Gabrielle Aguirre et al v. Capital One Bank USA N.A. et al
Plaintiff: GABRIELLE AGUIRRE, REYNA ALEMAN DE RAMIREZ, JENNIFER ALMEYDA, REBEKAH ANDERSON, JAMES ANDREWS, PHYLLIS ANDREWS, PAUL ANGEL, LAURA AYALA, EDISON BALDEON, KAREN BAUTISTA, MAHNDI BHATNAGER, COREY BUSHELL, EILEEN BOLAND, DIANA BORADZHIEVA RODRIGUEZ, DONICA BELL, CHRISTOPHER CABELL, AMY BURCHETT, DANIEL BRANCH, DANYEIL CANADY, KORTNIE CARTER, JESUS CEJA, KARIN CELOSSE, APOLONIO CORONA, CANDY CORTEZ, Charles Cox, SUSAN COX, BELINDA CROWELL, DUSTIN DAZZI, SABRINA DEARY, ISABEL DECKER, SHAUNTE DERRICK, CRAIG DURHAM, PEARL EDWARDS, SHANNON EDWARDS, KIMBERLY A. EMERSON, JOSANNE ENGLISH, ROSA FELIX, ROBERT FLAIM, KEVIN FONG, SHIRLEY FRENCH, TROVICE FRIERSON, SYLVIA GATES, TIMOTHY GONZALES, LA SHAUNA GRIFFIN, DONALD HAMILTON, KATHLEEN HANLEY, SHARON DENISE HANSEN, WILLIAM HEATON, MATT HILL, MANUEL HOLLY, CHRISTEIN JOHNSON, KEITH JOHNSON, LISA JOHNSON, MERCEDEZ JOHNSON, KEYOMI L. JONES, DOMINIQUE KEETON, KIARA KEETON, SHERRI KING, SHANNYN KING, SR., SIERRA KINNEY, DAVID LAWRENCE, GREGORY LEWIS, MIGUEL LIAS, PHILLIP LOCKHART, TABITHA LOPEZ, CLAUDE MATOS, JOSEPH J. MAZZOLA, MELISSA MCCORMICK, JERRY MCELRATH, ROBERT MELENDEZ, JASON MENDOZA, ANGEK MIRANDA, WILLIE MONROE, FRITZ NAJERA, MELISSA NORRIS, RONALD EUGENE ORTEGA, FU-JEN PAN, FUYUAN PAN, AMARETT PARRA, PATRICIA PEREZ, PHYLLIS PINKARD, STEVEN PRESCOTT, JOYCE PRIMM, STEVEN PRIZAMENT, DENNIS PROVIDO, RONALD RAMOS, ROMAN RANGEL, TIMOTHY REDDISH, RACHEL REVIS, CHRISTIAN REYES, BETTY RICE BELT, DAWN RICHARDSON, RAQUEL RODRIGUEZ, ELVIA SAENZ, BARBARA SANDOVAL, ERNIE SANDOVAL, AARON SCHLITT, KIMBERLY SERRANO, KYLE SMITH, STACY SMITH, DELORES SNELL, ANNE SONDERGAARD, ANTHONY SONDERGAARD, PAULA STEVENS-PIKE, KIMBERLY SUMMERS, RUDY TAURA, ALYCE TYLER, KATHY URBANO, ELOISA VEGA MARTINEZ, RICHARD WANG, DEANNA WARRINER, SHANNON WILDER, KIMBERLY WILLIAMS, NARKELL WILLIAMS, KATHLEEN WISE, BRUCE M. WOODRUFF, LAWRENCE WRIGHT and SIMONE YOUNG
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Does 1 through 100 Inclusive and Capital One Bank USA N.A.
Case Number: 8:2023cv00128
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the court are Defendant's Motion for Immediate Stay, or in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Answer #9 and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 . The court finds these matters appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearings set for March 9, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. are VACATED/OFF CALENDAR and the court takes the matters UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert D. Griest on behalf of Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A. (Griest, Robert)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Text Only ORDER GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Robert D. Griest to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A. #23 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint #21 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, Defendant CAPITAL ONE, N.A., successor-by-merger to Defendant CAPITAL ONE BANKING (USA) N.A., to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 in the above-captioned matter is EXTENDED from 2/27/2023, to fourteen (14) days after the court issues its ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand #12 . (jp)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Virginia for inclusion in the MDL #9 filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. (Haas, Mary)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert D. Griest to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34844635) filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haas, Mary)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 filed by Plaintiff GABRIELLE AGUIRRE. (Wilens, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 14 Days after ruling on Motion to Remand re Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,,,, filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haas, Mary)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPPOSITION In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 With Exhibit A filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. (Haas, Mary)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Virginia for inclusion in the MDL #9 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 Motion Hearings RESET for 3/9/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Virginia for inclusion in the MDL #9 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #12 Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2023 at 10:00 AM **TIME CHANGE ONLY** before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE STAY OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE AN EXTENSION OF THE RESPONSE DATE filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. (Haas, Mary)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Virginia for inclusion in the MDL #9 filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Haas, Mary)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Virginia for inclusion in the MDL #9 filed by Plaintiff GABRIELLE AGUIRRE. (Wilens, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GABRIELLE AGUIRRE, (Wilens, Macy)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case filed by Plaintiff GABRIELLE AGUIRRE #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No notice of interested parties. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff GABRIELLE AGUIRRE. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Wilens, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wilens, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER #10 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. The time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Dkt. 1-1) in the instant matter is EXTENDED to and including February 27, 2023. Initials (lom)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 2/27/2023 re Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,,,, filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haas, Mary)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Virginia for inclusion in the MDL filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Proposed Order) (Haas, Mary)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA N.A., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on January 20, 2023. (Haas, Mary)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (sh)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Capital One Bank USA N.A. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff ERNIE SANDOVAL, KORTNIE CARTER, DANYEIL CANADY, MELISSA MCCORMICK, MAHNDI BHATNAGER, CHRISTIAN REYES, KEITH JOHNSON, FU-JEN PAN, PAUL ANGEL, CHRISTOPHER CABELL, BETTY RICE BELT, FRITZ NAJERA, LISA JOHNSON, ELVIA SAENZ, KEVIN FONG, GREGORY LEWIS, KEYOMI L. JONES, AMY BURCHETT, WILLIE MONROE, TROVICE FRIERSON, DONALD HAMILTON, JOYCE PRIMM, ROMAN RANGEL, STEVEN PRIZAMENT, ROBERT MELENDEZ, FUYUAN PAN, JOSEPH J. MAZZOLA, NARKELL WILLIAMS, KAREN BAUTISTA, KARIN CELOSSE, KATHY URBANO, JERRY MCELRATH, SHANNYN KING, SR., STEVEN PRESCOTT, CRAIG DURHAM, TABITHA LOPEZ, JASON MENDOZA, SHERRI KING, PHYLLIS PINKARD, ANNE SONDERGAARD, KATHLEEN HANLEY, SHANNON EDWARDS, SUSAN COX, RONALD RAMOS, SYLVIA GATES, Does, DUSTIN DAZZI, JOSANNE ENGLISH, LA SHAUNA GRIFFIN, SHIRLEY FRENCH, RONALD EUGENE ORTEGA, MERCEDEZ JOHNSON, SHARON DENISE HANSEN, PHILLIP LOCKHART, KIARA KEETON, ROBERT FLAIM, WILLIAM HEATON, CHRISTEIN JOHNSON, KIMBERLY SERRANO, MATT HILL, REYNA ALEMAN DE RAMIREZ, GABRIELLE AGUIRRE, KIMBERLY SUMMERS, TIMOTHY REDDISH, CLAUDE MATOS, RICHARD WANG, ALYCE TYLER, MELISSA NORRIS, DENNIS PROVIDO, KIMBERLY WILLIAMS, AARON SCHLITT, DONICA BELL, DAWN RICHARDSON, DANIEL BRANCH, ANTHONY SONDERGAARD, BELINDA CROWELL, DOMINIQUE KEETON, DAVID LAWRENCE, PAULA STEVENS-PIKE, TIMOTHY GONZALES, MANUEL HOLLY, DEANNA WARRINER, PEARL EDWARDS, DIANA BORADZHIEVA RODRIGUEZ, RUDY TAURA, AMARETT PARRA, STACY SMITH, KYLE SMITH, ROSA FELIX, RAQUEL RODRIGUEZ, ELOISA VEGA MARTINEZ, SIERRA KINNEY, SABRINA DEARY, COREY BUSHELL, EILEEN BOLAND, PATRICIA PEREZ, BARBARA SANDOVAL, PHYLLIS ANDREWS, MIGUEL LIAS, APOLONIO CORONA, JENNIFER ALMEYDA, ANGEK MIRANDA, SHANNON WILDER, EDISON BALDEON, KIMBERLY A. EMERSON, SHAUNTE DERRICK, Charles Cox, LAURA AYALA, REBEKAH ANDERSON, JESUS CEJA, DELORES SNELL, CANDY CORTEZ, RACHEL REVIS, ISABEL DECKER, JAMES ANDREWS.[FILED IN STATE COURT 12/09/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., (Haas, Mary)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.. (Haas, Mary)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022-01296234-cu-bt-cjc Receipt No: ACACDC-34657800 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Docket, Complaint, Summons, Notice of CMC) (Attorney Mary H. Haas added to party Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.(pty:dft))(Haas, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabrielle Aguirre et al v. Capital One Bank USA N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIELLE AGUIRRE
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REYNA ALEMAN DE RAMIREZ
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER ALMEYDA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBEKAH ANDERSON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ANDREWS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS ANDREWS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL ANGEL
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA AYALA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDISON BALDEON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN BAUTISTA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAHNDI BHATNAGER
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY BUSHELL
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EILEEN BOLAND
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA BORADZHIEVA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONICA BELL
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CABELL
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY BURCHETT
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL BRANCH
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANYEIL CANADY
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KORTNIE CARTER
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESUS CEJA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARIN CELOSSE
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APOLONIO CORONA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANDY CORTEZ
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Cox
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN COX
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELINDA CROWELL
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUSTIN DAZZI
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRINA DEARY
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISABEL DECKER
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAUNTE DERRICK
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG DURHAM
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEARL EDWARDS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON EDWARDS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY A. EMERSON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSANNE ENGLISH
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSA FELIX
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT FLAIM
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN FONG
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY FRENCH
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROVICE FRIERSON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA GATES
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY GONZALES
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA SHAUNA GRIFFIN
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD HAMILTON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN HANLEY
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON DENISE HANSEN
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HEATON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATT HILL
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL HOLLY
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTEIN JOHNSON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH JOHNSON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA JOHNSON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCEDEZ JOHNSON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEYOMI L. JONES
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIQUE KEETON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIARA KEETON
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRI KING
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNYN KING, SR.
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA KINNEY
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID LAWRENCE
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY LEWIS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL LIAS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP LOCKHART
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TABITHA LOPEZ
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDE MATOS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH J. MAZZOLA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA MCCORMICK
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY MCELRATH
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT MELENDEZ
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON MENDOZA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEK MIRANDA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE MONROE
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRITZ NAJERA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA NORRIS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD EUGENE ORTEGA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FU-JEN PAN
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FUYUAN PAN
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMARETT PARRA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA PEREZ
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS PINKARD
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN PRESCOTT
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE PRIMM
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN PRIZAMENT
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS PROVIDO
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD RAMOS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROMAN RANGEL
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY REDDISH
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL REVIS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN REYES
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY RICE BELT
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN RICHARDSON
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAQUEL RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELVIA SAENZ
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA SANDOVAL
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNIE SANDOVAL
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON SCHLITT
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY SERRANO
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE SMITH
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACY SMITH
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELORES SNELL
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE SONDERGAARD
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY SONDERGAARD
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULA STEVENS-PIKE
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY SUMMERS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUDY TAURA
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALYCE TYLER
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY URBANO
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELOISA VEGA MARTINEZ
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD WANG
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA WARRINER
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON WILDER
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY WILLIAMS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NARKELL WILLIAMS
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN WISE
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE M. WOODRUFF
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE WRIGHT
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Represented By: Macy Lauren Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMONE YOUNG
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Wilens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Represented By: Mary H. Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA N.A.
Represented By: Robert D. Griest
Represented By: Mary H. Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?