Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney
Defendant: State of California, Victor Acevedo, Devon Ramos, Daniel Singer, Louis Amaya and David W. Slayton
Case Number: 8:2023cv00479
Filed: March 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #20 . The Anti-Injunction Act thus prohibits the Court from granting Plaintiff her requested relief. Accordingly, Plaintiffs Petition is DENIED. (lc)
May 8, 2023 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney, re 1. VERIFIED COMPLAINT (AMENDED) 2. PROPOSED ORDER ON VERIFIED COMPLAINT (AMENDED) 3. PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL #18 served on 5/8/23. (hr)
May 8, 2023 Filing 20 VERIFIED PETITION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (kh)
May 8, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties for Amended Verified Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney. (kh)
May 8, 2023 Filing 18 VERIFIED COMPLAINT (AMENDED) against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint #1 filed by Plaintiff Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney. (kh)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING AND TAKING MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The Court finds Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re State of California #14 appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for May 10, 2023 is removed from the Court's calendar and no appearance is required. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 1, 2023 Filing 16 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS #14 filed by Plaintiff Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney. (kh)
April 12, 2023 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: A motion has been filed in this case #14 . The parties are required to review Judge Spaeth's procedures page, http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-autumn-d-spaeth, for important procedures regarding motions and mandatory chambers copies. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 12, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant State of California. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sullinger, Shirley)
April 11, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant State of California. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Shirley R Sullinger added to party State of California(pty:dft)) (Sullinger, Shirley)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING SERVICE AND FILING REQUIREMENTS AFTER FILING OF COMPLAINT BY PRO SE PLAINTIFF by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: Plaintiff is responsible for ensuring that service of the summons and complaint complies with the provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4. Within ninety (90) days of filing the complaint, Plaintiff shall file Proof(s) of Service reflecting service upon each defendant. **See Order for details** (kh)
March 28, 2023 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant State of California. (hr)
March 28, 2023 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant David W. Slayton. (hr)
March 28, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Victor Acevedo. (hr)
March 28, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Louis Amaya. (hr)
March 28, 2023 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Daniel Singer. (hr)
March 28, 2023 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Devon Ramos. (hr)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO E-FILE by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting #3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, is reminded that she must comply with the Local Rules, including all rules regarding electronic filing. Plaintiff must also (1) register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five days of being served with the instant order; and (2) if Plaintiff does not already have a PACER account, she must establish one within the same five-day period. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Electronic Filing web page located on the Court's website at http://www.cacd.uscourts. gov/e-filing/pro-se-electronic-filing. (see document for further details) (hr)
March 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh)
March 17, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (lh)
March 16, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney, (lh)
March 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Victor Acevedo, Louis Amaya, Devon Ramos, Daniel Singer, David W. Slayton, State of California Case assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi and referred to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Filing Fee $402 PAID), filed by Plaintiff Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Request, #3 Summons Request, #4 Summons Request, #5 Summons Request, #6 Summons Request, #7 Summons Request) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawanna-Shawntaye Gritney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Shirley R Sullinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Amaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Slayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?