Firebaugh Canal Co, et al v. USA, et al
Plaintiff: Firebaugh Canal Water District and Central California Irrigation District
Defendant: USA, Department of Interior, Bureau of Reclamation, Gail Norton, Westlands Water District, Panoche Water District, Panoche Drainage District, Broadview Water District and San Luis Water District
Intervenor: Natural Resources Defense Council, Contra Costa County, Contra Costa Water Agency and The Bay Institute
Case Number: 1:1988cv00634
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion for Extension of Partial Stay signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/1/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER Granting Joint Motion For Partial Stay (Doc. 1002 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/26/2015. (Fahrney, E)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER for Supplemental Filing Re Request for Further Extension of Temporary Suspension of Federal Defendants' Drainage Activities within Westlands signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/9/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER Temporarily Suspending Federal Defendants' Drainage Activities within Westlands signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/12/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 959 MEMORANDUM, DECISION and ORDER signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/19/2012 denying 949 , 952 Motions for Attorney Fees. (Lundstrom, T)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 945 FINAL JUDGMENT on claims in Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/16/2012. (Lundstrom, T)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 943 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING 937 Federal Defendants' Motion for Entry of Judgment, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/12/2012. Federal Defendants shall submit a proposed form of judgment consistent with this memorandum decision and addressing any claims on which judgment has not yet been entered within ten (10) days of electronic filing of this order. (Jessen, A)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 934 ORDER Dismissing As Moot Sixth Claim In Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/18/2012. (Fahrney, E)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER re 916 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 09/30/11.
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER Following Hearing Regarding Amendment to Control Schedule signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/1/2011. (Proposed Order Modifying the Scheduling Order due 7/8/2011) (Figueroa, O)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 880 Defendant Westlands Water District's Application For an ORDER Shortening Time to Hear Motion Regarding the December 2009 Scheduling Order and Provision of Drainage Within Westlands, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/16/2011. ( 875 Motion to Shorten Time GRANTED. 876 MOTION Regarding the December 2009 Scheduling Order and Provision of Drainage Within Westlands set for hearing 6/30/2011 at 12:00PM. Any response to be filed by 5:00PM on 6/23/2011. Any reply shall be filed by 5:00PM on 6/27/2011.)(Gaumnitz, R)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 862 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue 831 826 817 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT Hearing currently set for 2/28/2011 to 5/20/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/25/2011. (Kusamura, W)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 859 Federal Defendants' Request For Leave To Exceed Page Limitation and ORDER Thereon. signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/10/2011. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 854 ORDER on Exparte Application to file a combined brief in excess of 25 pages in reply to the three opositions to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Motion and in opposition to the two cross-motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants and defendant-intervenors, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/14/2011. (Kusamura, W)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 845 Request for leave to file combined brief in excess of standing order page limitations and ORDER thereon signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/22/2010. (Figueroa, O)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 844 Federal Defendants' request for leave to exceed page limitation and ORDER Thereon signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/13/2010. (Figueroa, O)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 811 Second Stipulation Re Briefing and Hearing Schedule For Motions For Summary Judgment; ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/27/2010. (Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment to be filed by 10/25/2010, Response and cross motions due 12/10/2010, Reply and oppositions to cross motions due 1/10/2011 Reply to cross motions due 2/9/2011, and Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.) (Gaumnitz, R)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs Central California Irrigation District & Firebaugh Canal Water District's 765 Motion to Supplement The Administrative Record signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/24/2010. (Esteves, C)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 806 MEMORANDUM Decision Re: Plaintiffs' Motion To Supplement The Administrative Record 765 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/17/2010. The motion to supplement the record is GRANTED as to 815 , 826 , 834 , 835 , and 836 , and DENIED as to all other Documents. Plaintiffs shall prepare a form of order consistent with this memorandum decision within five (5) days of electronic service. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER RE: STIPULATION 798 to Continue Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record, Signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/2/2010. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, the hearing on the above motion is continued to 9/13/2010 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm. 3 before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Arellano, S.)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 792 STIPULATION Re Briefing And Hearing Schedule For Motions For Summary Judgment; ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 5/28/2010. ( Hearing set 10/18/2010 is VACATED to be reset for a date that will allow for the briefing schedule which takes effect at the time of resolution of plaintiffs motion for supplementation of the administrative record. ) (Gaumnitz, R)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER Following Scheduling Conference signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/7/2009. Hearing on oral argument on cross-motions for summary judgment set for 10/18/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger.(Bradley, A)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 740 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/22/2009. Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2009 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Sant Agata, S)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 734 SUPPLEMENTAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER,signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/14/2009. (Status Conference set for 6/19/2009 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger) (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firebaugh Canal Co, et al v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firebaugh Canal Water District
Represented By: Paul Ryan Minasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central California Irrigation District
Represented By: Paul Ryan Minasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Yoshinori H. T. Himel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Interior
Represented By: Yoshinori H. T. Himel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Yoshinori H. T. Himel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Norton
Represented By: Yoshinori H. T. Himel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Thomas William Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panoche Water District
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panoche Drainage District
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadview Water District
Represented By: Raymond L. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Luis Water District
Represented By: Raymond L. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Contra Costa County
Represented By: Laurens Herby Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Contra Costa Water Agency
Represented By: Laurens Herby Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: The Bay Institute
Represented By: Hamilton Candee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?