Marc Weiss v. Hyatt Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Marc Weiss
Defendant: Hyatt Corporation, TK Elevator Corporation, H.E. Phoenix, LLC., Thyssenkrupp System Engineering, Inc. and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Cross Defendant: Thyssenkrup Elevator Corporation
Case Number: 8:2022cv02187
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Filing 22 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant TK Elevator Corporation.(Gaffney, Thomas)
January 19, 2023 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant TK Elevator Corporation.(Attorney Thomas Michael Gaffney added to party TK Elevator Corporation(pty:dft))(Gaffney, Thomas)
January 12, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Missing on title page, caption of Crossclaim parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
January 12, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document, #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Waiver of Service Executed. The correct efiling event will calculate the Answer due date. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
January 11, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants H.E. Phoenix, LLC., Hyatt Corporation, identifying HYATT CORPORATION; H.E. PHOENIX, LLC; THYSSENKRUP ELEVATOR CORPORATION; and TK ELEVATOR CORPORATION. (Childers, Bradley)
January 11, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Lawsuit & Request to Waive Service of Summons filed by Cross Claimants H.E. Phoenix, LLC., Hyatt Corporation re: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, #16 (Attachments: #1 Waiver of the Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Childers, Bradley)
January 11, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , CROSSCLAIM against TK Elevator Corporation, Thyssenkrup Elevator Corporation filed by Defendants Hyatt Corporation, H.E. Phoenix, LLC..(Attorney Bradley P Childers added to party H.E. Phoenix, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley P Childers added to party Hyatt Corporation(pty:dft))(Childers, Bradley)
January 11, 2023 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss, upon Defendant Thyssenkrupp System Engineering, Inc. served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Goldsman, Gene)
January 11, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss, upon Defendant TK Elevator Corporation served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Goldsman, Gene)
January 11, 2023 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss, upon Defendant Hyatt Corporation served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Goldsman, Gene)
January 11, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss, upon Defendant H.E. Phoenix, LLC. served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Goldsman, Gene)
December 16, 2022 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss. (Goldsman, Gene)
December 7, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants H.E. Phoenix, LLC., Hyatt Corporation, TK Elevator Corporation, Thyssenkrupp System Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 H.E. Phoenix, LLC., #2 TK Elevator Corporation, #3 Thyssenkrupp System Engineering, Inc.) (sh)
December 7, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (sh)
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss. (Goldsman, Gene)
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss. (Goldsman, Gene)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss. (Goldsman, Gene)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss. (Goldsman, Gene)
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss. (Goldsman, Gene)
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss, (Goldsman, Gene)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss. (Goldsman, Gene)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34426360 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Marc Weiss. (Attorney Gene J Goldsman added to party Marc Weiss(pty:pla))(Goldsman, Gene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marc Weiss v. Hyatt Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Weiss
Represented By: Gene J Goldsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Corporation
Represented By: Bradley P Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Michael Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.E. Phoenix, LLC.
Represented By: Bradley P Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thyssenkrupp System Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Thyssenkrup Elevator Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?