Nadia Palafox v. Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Nadia Palafox
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Southern California Permanente Medical Group and Does 1-25, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2024cv00013
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2024 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT on Motion for Transfer of Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings filed by Defendant Southern California Permanente Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Status Update on Motion for Transfer of Actions)(Strauss, Sean)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 03/18/2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 03/08/2024. (eva)
January 17, 2024 Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 5:23-cv-00022-JGB-(KKx) (dve)
January 11, 2024 Filing 11 Notice Notice of Filing of Notice of Related Actions in MDL 3095 filed by Defendant Southern California Permanente Medical Group. of Filing of Notice of Related Actions in MDL 3095 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Notice of Filing of Notice of Related Actions in MDL-3095)(Strauss, Sean)
January 2, 2024 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
January 2, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
January 2, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
January 2, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:24-cv-00013-JVS (ADSx). (et)
January 2, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Southern California Permanente Group, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on January 2, 2024. (Strauss, Sean)
January 2, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Southern California Permanente Group, identifying None. (Strauss, Sean)
January 2, 2024 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Mary Anne Madruga re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Southern California Permanente Group. (Strauss, Sean)
January 2, 2024 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Sean Strauss re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Southern California Permanente Group. (Strauss, Sean)
January 2, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Southern California Permanente Group. (Strauss, Sean)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2023-01353624-CU-WT-WJC Receipt No: ACACDC-36652775 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Southern California Permanente Group. (Attorney Sean T Strauss added to party Southern California Permanente Group(pty:dft))(Strauss, Sean)
January 2, 2024 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Southern California Permanente Medical Group. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
January 2, 2024 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Inc., Does 1-25, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Nadia Palafox. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/3/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 4 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nadia Palafox v. Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Palafox
Represented By: Jack Richard Perko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Permanente Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Permanente Medical Group
Represented By: Sean T Strauss
Represented By: Christian J Rowley
Represented By: Everett J. McLean
Represented By: Galen Paul Sallomi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?