Slaughter v. Stokes
Case Number: 1:2005cv00922
Filed: July 18, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting Petitioner's 130 Unopposed Motion for Fourth Extension of Time to file Reply Memorandum; ORDER further modifying Scheduling Order 109 signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/22/2019. Reply due by 4/26/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting Petitioner's unopposed Motion for third extension of time to file reply memorandum 128 . ORDER further modifying Scheduling Order 109 . Signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/17/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER GRANTING 126 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum and ORDER Further Modifying Scheduling Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/18/2018. Reply Memorandum due by 10/28/2018. Motion re Discovery due by 3/1/2019. Opposition due by 5/1/2018. Reply due by 7/1/2019. (Jessen, A)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING 121 Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Third Extension of Time to File Opposition Memorandum and ORDER Further Modifying 109 Scheduling Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/30/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING 119 Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Opposition Memorandum and ORDER Further Modifying Scheduling Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/26/2017. (Jessen, A)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting Respondent's Unopposed 117 Motion for First Extension of Time to File Opposition Memorandum; ORDER Further Modifying 109 Scheduling Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/22/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting Petitioner's Unopposed 114 Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Memorandum Addressing Merits; ORDER Modifying 109 Scheduling Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/29/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting Petitioner's Unopposed 112 Motion for First Extension of Time to File Memorandum Addressing Merits; ORDER Modifying 109 Scheduling Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/15/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER following case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/27/2015. (Hernandez, M)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference for 5/26/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/13/2015. (Hernandez, M)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER STRIKING Unexhausted Allegations From Claims 7 & 19 of Second Amended Petition and ORDER Directing Parties to File Joint Statement Within Sixty (60) Days signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/6/2015. (Jessen, A)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Regarding Unexhausted Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/11/2015. Fourteen (14) day deadline. (Jessen, A)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DISMISSING Claim 47 Only, With Prejudice and ORDER Discharging 98 Order to Show Cause signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/9/2015. (Jessen, A)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER THAT PETITIONER SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIM 47 SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AND THAT PARTIES FILE A JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING EXHAUSTION STATUS OF SECOND AMENDED PETITION signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/22/2014. (Show Cause Response due by 1/6/2015); (Filing Deadline: 2/6/2015).(Lundstrom, T)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Directing Petitioner to File Amended Abstract of Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/29/14. (Verduzco, M)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Holding Claim 47 in Reserve and Setting a Briefing Schedule for All Other Claims in the Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/15/14. (Hellings, J)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING 84 Petitioner's Motion to File Second Amended Petition and ORDER for Petitioner to Show Cause re Claim 47 Within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/31/2014. The hearing set for 8/6/2014 is VACATED. (Jessen, A)
July 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/22/05 ORDERING 1 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED. The Federal Defender, Capital Habeas Unit, is hereby appointed to represent petitioner herein. (cc: Federal Defender's Office) (Carter-Ford, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?