Nancie Kopesky v. Martin O Malley
Plaintiff: Nancie Kopesky
Defendant: Martin O Malley
Case Number: 8:2024cv01036
Filed: May 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, re Notice of Errata Regarding Inadvertent Filing of a Case #10 , REQUEST for Refund of Fees Paid #8 . It is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff's ability to file the action in the Southern District of California; and ORDERED that the Clerk shall close this matter out and shall process the Form G-124 to refund the pro hac vice fee in the amount of $500.00 to the original form of payment from the Plaintiff; and ORDERED that all other pending motions are denied without prejudice as moot. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (hr)
May 29, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Nancie Kopesky. correcting REQUEST for Refund of Fees Paid #8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Proposed Order)(Ruzin, Irene)
May 28, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Martin O Malley. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Martin O Malley (pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
May 17, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST for Refund of Fees Paid filed by plaintiff Nancie Kopesky. (Ruzin, Irene)
May 14, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kira Trevvus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nancie Kopesky (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37458403) #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document attached to the docket entry. (ak)
May 13, 2024 Filing 6 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kira Trevvus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Nancie Kopesky (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37458403) filed by plaintiff Nancie Kopesky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ruzin, Irene)
May 13, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
May 13, 2024 Filing 4 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by plaintiff Nancie Kopesky. (Ruzin, Irene)
May 13, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nancie Kopesky. (Ruzin, Irene)
May 13, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by plaintiff Nancie Kopesky. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ruzin, Irene)
May 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Nancie Kopesky. (Attorney Irene Ruzin added to party Nancie Kopesky(pty:pla))(Ruzin, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nancie Kopesky v. Martin O Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancie Kopesky
Represented By: Irene Ruzin
Represented By: Kira Treyvus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O Malley
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?