Watson Music Group, LLC v. Unreale Promotions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Watson Music Group, LLC doing business as Quadrasound Music
Defendant: Unreale Promotions, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2023cv02091
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:23-cv-02091 PA(ADSx). (rn)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Watson Music Group, LLC, upon Defendant Unreale Promotions, Inc. served on 11/14/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ricardo Romero, Accountant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Mandel, Jacqueline)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Unreale Promotions, Inc. (jtil)
November 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
November 7, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Watson Music Group, LLC, identifying SANDERS LAW GROUP, Jacqueline Mandel, Craig Sanders, Unreale Promotions, Inc.. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
November 7, 2023 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Watson Music Group, LLC. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Watson Music Group, LLC. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Watson Music Group, LLC. (Mandel, Jacqueline)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36365745 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Watson Music Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Infringing Uses of Musical Work) (Attorney Jacqueline Mandel added to party Watson Music Group, LLC(pty:pla))(Mandel, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson Music Group, LLC v. Unreale Promotions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watson Music Group, LLC doing business as Quadrasound Music
Represented By: Jacqueline Mandel
Represented By: Craig B Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unreale Promotions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?