Orange County Coastkeeper v. Certified Auto Salvage et al
Plaintiff: Orange County Coastkeeper
Defendant: CERTIFIED AUTO SALVAGE, CARL P. & MARION B. STEVENS TRUST, Judy Wislocki, Ron Stevens and Carl P. and Marion B. Stevens Trust
Case Number: 8:2022cv02044
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 22 STATEMENT of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Defendants Carl P. and Marion B. Stevens Trust, Ron Stevens, Judy Wislocki (Rosenbaum, Salem)
December 28, 2022 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joshua Todd Rosenbaum counsel for Defendants Carl P. and Marion B. Stevens Trust, Ron Stevens, Judy Wislocki. Adding Joshua Todd Rosenbaum as counsel of record for Ron Stevens, Judy Wislocki, the Carl P. & Marion B. Stevens Trust for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Ron Stevens, Judy Wislocki, the Carl P. & Marion B. Stevens Trust. (Attorney Joshua Todd Rosenbaum added to party Carl P. and Marion B. Stevens Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Todd Rosenbaum added to party Ron Stevens(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Todd Rosenbaum added to party Judy Wislocki(pty:dft))(Rosenbaum, Joshua)
December 28, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Grant Richard Olsson counsel for Defendants Carl P. and Marion B. Stevens Trust, Ron Stevens, Judy Wislocki. Adding Grant Richard Olsson as counsel of record for Ron Stevens, Judy Wislocki, the Carl P. & Marion B. Stevens Trust for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ron Stevens, Judy Wislocki, the Carl P. & Marion B. Stevens Trust. (Attorney Grant Richard Olsson added to party Carl P. and Marion B. Stevens Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Grant Richard Olsson added to party Ron Stevens(pty:dft), Attorney Grant Richard Olsson added to party Judy Wislocki(pty:dft))(Olsson, Grant)
December 28, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Salem W Rosenbaum counsel for Defendants Carl P. and Marion B. Stevens Trust, Ron Stevens, Judy Wislocki. Adding Salem Wayne Rosenbaum as counsel of record for Ron Stevens, Judy Wislocki, the Carl P. & Marion B. Stevens Trust for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ron Stevens, Judy Wislocki, the Carl P. & Marion B. Stevens Trust. (Attorney Salem W Rosenbaum added to party Carl P. and Marion B. Stevens Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Salem W Rosenbaum added to party Ron Stevens(pty:dft), Attorney Salem W Rosenbaum added to party Judy Wislocki(pty:dft))(Rosenbaum, Salem)
December 28, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper, upon Defendant Certified Auto Salvage served on 12/20/2022, answer due 1/10/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Chermak, Douglas)
December 20, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. upon Judy Wislocki waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/19/2022, answer due 2/17/2023. Waiver of Service signed by S. Wayne Rosenbaum. (Chermak, Douglas)
December 20, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. upon Ron Stevens waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/19/2022, answer due 2/17/2023. Waiver of Service signed by S. Wayne Rosenbaum. (Chermak, Douglas)
December 15, 2022 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Ron Stevens. (et)
December 15, 2022 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Judy Wislocki. (et)
December 15, 2022 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #9 as to Defendant Certified Auto Salvage. (et)
December 14, 2022 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chermak, Douglas)
December 14, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chermak, Douglas)
December 14, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Chermak, Douglas)
December 14, 2022 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Certified Auto Salvage amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Letter)(Chermak, Douglas)
November 9, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Carl P. and Marion B. Stevens Trust. (et)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Certified Auto Salvage. (et)
November 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et)
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper, (Davis, Rebecca)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Davis, Rebecca)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Davis, Rebecca)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Davis, Rebecca)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34295893 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Rebecca Leah Davis added to party Orange County Coastkeeper(pty:pla))(Davis, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orange County Coastkeeper v. Certified Auto Salvage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orange County Coastkeeper
Represented By: Rebecca Leah Davis
Represented By: Armita Amanda Ariano
Represented By: Sarah J Spinuzzi
Represented By: Douglas Jonathan Chermak
Represented By: Michael R Lozeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTIFIED AUTO SALVAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARL P. & MARION B. STEVENS TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Wislocki
Represented By: Salem W Rosenbaum
Represented By: Grant Richard Olsson
Represented By: Joshua Todd Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Stevens
Represented By: Salem W Rosenbaum
Represented By: Grant Richard Olsson
Represented By: Joshua Todd Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl P. and Marion B. Stevens Trust
Represented By: Grant Richard Olsson
Represented By: Salem W Rosenbaum
Represented By: Joshua Todd Rosenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?