Daniel Riggs et al v. FC US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL RIGGS and REBEKAH RIGGS
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Jon Grays Orange Coast Chrysler Jeep Dodge and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2023cv00099
Filed: January 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher Campbell counsel for Plaintiffs Daniel Riggs, Rebekah Riggs. Adding Christopher Campbell as counsel of record for Daniel Riggs and Rebekah Riggs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiffs Daniel Riggs and Rebekah Riggs. (Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Daniel Riggs(pty:pla), Attorney Christopher Campbell added to party Rebekah Riggs(pty:pla))(Campbell, Christopher)
August 8, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiffs Daniel Riggs, Rebekah Riggs. Adding Elizabeth A. LaRocque as counsel of record for Daniel Riggs et al for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Riggs et al. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Daniel Riggs(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Rebekah Riggs(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 3/21/2024. LAST DATE TO HEAR MOTIONS is 5/20/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/4/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2024 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 7/30/2024 at 8:30 a.m. (rrp)
March 16, 2023 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Riggs, Rebekah Riggs.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
January 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge - DECLINED by Party #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
January 26, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
January 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
January 19, 2023 Filing 11 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vilchez, Katherine)
January 19, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on March 23, 2023. (rrp)
January 18, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
January 18, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 18, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
January 17, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Jon Grays Orange Coast Chrysler Jeep Dodge. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/19/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT N AS ATTACHMENT NO. 15 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ].(et)
January 17, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/19/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT M AS ATTACHMENT NO. 14 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
January 17, 2023 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants FCA US LLC, Jon Grays Orange Coast Chrysler Jeep Dodge., Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Riggs, Rebekah Riggs. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/4/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT H AS ATTACHMENT NO. 9 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
January 17, 2023 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Riggs, Rebekah Riggs pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Solely Defendant Jon Grays Orange Coast Chrysler Jeep Dodge. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 #1 ]. (et)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Katherine Pollard Vilchez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Vilchez, Katherine)
January 17, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
January 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Trina M. Clayton on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
January 17, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC; FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC, FCA HOLDCO B.V.; STELLANTIS N.V. (FORMERLY KNOWN AS FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
January 17, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Clayton, Trina)
January 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022-01273488-cu-bc-cjc Receipt No: ACACDC-34628829 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Atty iso Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Atty Decl iso Removal, #3 Exhibit B to Atty Decl iso Removal, #4 Exhibit C to Atty Decl iso Removal, #5 Exhibit D to Atty Decl iso Removal, #6 Exhibit E to Atty Decl iso Removal, #7 Exhibit F to Atty Decl iso Removal, #8 Exhibit G to Atty Decl iso Removal, #9 Exhibit H to Atty Decl iso Removal, #10 Exhibit I to Atty Decl iso Removal, #11 Exhibit J to Atty Decl iso Removal, #12 Exhibit K to Atty Decl iso Removal, #13 Exhibit L to Atty Decl iso Removal, #14 Exhibit M to Atty Decl iso Removal, #15 Exhibit N to Atty Decl iso Removal, #16 Exhibit O to Atty Decl iso Removal, #17 Exhibit P to Atty Decl iso Removal, #18 Exhibit Q to Atty Decl iso Removal, #19 Exhibit R to Atty Decl iso Removal, #20 Exhibit S to Atty Decl iso Removal, #21 Exhibit T to Atty Decl iso Removal, #22 Exhibit U to Atty Decl iso Removal, #23 Exhibit V to Atty Decl iso Removal, #24 Exhibit W to Atty Decl iso Removal, #25 Exhibit X to Atty Decl iso Removal, #26 Exhibit Y to Atty Decl iso Removal, #27 Exhibit Z to Atty Decl iso Removal, #28 Exhibit AA to Atty Decl iso Removal, #29 Exhibit BB to Atty Decl iso Removal, #30 Exhibit CC to Atty Decl iso Removal, #31 Exhibit DD to Atty Decl iso Removal, #32 Exhibit EE to Atty Decl iso Removal, #33 Exhibit FF to Atty Decl iso Removal, #34 Exhibit GG to Atty Decl iso Removal, #35 Exhibit HH to Atty Decl iso Removal, #36 Exhibit II to Atty Decl iso Removal, #37 Exhibit JJ to Atty Decl iso Removal, #38 Exhibit KK to Atty Decl iso Removal, #39 Exhibit LL to Atty Decl iso Removal, #40 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Trina M. Clayton added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Clayton, Trina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Riggs et al v. FC US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL RIGGS
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Mark Gibson
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Mark William Gibson
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBEKAH RIGGS
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Mark Gibson
Represented By: Mark William Gibson
Represented By: Tionna Grace Dolin
Represented By: Elizabeth A LaRocque
Represented By: Christopher Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Grays Orange Coast Chrysler Jeep Dodge
Represented By: Katherine Pollard Vilchez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Trina M. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?