Technology In Ariscale, LLC v. Razer USA Ltd.
Plaintiff: Technology in Ariscale, LLC
Defendant: Razer USA Ltd. and Razer USA, LTD.
Case Number: 8:2022cv02310
Filed: December 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2023 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Razer USA, LTD. answer now due 2/23/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Razer USA, LTD..(Attorney Christopher Kao added to party Razer USA, LTD.(pty:dft))(Kao, Christopher)
January 5, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Technology in Ariscale, LLC, upon Defendant Razer USA, LTD. served on 1/3/2023, answer due 1/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos "Doe" - Employee in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kasparek, Kyle)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
December 27, 2022 Filing 12 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Technology in Ariscale, LLC. (Kasparek, Kyle)
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
December 27, 2022 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Razer USA, LTD. (lh)
December 27, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 27, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
December 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Technology in Ariscale, LLC, (Kasparek, Kyle)
December 23, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Technology in Ariscale, LLC (Kasparek, Kyle)
December 23, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #3 filed by Plaintiff Technology in Ariscale, LLC. (Kasparek, Kyle)
December 23, 2022 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Technology in Ariscale, LLC. (Kasparek, Kyle)
December 23, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Technology in Ariscale, LLC. (Kasparek, Kyle)
December 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34525937 - Fee: $402, filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Technology in Ariscale, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - US Patent No. 8,139,652, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Razer's Accused Products) (Attorney Kyle C. Kasparek added to party Technology in Ariscale, LLC(pty:pla))(Kasparek, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technology In Ariscale, LLC v. Razer USA Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technology in Ariscale, LLC
Represented By: Kyle C. Kasparek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razer USA Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Razer USA, LTD.
Represented By: Christopher Kao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?