Contreraz v. Adams, et al

Plaintiff: Quetzal Contreraz
Defendant: D. Adams, Darrow Hetebrink and Michael Raymond
Case Number: 1:2004cv06039
Filed: December 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Denying Motion for Return of Fees Paid 96 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/26/13. (Verduzco, M)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Denying 94 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/19/13. (Gonzalez, R)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Dismissing Action, With Prejudice, for Failure to Pay Filing Fee; ORDER for Clerk to Close Case, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/7/13. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Adopting 89 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER Revoking Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status; ORDER Vacating Orders Granting Leave to Proceed In Foma Pauperis and Directing CDCR to Make Payments from Plaintiff's Prison Trust Accoun t re 4 , 5 ; ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Pay $59.97 Balance Owed of Filing Fee in Full Within Fifteen (15) Days or Case Will be Dismissed, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/17/13. Fifteen-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Revoke In Forma Pauperis Status Pursuant to Section 1915(g) and to Require Plaintiff to Pay Balance of Filing Fee Owed within Fifteen Days; Objections, if any, Due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/19/2012. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER for Defendants Adams and Raymond to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/8/12. (Verduzco, M)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ADOPTING 80 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 44 ; ORDER DISMISSING Certain First Amendment Claims from this action, based on Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Remedies; ORDER DISMISSING DEF ENDANT HETEBRINK from this action, based on Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Remedies; ORDER for this Case to Proceed ONLY Against DEFENDANTS RAYMOND and ADAMS on Plaintiff's First Amendment Claims Concerning Inmate Grooming Standards, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/01/2012. Darrow Hetebrink terminated (Martin-Gill, S)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust be Granted 44 , Objections, if Any, Due In Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/21/12. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Discharging 77 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/21/11. (Verduzco, M)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant Raymond Should Not be Dismissed from this Action for Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/17/11. (Verduzco, M)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER VACATING Findings and Recommendations 67 ; ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Opposition 72 Nunc Pro Tunc; ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Opposition 71 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/1/11. Defendants' Reply to Opposition If Any, Due In Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That This Action 32 Be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Obey Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/7/11. Objections, If Any, Due in 30 Days. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Declaration Explaining Reasons for Delay, or in the Alternative, to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/7/11. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER VACATING 44 Motion to Dismiss from Court's Calendar signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/28/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER VACATING 56 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Fourth 55 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/15/2010. (Filing Deadline: 2/18/2011.) (Marrujo, C)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS To Dismiss Case For Failure To Prosecute (Doc. 51 ), Objections, If Any, Due In Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/10/2010. The Court RECOMMENDS that this action be dismissed based on Plaintiff's failure to prosecute this action F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 1/13/2011.(Fahrney, E)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 50 Request for Court Order Directing Prison Officials to Return Plaintiff's Legal Materials; ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss; Forty-Five Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/6/2010. Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 11/23/2010. (Bradley, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreraz v. Adams, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quetzal Contreraz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Adams
Represented By: Matthew W. Kubicek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrow Hetebrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?