22. (Rousso, Mary)
November 29, 2022 Filing 17 Notice filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Companys Notice of Corrected Hearing Date for Its Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Filed in Support Thereof; and Request for Judicial Notice Filed in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint (Rousso, Mary)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. The parties are DIRECTED to appear in person in Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 411 W. Fourth Street Santa Ana, CA 92701. IT IS SO ORDERED. (cla)
November 28, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Rousso, Mary)
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/13/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attorney Mary Ann Rousso added to party Fidelity National Title Insurance Company(pty:dft)) (Rousso, Mary)
November 10, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby, upon Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company served on 11/7/2022, answer due 11/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sundby, Dale)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. One or more of the parties to this action has elected to appear pro se; that is, without a lawyer. If you are a party and you are not represented in this case by a lawyer, this Order is addressed to you. You, as well as all individuals appearing before this Court, are not required to retain the services of a lawyer or to obtain the advice of counsel. Individual litigants may represent themselves pro se, but corporations and associations must be represented by counsel. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #8 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (rolm)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (rolm)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Dale Sundby. (lom)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Edith Littlefield Sundby. (lom)
November 4, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
November 1, 2022 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (car)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dale Sundby, Dale Sundby(Trustee), Edith Littlefield Sundby (Trustee ), Edith Littlefield Sundby (car)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Case assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott.(Filing fee $ 402 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Edith Littlefield Sundby (Trustee ), Dale Sundby, Dale Sundby(Trustee), Edith Littlefield Sundby. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale Sundby et al v. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Sundby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Littlefield Sundby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary Ann Rousso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-X, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?