Heather Campbell v. Chattem, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Heather Campbell
Defendant: Chattem, Inc., Walgreens Health, Does 1 to 100 and Chattem, Inc. dba Gold Bond doing business as Gold Bond
Case Number: 8:2023cv01192
Filed: July 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation [ECF No. 16], and it is hereby APPROVED. The Scheduling Conference currently set for September 8, 2023, is CONTINUED to September 15, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 18, 2023 Filing 16 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 8, 2023 to September 15, 2023 filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Olah, Kelley)
July 26, 2023 Filing 15 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Heather Campbell, (Schneider, Calvin)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 9/8/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
July 17, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc..(Chan, Ryan)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER #10 by Judge John W. Holcomb. For good cause and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Plaintiff's request to dismiss the Breach of Implied Warranty claim against Chattem (Count Three of the Second Cause of Action Products Liability) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Breach of Implied Warranty claim is DISMISSED in its entirety. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
July 10, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Order to Dismiss Count Three of Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chan, Ryan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chattem, Inc. answer now due 7/17/2023, filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc..(Chan, Ryan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge John D. Early to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:23-cv-01192 JWH(DFMx). (rn)
July 10, 2023 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc.. (Chan, Ryan)
July 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
July 7, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc., served on Notice to Adverse party of Removal to Federal Court. (Olah, Kelley)
July 7, 2023 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Heather Campbell.. (Schneider, Calvin)
July 3, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Heather Campbell in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/19/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
July 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi. (Olah, Kelley)
July 3, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc.. (Olah, Kelley)
July 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023-01326373-CU-PL-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-35600932 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Pleadings, #2 Declaration of Kelley S. Olah) (Attorney Kelley S. Olah added to party Chattem, Inc.(pty:dft))(Olah, Kelley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heather Campbell v. Chattem, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Campbell
Represented By: Calvin C Schneider, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Represented By: Kelley S. Olah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc. dba Gold Bond doing business as Gold Bond
Represented By: Ryan Ho Wai Chan
Represented By: Kelley S. Olah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?