Christopher J. Donabedian v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Donabedian
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust
Case Number: 8:2024cv00319
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on June 13, 2024. (rrp)
April 12, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #25 (Attachments: #1 EX A - Proposed Order)(Morris, Darlene)
April 12, 2024 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #25 filed by Defendants FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 EX 1 - Deed of Trust, #2 EX 2 - Deed of Trust, #3 EX 3 - Loan Modification Agreement, #4 EX 4 - Assignment of Deed of Trust, #5 EX 5 -Substitution of Trustee, #6 EX 6 - Notice of Default, #7 EX 7 - Notice of Trustee Sale, #8 EX 8 - Notice of Rescission)(Morris, Darlene)
April 12, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/13/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Morris, Darlene)
March 14, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of address by Sophia Marie Rios attorney for Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian. Changing attorneys address to 8241 1/2 La Mesa Blvd., La Mesa, CA 91942. Filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian. (Rios, Sophia)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Casey S. Nash APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Sophia M. Rios as local counsel. (twdb)
March 11, 2024 Filing 22 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust answer now due 4/12/2024; Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC answer now due 4/12/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust; Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.(Attorney Darlene Mae Morris added to party FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Darlene Mae Morris added to party Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft))(Morris, Darlene)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Kelly C. Kristi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Sophia M. Rios as local counsel. (twdb)
March 8, 2024 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Casey S. Nash to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37060118) filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rios, Sophia)
March 5, 2024 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kristi C. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37033061) filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rios, Sophia)
February 28, 2024 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian, upon Defendant FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust served on 2/26/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tom Johnson, Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Vaughan, Zachary)
February 28, 2024 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian, upon Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC served on 2/22/2024, answer due 3/14/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Brittany Ball, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Vaughan, Zachary)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Zachary M. Vaughan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Sophia M. Rios as local counsel. (twdb)
February 23, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary M. Vaughan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36964932) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 2/15/24, Dkt. 5. (lt)
February 23, 2024 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Zachary M. Vaughan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36964932) filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rios, Sophia)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #12 REQUEST for Relief for Plaintiff From Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4(2). SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
February 21, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST for Relief from Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4(2) filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sophia M. Rios, #2 Proposed Order) (Rios, Sophia)
February 15, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Casey S. Nash. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kristi C. Kelly. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Zachary M. Vaughan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust) (lh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh)
February 14, 2024 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - FirstKey)(Rios, Sophia)
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian, (Rios, Sophia)
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian. (Rios, Sophia)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36920676 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Christopher J. Donabedian. (Attorney Sophia Marie Rios added to party Christopher J. Donabedian(pty:pla))(Rios, Sophia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher J. Donabedian v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Donabedian
Represented By: Sophia Marie Rios
Represented By: Kristi C. Kelly
Represented By: Zachary M. Vaughan
Represented By: Casey S. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Darlene Mae Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstKey Master Funding 2021-A Collateral Trust
Represented By: Darlene Mae Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?