City of Syracuse New York v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: City of Syracuse, New York and City of Syracuse New York
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, Hyundai Motor America, Kia Corporation, Kia America, Inc. and Kia America Inc.
Case Number: 8:2023cv02058
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2023 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gretchen F. Cappio counsel for Plaintiff City of Syracuse New York. Adding Gretchen Freeman Cappio as counsel of record for City of Syracuse, New York for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Attorney Gretchen F. Cappio added to party City of Syracuse New York(pty:pla))(Cappio, Gretchen)
November 7, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan P. McDevitt counsel for Plaintiff City of Syracuse New York. Adding Ryan P. McDevitt as counsel of record for City of Syracuse, New York for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Attorney Ryan P. McDevitt added to party City of Syracuse New York(pty:pla))(McDevitt, Ryan)
November 7, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kylie N. Fisher counsel for Plaintiff City of Syracuse New York. Adding Kylie Fisher as counsel of record for City of Syracuse, New York for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Attorney Kylie N. Fisher added to party City of Syracuse New York(pty:pla))(Fisher, Kylie)
November 7, 2023 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zachary Waid Gussin counsel for Plaintiff City of Syracuse New York. Adding Zachary Gussin as counsel of record for City of Syracuse, New York for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Attorney Zachary Waid Gussin added to party City of Syracuse New York(pty:pla))(Gussin, Zachary)
November 6, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Derek W. Loeser counsel for Plaintiff City of Syracuse New York. Adding Derek W. Loeser as counsel of record for City of Syracuse, New York for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Attorney Derek W. Loeser added to party City of Syracuse New York(pty:pla))(Loeser, Derek)
November 6, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Garrett A. Heilman counsel for Plaintiff City of Syracuse New York. Adding Garrett Heilman as counsel of record for City of Syracuse, New York for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Attorney Garrett A. Heilman added to party City of Syracuse New York(pty:pla))(Heilman, Garrett)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:22-ml-03052-JVS-(KESx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for DISCOVERY. The case number will now read as follows: 8:23-cv-02058-JVS-(KESx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (dta)
November 2, 2023 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kia America Inc.. (sh)
November 2, 2023 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kia Corporation. (sh)
November 2, 2023 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor America. (sh)
November 2, 2023 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Hyundai Motor Company. (sh)
November 2, 2023 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
November 2, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
November 2, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (sh)
November 1, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. Related Case(s): 8:23-cv-00419; 2:23-cv-01750; 8:23-cv-00555; 8:23-cv-00572; 8:23-cv-00736; 8:23-cv-00989; 8:23-cv-01182; 8:23-cv-01919; 8:23-cv-01998; 8:23-cv-01999 (Kawamoto, Dean)
November 1, 2023 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Kawamoto, Dean)
November 1, 2023 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Kawamoto, Dean)
November 1, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Kawamoto, Dean)
November 1, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Kawamoto, Dean)
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Kawamoto, Dean)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36336592 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff City of Syracuse, New York. (Attorney Dean N. Kawamoto added to party City of Syracuse, New York(pty:pla))(Kawamoto, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Syracuse New York v. Hyundai Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Syracuse, New York
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Syracuse New York
Represented By: Dean N. Kawamoto
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Garrett A. Heilman
Represented By: Gretchen F. Cappio
Represented By: Kylie N. Fisher
Represented By: Ryan P. McDevitt
Represented By: Zachary Waid Gussin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?