Corbin Kosinski v. Dolium et al
Plaintiff: Corbin Kosinski
Defendant: OIA Global Logistics Solutions, OAI Global Logistics SCM, Inc., Oregon International Freight, Dolium, Matthew Panucci, Albert Wauters, Dispack-Projects NV, Quandrant CMS, Northwest Pioneer, Inc., Quadrant CMS, Northwest Pioneer, Inc. doing business as Northwest Pioneering Packaging Erroneously Sued As Pioneer Northwest Erroneously Sued As Pioneering Packaging and Does l-200, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2023cv01506
Filed: August 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Filing 16 OPPOSITION filed by Defendant Northwest Pioneer, Inc.. (Arevalo, Eric)
October 4, 2023 Filing 15 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), Amended Complaint,, filed by PLAINTIFF Corbin Kosinski(Tavera, Leonard)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2023 at 1:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 10/23/23. (ev)
September 19, 2023 Filing 13 [NOTICE OF ERRATA RE] NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #11 filed by Plaintiff Corbin Kosinski. Motion set for hearing on 10/30/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Remand)(Tavera, Leonard) Modified on 9/22/2023 (es).
September 19, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
September 18, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Corbin Kosinski Corbin Kosinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G Motion for Remand) (Tavera, Leonard)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE STIPULATION ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND ORDER THEREON #9 by Judge James V. Selna, Pursuant to the above Stipulation, and good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is given leave to file, and shall file, a Second Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. (es)
September 14, 2023 Filing 9 First STIPULATION to AMEND filed by Defendant Northwest Pioneer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arevalo, Eric)
August 24, 2023 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva)
August 21, 2023 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Northwest Pioneer, Inc. answer now due 9/18/2023, filed by Defendant Northwest Pioneer, Inc..(Arevalo, Eric)
August 18, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
August 18, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
August 14, 2023 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Dispack-Projects NV, Dolium, Northwest Pioneer, Inc., Matthew Panucci, Quadrant CMS, Albert Wauters, Does 1-200, inclusive, Pioneer Northwest, Pioneering Packaging amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Corbin Kosinski. Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 14, 2023 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Dispack-Projects NV, Does 1-200, inclusive, Dolium, Northwest Pioneer, Inc., Matthew Panucci, Quadrant CMS, Albert Wauters, Mitsubishi Plastics, Pioneer Northwest, Pioneering Packaging, OIA Global Logistics Solutions, OIA Global Logistics SCM, Inc., Oregon International Air Freight Co., Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Corbin Kosinski. Filed in State Court on 1/14/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
August 14, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Northwest Pioneer, Inc., (Arevalo, Eric)
August 14, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Northwest Pioneer, Inc.. (Arevalo, Eric)
August 14, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, case number 30-2022-01240832-CU-PL-NJC Receipt No: ACACDC-35853844 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Northwest Pioneer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, #8 Exhibit Ex. H) (Attorney Eric Arevalo added to party Northwest Pioneer, Inc.(pty:dft))(Arevalo, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbin Kosinski v. Dolium et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corbin Kosinski
Represented By: Leonard M Tavera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OIA Global Logistics Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAI Global Logistics SCM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon International Freight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Panucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Wauters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dispack-Projects NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quandrant CMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Pioneer, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Arevalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quadrant CMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Pioneer, Inc. doing business as Northwest Pioneering Packaging Erroneously Sued As Pioneer Northwest Erroneously Sued As Pioneering Packaging
Represented By: Eric Arevalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does l-200, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?