Joshua Ross v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Ross
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. doing business as Audi of America, Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Audi Fletcher Jones and Does 1-10 Inclusive
Case Number: 8:2024cv00831
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Approving Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (More than 30 days) #13 . The Stipulation is approved and Defendants ATP Investment Company, LLC d/b/a Audi Fletcher Joness and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.s deadline to each respond to the Complaint is extended from May 22, 2024 to June 21, 2024. (twdb)
May 14, 2024 Filing 13 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 6/21/2024 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Justin)
April 22, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc. answer now due 5/22/2024, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc..(Rodriguez, Justin)
April 22, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez counsel for Defendant Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc.. Adding Justin Jones Rodriguez as counsel of record for ATP Investment Company, LLC d/b/a Audi Fletcher Jones (erroneously sued as Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc.) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ATP Investment Company, LLC d/b/a Audi Fletcher Jones (erroneously sued as Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc.). (Attorney Justin Jones Rodriguez added to party Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rodriguez, Justin)
April 22, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John W. McGuinness counsel for Defendant Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc.. Adding John W. McGuinness as counsel of record for ATP Investment Company, LLC d/b/a Audi Fletcher Jones (erroneously sued as Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc.) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant ATP Investment Company, LLC d/b/a Audi Fletcher Jones (erroneously sued as Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc.). (Attorney John W. McGuinness added to party Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc.(pty:dft))(McGuinness, John)
April 17, 2024 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
April 17, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 17, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
April 16, 2024 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Graham, Jahmy)
April 15, 2024 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Joshua Ross in Orange County Superior Court on 3/11/2024, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
April 15, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Joinder to Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc.. (Rodriguez, Justin)
April 15, 2024 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 4/15/2024. (Graham, Jahmy)
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., identifying Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft. (Graham, Jahmy)
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Graham, Jahmy)
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2024-01384529-CU-NP-CXC Receipt No: BCACDC-37285360 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Removal, #4 Declaration of Jahmy Graham, #5 Exhibit A to Graham Decl., #6 Exhibit B to Graham Decl., #7 Exhibit C to Graham Decl., #8 Exhibit D to Graham Decl.) (Attorney Jahmy Stanford Graham added to party Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Graham, Jahmy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joshua Ross v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Ross
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. doing business as Audi of America
Represented By: Jahmy Stanford Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fletcher Jones Motor Cars, Inc. doing business as Audi Fletcher Jones
Represented By: John W. McGuinness
Represented By: Justin Jones Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?