Roberts et al v. UBS AG et al Featured Case

UBS clients sue the bank, alleging that they never "had any intention of evading" their U.S. federal tax obligations, but that UBS and other defendants failed to send them proper instructions and documents for tax filing purposes, "wrongfully took control" of their accounts, "arbitrarily fr[oze] assets," "siphoned money from Plaintiffs as 'compensation' for providing false information" that they weren't being investigated by the U.S. Department of Justice, and that the banks and individual defendants violated Swiss law.

Plaintiff: Anton Ginzburg, Arthur Joel Eisenberg, Jeffrey Chernick, SIMBA, Sean Roberts, Bernhard Gubser, Heidi Gubser and Nadia Roberts
Defendant: Wegelin & Co., Delta Investment Partner AG, NZB Neue Zurcher Bank, Zurcher Kantonalbank, UBS AG, Michel Guignard, Martin Liechti, Raoul Weil, Christian Bovay, Gilbert Benz, Roger Hartmann, Phillip Bigger, Juergen Hirsch, Kenny Pang, Hans Thomann, Marcel Beeler, Gerard Hofmann, Charles Falk, Claude Ullman, Bjorn Mulli, Gian Gisler, Daniel Perron, Beda Singenberger, Sinco Truland AG, Hansruedi Schumacher, Matthias Rickenbach, Rickenbach & Partner, Gilbert Zellweger and The Bank of N.T. Butterfield & Son Limited
Case Number: 1:2012cv00724
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2013 63 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/4/2013. New Case Number: 1:12-cv-00724-SKO. (Fahrney, E)
December 4, 2013 62 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER (Fed. R. Civ. P 16) signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/4/2013. (Initial Disclosures: January 10, 2014, Non Expert Discovery: July 18, 2014, Expert Disclosure: August 22, 2014, Suppl. Expert Disclosures: September 5, 2014, Expert Discovery: October 17, 2014, Mid Discovery Status Report to be filed by April 21, 2014, Mid Discovery Status Conference set for May 6, 2014, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, Non-Dispositive motions to be filed by November 17, 2014 and heard by December 17, 2014, Dispositive motions to be filed by November 17, 2014 and heard by January 7, 2015, Settlement Conference set for September 16, 2014, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, Pretrial Conference set for February 11, 2015, at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, and Jury Trial (5 Days) set for March 17, 2015, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto.) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 3, 2013 61 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Nadia Roberts. (King, William)
December 2, 2013 60 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by UBS AG. (Kitchens, Dean)
November 26, 2013 59 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/26/2013, in chambers and off the record. The Court to issue written order. Plaintiffs' Counsel William King, telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Dean Kitchens, telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: In Chambers. (Timken, A)
November 21, 2013 58 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Nadia Roberts. (King, William)
November 20, 2013 57 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** On November 19, 2013, the parties filed a joint scheduling report. (Doc. 56.) However, the joint scheduling report proposes two schedules, one comprised of Plaintiffs' preferences and one of Defendants' preferences. The parties are ordered to meet and confer to formulate one joint schedule. A revised joint scheduling report shall be filed no later than 12:00 noon on November 21, 2013. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/20/2013. (Timken, A)
November 19, 2013 56 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by UBS AG. (Kitchens, Dean)
October 31, 2013 55 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** (TIME CHANGE ONLY) The Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2013, at 9:45 WILL BE HEARD AT 10:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/31/2013. (Timken, A)
October 25, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/25/2013 dismissing wihout prejudice Defendants, Hansruedi Schumacher and Matthias Rickenbacher for failure to file proofs of service. (Lundstrom, T)
October 2, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiffs to file proofs of service or notices of dismissal for defendants Schumacher and Rickenbacher. ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 11/26/2013. Within ten (10) days of the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall file Proofs of Service or Notices of Dismissal for Defendants Schumacher and Rickenbach. A Scheduling Conference is set for 11/26/2013, at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/2/2013. (Timken, A)
August 5, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER to DISMISS Certain Defendants, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/5/13: This Court DISMISSES without prejudice from this action, Defendants Michel Gunignard, Martin Liechti, Raoul Weil, Christian Bovay, Beda Singenberger, Sinco Truland AG, Rickenbach & Partner, Gilbert Zellweger, The Bank of N.T. Butterfield & Son Limited, Wegelin & Co., Delta Investment Partner AG, NZB Neue Zurcher Bank, and Zurcher Kantonalbank; The Clerk is DIRECTED not to close this action.(Hellings, J)
August 2, 2013 51 REQUEST for Dismissals by Nadia Roberts. (King, William)
July 5, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER Discharging 48 Order to Show Cause, ORDER Requiring Plaintiffs to File Notices of Dismissal For Non-Viable Defendants, & ORDER Requiring Plaintiffs to File Proofs of Service or Notices of Dismissal For Defendants Schumacher and Rickenbacher, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/3/2013. (IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Court's May 28, 2013, Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED; and 2. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall: a. File Notices of Dismissal of the non-viable Defendants; and b. File Proofs of Service or Notices of Dismissal for Defendants Schumacher and Rickenbach.)(Gaumnitz, R)
June 4, 2013 49 MEMORANDUM by Nadia Roberts. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of William J King in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities re OSC Re Dismissal)(King, William)
May 28, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Plaintiffs' case should not be recommended for dismissal for failure to prepare a joint scheduling report and failure to pursue service of defendants. The Scheduling Conference set for May 30, 2013, is VACATED; and by no later than June 4, 2013, Plaintiffs shall SHOW CAUSE as to why their case should not be recommended for dismissal for: failure to meet and confer with UBS and prepare a Joint Scheduling Report; and failure to pursue service of all named Defendants. Plaintiffs shall provide a status of service regarding all named Defendants. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/28/2013. (Timken, A)
May 23, 2013 47 SCHEDULING REPORT by UBS AG. (Kitchens, Dean)
May 2, 2013 46 ANSWER to 33 Amended Complaint by UBS AG.(Kitchens, Dean)
April 11, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER ON DEFENDANT UBS AG'S F.R.Civ.P. 12 MOTION TO DISMISS 38 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 11, 2013. Motion Hearing currently set for 4/17/2013 is VACATED. (Munoz, I)
April 10, 2013 44 REPLY by UBS AG re 38 MOTION to DISMISS. (Kitchens, Dean)
April 3, 2013 43 OPPOSITION by Nadia Roberts to 38 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dec of William King in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to UBS's Motion to Dismiss SAC)(King, William)
March 15, 2013 42 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** Defendant UBS having filed a Motion to Dismiss 38 , the Scheduling Conference currently set for 3/19/2013, is CONTINUED to 5/30/2013, at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties' joint scheduling report shall be filed by no later than 5/23/2013. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/15/2013. (Timken, A)
March 14, 2013 41 SUPPLEMENT by Nadia Roberts re 37 Scheduling Report. (King, William)
March 14, 2013 40 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by UBS AG in re 38 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through X, # 2 Exhibit Y through DD)(Kitchens, Dean)
March 14, 2013 39 DECLARATION of Dean J. Kitchens in SUPPORT OF 38 MOTION to DISMISS. (Kitchens, Dean)
March 14, 2013 38 MOTION to DISMISS by UBS AG. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Kitchens, Dean)
March 12, 2013 37 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Nadia Roberts. (King, William)
March 12, 2013 36 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** To supplement the parties' joint scheduling report, no later than March 14, 2013, Plaintiff shall file a statement regarding the status of service of process on each of the Defendants named in the Second Amended Complaint. Only one executed proof of service has been filed on the docket (Doc. 31). Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/12/2013. (Timken, A)
March 5, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER re Dismissal With Prejudice of Plaintiff's 4th Claim for Relief, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/4/2013. (Marrujo, C)
March 4, 2013 34 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Plts' 4th Claim for Relief in Second Amended Complaint by Nadia Roberts. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(King, William)
February 21, 2013 33 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Nadia Roberts.(King, William)
January 30, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER ON DEFENDANT UBS AG'S F.R.Civ.P 12 MOTION TO DISMISS 26 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 30, 2013. (Munoz, I)
January 30, 2013 31 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Nadia Roberts Waiver sent on 12/13/2012, answer due 2/11/2013. (King, William)
January 29, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER TO VACATE HEARING signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 29, 2013. (Munoz, I)
January 18, 2013 29 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** A Motion to Dismiss 26 having been filed by UBS AG, and currently pending before the Court, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 2/5/2013, is CONTINUED to 3/19/2013, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The Court notes that Plaintiffs have not filed proof of service of the complaint. On or before 2/1/2013, Plaintiffs shall file proof of service or a status report indicating whether Plaintiff intends to continue to prosecute this case as to defendants who no proof of service has been filed. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/18/2013. (Timken, A)
January 14, 2013 28 DECLARATION of Dean J. Kitchens in SUPPORT OF 26 MOTION to DISMISS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kitchens, Dean)
January 14, 2013 27 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by UBS AG in re 26 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through X, # 2 Exhibit Y through DD)(Kitchens, Dean)
January 14, 2013 26 MOTION to DISMISS by UBS AG. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Kitchens, Dean)
December 13, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER TO VACATE HEARING AND TO TERM MOTION 18 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on December 13, 2012. (Munoz, I)
December 13, 2012 24 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by Nadia Roberts.(King, William)
December 11, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER to SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/11/2012. This Court ORDERS plaintiffs, no later than December 13, 2012, to file and serve papers to show good cause why this Court should not dismiss this action. This Court will discharge this order to show cause if plaintiffs, no later than December 13, 2012, file a first amended complaint. (Arellano, S.)
November 26, 2012 22 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** In light of the pending 18 Motion to Dismiss, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/29/2012, is CONTINUED to 2/5/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/26/2012. The parties Joint Scheduling Conference Statement is required and must be electronically filed 7 days prior to the hearing, and shall also be emailed in WordPerfect or Word format to SKOorders@caed.uscourts.gov.(Gaumnitz, R)
November 21, 2012 21 SCHEDULING REPORT by UBS AG. (Kitchens, Dean)
November 19, 2012 20 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant UBS AG re 18 MOTION to DISMISS. (Kitchens, Dean)
November 19, 2012 19 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by UBS AG in re 18 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through X, # 2 Exhibit Y through DD)(Kitchens, Dean)
November 19, 2012 18 MOTION to DISMISS by UBS AG. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Kitchens, Dean)
October 31, 2012 17 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The parties having filed 16 , a Notice of Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, stating that the transfer has been DENIED, the Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2012, will remain as set. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 11/21/2012. The parties shall refer to the new case documents in document 10 for instructions regarding the completion of the joint scheduling statement. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/31/2012. (Timken, A)
October 26, 2012 16 NOTICE of Decision By Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by UBS AG. (Kitchens, Dean)
August 24, 2012 15 STIPULATION re Amended Complaint, Time to Respond, and Waiver of Service by UBS AG. Attorney Eber, Lauren Allyn added. (Eber, Lauren)
August 17, 2012 14 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** In light of Defendant UBS AG's motion pending before the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to transfer related cases for consolidation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/28/2012, is CONTINUED to 11/29/2012, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto; signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/17/2012. (Timken, A)
June 8, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER to Dismiss and Close, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/8/2012. This Court DISMISSES Defendant Charles Falk Only. (Marrujo, C)
June 7, 2012 12 REQUEST for Dismissal of Defendant Charles Falk by Nadia Roberts. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). (King, William)
May 31, 2012 11 NOTICE of Filing with Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by UBS AG. Attorney Kitchens, Dean J. added. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Kitchens, Dean)
May 3, 2012 2 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by Nadia Roberts. Attorney King, William J. added.(King, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. UBS AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wegelin & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Investment Partner AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NZB Neue Zurcher Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurcher Kantonalbank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Represented By: Dean J. Kitchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michel Guignard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Liechti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raoul Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Bovay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Benz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Bigger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juergen Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Pang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans Thomann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcel Beeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Ullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bjorn Mulli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gian Gisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Perron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beda Singenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinco Truland AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansruedi Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthias Rickenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickenbach & Partner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Zellweger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of N.T. Butterfield & Son Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Ginzburg
Represented By: William J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Joel Eisenberg
Represented By: William J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Chernick
Represented By: William J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMBA
Represented By: William J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Roberts
Represented By: William J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernhard Gubser
Represented By: William J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Gubser
Represented By: William J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Roberts
Represented By: William J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?