THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: The Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CONSUMERS COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, ST. PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, The Phoenix Insurance Company, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVCO INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC., SELECTIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, MUTUAL OF ENUMCLAW INSURANCE COMPANY, ENUMCLAW PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY, DAIRYLAND COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS, DAIRYLAND NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY, PATRIOT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PEAK PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN and GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY, KIA AMERICA, INC. and KIA CORPORATION
Case Number: 8:2023cv00792
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2023 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff DAIRYLAND NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC., THE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, CONNECTICUT, MUTUAL OF ENUMCLAW INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVCO INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, ENUMCLAW PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, ST. PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS, PATRIOT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CHARTER OAK FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECTIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PEAK PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, CONSUMERS COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY, SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, upon Defendant KIA AMERICA, INC. served on 6/2/2023, answer due 6/23/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Cary, Timothy)
June 20, 2023 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff DAIRYLAND NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC., THE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, CONNECTICUT, MUTUAL OF ENUMCLAW INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVCO INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, ENUMCLAW PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, ST. PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS, PATRIOT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CHARTER OAK FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECTIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE PHOENIX INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PEAK PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, CONSUMERS COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY, SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, upon Defendant HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA served on 6/2/2023, answer due 6/23/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Inc Service, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service (Cary, Timothy)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 23-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:22-ml-03052 JVS(KESx). Case transferred from Judge David O. Carter to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-00792 JVS(KESx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna (rn)
May 9, 2023 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY. (twdb)
May 9, 2023 Filing 22 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cary, Timothy)
May 9, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #14 . The following error(s) was found: Hyundai Motor Corporation is not a defendant in this case. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb)
May 9, 2023 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant KIA AMERICA, INC. (twdb)
May 9, 2023 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant KIA CORPORATION. (twdb)
May 9, 2023 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA. (twdb)
May 9, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. Notice of Related Cases Pursuant to Local Rule 83-1.3 Related Case(s): 8:22-ml-3052 (Cary, Timothy)
May 9, 2023 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cary, Timothy)
May 9, 2023 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cary, Timothy)
May 9, 2023 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cary, Timothy)
May 9, 2023 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cary, Timothy)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
May 8, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
May 8, 2023 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
May 8, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
May 5, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Interested Parties NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff The Standard Fire Insurance Company, (Cary, Timothy)
May 5, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Cary, Timothy)
May 5, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Cary, Timothy)
May 5, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiff The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Cary, Timothy)
May 5, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by plaintiffs CONSUMERS COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS, DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ENUMCLAW PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC., FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY, MUTUAL OF ENUMCLAW INSURANCE COMPANY, PATRIOT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PEAK PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, SELECTIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, ST. PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, CONNECTICUT, THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVCO INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN. (Cary, Timothy)
May 5, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff CONSUMERS COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS, DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ENUMCLAW PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC., FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY, MUTUAL OF ENUMCLAW INSURANCE COMPANY, PATRIOT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PEAK PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, SELECTIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, ST. PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, CONNECTICUT, THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVCO INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, The Phoenix Insurance Company, The Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN. (Cary, Timothy)
May 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35267093 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff DAIRYLAND NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC., THE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, CONNECTICUT, MUTUAL OF ENUMCLAW INSURANCE COMPANY, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, The Standard Fire Insurance Company, TRAVCO INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST, ENUMCLAW PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA, ST. PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, DAIRYLAND COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS, PATRIOT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, SELECTIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY, The Phoenix Insurance Company, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY, GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PEAK PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, CONSUMERS COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY, SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party CONSUMERS COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party DAIRYLAND COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party DAIRYLAND NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party ENUMCLAW PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party MUTUAL OF ENUMCLAW INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party PATRIOT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party PEAK PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party SELECTIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party ST. PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party THE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, CONNECTICUT(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party TRAVCO INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party TRAVELERS PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party The Phoenix Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party The Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Edward Cary added to party VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN(pty:pla))(Cary, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS COMMERCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSUMERS COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS PERSONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS HOME AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY OF HARTFORD, CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. PAUL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVCO INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST FLORIDIAN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIDELITY AND GUARANTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC.
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELECTIVE AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUTUAL OF ENUMCLAW INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENUMCLAW PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAIRYLAND COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAIRYLAND NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIDDLESEX INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRIOT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEAK PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIKING INSURANCE COMPANY OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Timothy Edward Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?