Orange County District Attorney v. United States Department of State
Petitioner: Orange County District Attorney and United States Department of State
Case Number: 8:2024cv00503
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONTINUING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #14 by Judge James V. Selna, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, and for good cause shown, the Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference herein is CONTINUED to June 24, 2024, at 10:30 AM. Due dates for pre-conference obligations are adjusted to comport with the new conference date above. All other orders remain the same. (es)
April 17, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26 Conference from June 10, 2024 to June 24, 2024 filed by Plaintiff Orange County District Attorney.(Philips, Wayne)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 06/10/2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 06/03/2024. (eva)
April 15, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United States Department of State.(Attorney Jennifer R. Jacobs added to party United States Department of State(pty:dft))(Jacobs, Jennifer)
March 19, 2024 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (eva)
March 13, 2024 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Orange County District Attorney, served on 03/13/2024. (Philips, Wayne)
March 13, 2024 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Orange County District Attorney, upon Defendant United States Department of State served on 3/13/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Certified Mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. WP (Philips, Wayne)
March 12, 2024 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Department of State. (et)
March 12, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
March 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 12, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Orange County District Attorney, identifying N/A. (Philips, Wayne)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Orange County District Attorney. (Philips, Wayne)
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Orange County District Attorney. (Philips, Wayne)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37056667 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Orange County District Attorney. (Attorney Wayne Philips added to party Orange County District Attorney(pty:bkmov))(Philips, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orange County District Attorney v. United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Orange County District Attorney
Represented By: Wayne Philips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?