Western Repacking, LLLP et al v. Nutrition Corp., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: western repacking, LLLP and The Thomas Colace Co., Inc.
Defendant: Nutrition Corp., Inc. doing business as Fresh N Lean.com, Nutrition Corp HoldCo, Inc., Thomas J. Asseo and Laureen E. Asseo
Case Number: 8:2023cv00749
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2023 Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva)
June 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Speath to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:23-cv-00749 JVS(DFMx). (rn)
June 20, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Western Repacking, LLLP, upon Defendant Nutrition Corp., Inc. served on 6/7/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon registered agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Cartee, Anthony)
May 24, 2023 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Western Repacking, LLLP, upon Defendant Nutrition Corp HoldCo, Inc. served on 5/5/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ronald Ailing, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Cartee, Anthony)
May 2, 2023 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Thomas J. Asseo. (et)
May 2, 2023 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nutrition Corp HoldCo, Inc. (et)
May 2, 2023 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nutrition Corp., Inc. (et)
May 2, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Laureen E. Asseo. (et)
May 2, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et)
May 1, 2023 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs The Thomas Colace Co., Inc., western repacking, LLLP. (Cartee, Anthony)
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs The Thomas Colace Co., Inc., western repacking, LLLP. (Cartee, Anthony)
May 1, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs The Thomas Colace Co., Inc., western repacking, LLLP. (Cartee, Anthony)
May 1, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs The Thomas Colace Co., Inc., western repacking, LLLP. (Cartee, Anthony)
May 1, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs The Thomas Colace Co., Inc., western repacking, LLLP (Cartee, Anthony)
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs The Thomas Colace Co., Inc., western repacking, LLLP. (Cartee, Anthony)
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35228334 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs western repacking, LLLP, The Thomas Colace Co., Inc.. (Attorney Anthony B Cartee added to party The Thomas Colace Co., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony B Cartee added to party western repacking, LLLP(pty:pla))(Cartee, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Repacking, LLLP et al v. Nutrition Corp., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: western repacking, LLLP
Represented By: Anthony B Cartee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Thomas Colace Co., Inc.
Represented By: Anthony B Cartee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrition Corp., Inc. doing business as Fresh N Lean.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrition Corp HoldCo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Asseo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laureen E. Asseo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?