Edmund Rhee v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Edmund Rhee
Defendant: United States of America, United States Postal Service, Jeffrey Heater and Does 1-10
Case Number: 8:2023cv02209
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Edmund Rhee, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jamieson, Stephen)
January 19, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA,, #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
January 18, 2024 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edmund Rhee, upon Defendant United States Postal Service served on 12/29/2023, answer due 2/27/2024; United States of America served on 12/29/2023, answer due 2/27/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Estrella Garcia, Deputy Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service re Copies sent to US Attorney and US Attorney General, #2 Return Receipts re Copies sent to US Attorney and US Attorney General)(Jamieson, Stephen)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Edmund Rhee, (Jamieson, Stephen)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Summons Request #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 2. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Jeffrey Heater, United States Postal Service, United States of America. (lh)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Edmund Rhee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiff's Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Jamieson, Stephen)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36466827 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Edmund Rhee. (Attorney Stephen Allen Jamieson added to party Edmund Rhee(pty:pla))(Jamieson, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmund Rhee v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund Rhee
Represented By: Stephen Allen Jamieson
Represented By: Ryan Michael Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Heater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?