DRH CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC
Debtor: DRH CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC
Us Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee and Tracy Hope Davis
Case Number: 2:2024bk22021
Filed: May 10, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of California
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 Filing 13 Civil Minutes -- Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Status Conference Re: Voluntary Petition - #1 - Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $0.00) (Timothy J. Walsh) (eFilingID: 7351388) (auto)
May 30, 2024 Filing 12 Certificate of Mailing of Order Dismissing Case for Failure to Timely File Documents as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 28, 2024 Filing 11 Bankruptcy Case dismissed. Order Dismissing Case for Failure to Timely File Documents as transmitted to BNC for Service. (ltrf)
May 24, 2024 Filing 10 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Early Scheduling/Case Management Hearing as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 23, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Re Chapter 11 Status Conference and Notice Thereof [CAE-1] as Transmitted to BNC for Service; Status Conference Re: #1 Voluntary Petition Status Conference to be held on 7/1/2024 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (isaf)
May 21, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 6/17/2024 at 09:30 AM via Telephone Conference number provided by the U. S. Trustees Office. Last day to oppose discharge: 8/16/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 9/16/2024. Deadline to file a complaint objecting to discharge is the first date set for hearing on confirmation of the plan. Deadline to file a complaint to determine whether certain debts are dischargeable is 8/16/2024. (Bharat, Shane)
May 16, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
May 14, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as transmitted to BNC for service. (ltrf)
May 10, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (isaf)
May 10, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. Missing Document(s): Master Equity Security Holder Address List; Statement Regarding Ownership of Corporate Debtor; Document(s) due by 5/24/2024. (vcaf)
May 10, 2024 Filing 2 Verification and Master Address List (vcaf)
May 10, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual filed. (Fee Paid $0.00) (Timothy J. Walsh) (eFilingID: 7351388)
May 10, 2024 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Filing Fee Paid: $1,738.00, Receipt Number: 389832, eFilingID: 7351388) (auto)

Search for this case: DRH CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: DRH CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC
Represented By: Timothy J. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: Tracy Hope Davis
Represented By: Jorge A. Gaitan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?