Sergio Rodriguez v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sergio Rodriguez
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC., BEST BUY CO., INC. and Does 1-5
Case Number: 8:2023cv01194
Filed: July 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Establish Responsive Pleading Deadlines #18 . Defendants shall have until and including 9/8/23, to file any motion to compel arbitration. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
August 25, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Deadlines filed by Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S.Dodrill, #2 Proposed Order)(Tabura, Richard)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by District Judge David O. Carter GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Dodrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35833752) #15 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 11, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Dodrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35833752) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt)
August 10, 2023 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher Dodrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35833752) filed by Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tabura, Richard)
August 3, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert J. Herrington counsel for Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Adding Robert J. Herrington as counsel of record for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Best Buy Stores, LP., erroneously sued as Best Buy Co., Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Best Buy Stores, LP., erroneously sued as Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Attorney Robert J. Herrington added to party Best Buy Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J. Herrington added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Herrington, Robert)
August 3, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Best Buy Co., Inc. answer now due 9/1/2023; Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer now due 9/1/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc.; Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Attorney Richard R. Tabura added to party Best Buy Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard R. Tabura added to party Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tabura, Richard)
July 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice (Other) #11 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
July 6, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sergio Rodriguez. (Kim, Raymond)
July 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
July 6, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc. (ghap)
July 6, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Samsung Electronics America, Inc. (ghap)
July 6, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
July 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
July 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
July 3, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sergio Rodriguez. (Kim, Raymond)
July 3, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sergio Rodriguez. (Kim, Raymond)
July 3, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sergio Rodriguez. (Kim, Raymond)
July 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35605684 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Sergio Rodriguez. (Attorney Raymond Yoon Ho Kim added to party Sergio Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Kim, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sergio Rodriguez v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Rodriguez
Represented By: Raymond Yoon Ho Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Robert J. Herrington
Represented By: Christopher Dodrill
Represented By: Richard R. Tabura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEST BUY CO., INC.
Represented By: Richard R. Tabura
Represented By: Robert J. Herrington
Represented By: Christopher Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?