Jesus Eric Carasco v. E. Martin Estrada et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Eric Carasco
Defendant: E. Martin Estrada and United States
Case Number: 8:2024cv00584
Filed: March 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing fees (Prisoner Non-Habeas Case). Plaintiff now owes the Court the total filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of 95.76 is immediately; the case may be dismissed if that amount is not received by the Court within 30 days. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 26, 2024 Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
March 21, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint - (Discovery) #1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. Other error(s) with document(s): CV 71 Civil Cover sheet missing.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
March 20, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
March 18, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by plaintiff Jesus Eric Carasco. (ghap)
March 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants E. Martin Estrada, United States. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F McCormick., filed by plaintiff Jesus Eric Carasco. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesus Eric Carasco v. E. Martin Estrada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Eric Carasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Martin Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?