Jared Robert Keltner v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Jared Robert Keltner
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 8:2023cv02196
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV23-2196 DFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES (In Chambers) Order Re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . See document for details and deadlines. (es)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) #4 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by PLAINTIFF Jared Robert Keltner. (Panutich, Alex)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jared Robert Keltner. (Panutich, Alex)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jared Robert Keltner, (Panutich, Alex)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jared Robert Keltner. (Panutich, Alex)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Jared Robert Keltner. (Attorney Alex Panutich added to party Jared Robert Keltner(pty:pla))(Panutich, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jared Robert Keltner v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Robert Keltner
Represented By: Alex Panutich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?