Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. Norton et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv01207
Filed: September 23, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE MOTION TO DISMISS SEVENTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 28, 2020. ECF NO. 1381(Munoz, I)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1394 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Stay Sixth Claim for Relief; And DENYING without Prejudice Motions to Dismiss Sixth Claim 1323 , 1324 , 1381 , 1382 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/21/2020. (Orozco, A)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 STIPULATION and SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 18, 2019. (Munoz, I)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1366 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING PROPOSAL OR PERIODIC STATUS REPORTS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 15, 2019. (Munoz, I)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 ORDER RE STATUS OF REMAINING CLAIMS IN THIS CASE AND REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL FILINGS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 11, 2019. (Munoz, I)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1352 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/18/2019 RELATING 2:19-cv-0547 JAM AC to 1:05-cv-1207 LJO EPG, 1:17-cv-1172 LJO EPG and 1:17-cv-1176 LJO EPG. 2:19-cv-0547 JAM AC is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 ORDER RE STATUS OF REMAINING CLAIMS AND MOTIONS IN THIS CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 10, 2019. (Munoz, I)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1348 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S RULING signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 8, 2019. (ECF NOS. 1336 & 1337)(Munoz, I)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1332 Order DENYING United States' 1289 1291 Motions to Quash the trial subpoenas for Mr. Smith, Maria Rea, and Eric Danner, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/20/2019. (Rosales, O.)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1330 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 19, 2019. (Munoz, I)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1314 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE SECOND AND FOURTH CLAIMS FOR RELIEF signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 26, 2019. (ECF NOS. 1175, 1205, 1206, 1207, 1209, 1210, 1214).(Munoz, I)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 ORDER denying in part and taking under advisement in part United States' Motion to Quash the Subpoena of Mr. Smith and taking under advisement the Motion to Quash the Trial Subpoenas for Maria Rea and Eric Danner, documents 1289 and 1291 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/19/2019. (Rooney, M)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 ORDER GRANTING plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Deadlines (ECF No. 1270 ). The expert discovery deadlines shall be extended as follows: Expert Disclosures due by 11/5/2018; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 12/5/2018; and Expert Discovery cutoff is 1/18/2019. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/17/2018. (Rooney, M)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' application to expedite consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Expert Discovery Deadlines (ECF No. 1270 ), and finding good cause, the Court hereby ORDERS that opposition briefs to the motion are due 10/15/2018, and the motion will be deemed submitted to the Court for decision, without oral argument, on 10/15/2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/11/2018. (Rooney, M)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO SIXTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF AGAINST SACRAMENTO RIVER SETTLEMENT CONTRACTORS AND CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SIXTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF AGAINST FEDERAL DEFENDANTS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 28, 2018. (ECF NOS. 1175, 1207, 1209, 1210). (Munoz, I)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1264 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE PLAINTIFFS' STANDING TO PURSUE THE SIXTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF AGAINST RECLAMATION signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on August 31, 2018. (Munoz, I)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 STIPULATION and SCHEDULE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 25, 2018. (Munoz, I)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 ORDER CONSTRUING AS FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S APRIL 20, 2018 ORDER DENYING THE UNITED STATES' MOTION TO QUASH; ADDRESSING JOINED/INTERVENOR DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS THERETO; AND PERMITTING FORMAL OBJECTIONS BY TUESDAY, MAY 22, 2018 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 18, 2018. (Munoz, I)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Depositions on NMFS Employees, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/14/2018. Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation, the Court hereby ORDERS that, to the extent the Request for Reconsideration is resolved such that the depositions of Maria Rea and Eric Danner will proceed, the depositions may occur after May 30, 2018. (Valdez, E)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 Order DENYING 1153 United States' Motion to Quash; Order GRANTING 1154 Plaintiff NRDC's Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/20/2018. (Rosales, O)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 ***Disregard, Per Clerk's Notice 1197 *** STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 27, 2018. (Munoz, I)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 Stipulation and ORDER to File a Sixth Supplemental Complaint, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/09/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 9, 2018. (Munoz, I)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 REVISED STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER - Expert Disclosures due by 9/28/2018. Fact Discovery cutoff 3/12/2018, Dispositive Motions filed by 1/24/2018, Pretrial Conference currently set for 3/13/2018 is now set for 12/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtr oom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, Bench Trial currently set for 4/10/2018 is now set for 2/5/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/16/2017. (Kusamura, W)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 ORDER re Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant-Intervenor California Farm Bureau Federation signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's 1117 Motion to Substitute Parties, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/10/17. Knights Landing Investors, LLC and Pelger Road 1700, LLC added. Christo D. Bardis and Fred Tenhunfeld terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 Memorandum Decision and Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion to Complete the Administrative Record 1096 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 08/28/17. (Coffman, Lisa)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/17/2017. (Kusamura, W)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 ORDER on Stipulation Regarding Submission of Additional Documents, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/7/17: The parties shall comply with the terms of the stipulation. (Hellings, J)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadlines signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/21/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadlines, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/7/2017. (Motions deadline extended by fourteen days, to and including 6/21/2017.)(Gaumnitz, R)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 18, 2017. (Munoz, I)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 STIPULATION and SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 13, 2017. (Munoz, I)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER (ECF 1027) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on March 21, 2017. (Munoz, I)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 23, 2017. (Docs. 1029, 1030, 1031, 1032, 1036). (Munoz, I)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE A FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 17, 2017. (Munoz, I)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE COMPLAINT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 15, 2017. (Munoz, I)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE COMPLAINT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on January 31, 2017. (Munoz, I)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING DEADLINES signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 10, 2016. (Munoz, I)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS & REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 20, 2016. (Docs. 1029, 1030, 1031, 1032, 1036) (Munoz, I)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on June 3, 2016. (Munoz, I)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER RE FURTHER SCHEDULING signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 24, 2016. (Munoz, I)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 22, 2016. (Doc. 999) (Munoz, I)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 997 ORDER Re Stipulated Dismissal of Plaintiff California Trout ONLY 996 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/29/16: The Clerk is directed to terminate California Trout as a Plaintiff. (Hellings, J)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 995 ORDER Approving Stipulation re Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to File a Fourth Supplemental Complaint and Associated Pleadings, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/25/16. (Gonzalez, R)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 979 ORDER GRANTING 954 Motion to Stay; DENYING AS MOOT 960 & 961 Motion to Bifurcate, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/15/2015. (Kusamura, W)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Responses to Sacramento Rive Settlement Contractors' and Delta-Mendota Canal Contractors' Objections to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice and Evidence; Exhibit 1 977 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 5/28/15: The pleading attached to Plaintiffs' motion as Exhibit 1 is deemed filed as of the date of this order. (Hellings, J)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 964 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Filing Deadlines re 963 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/29/2015. (Martinez, A)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 913 STIPULATION and ORDER to settle attorney's fees and costs, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/1/2011. (Kusamura, W)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 910 Parties Fourth STIPULATION and ORDER re: Motion for Attorneys' Fees signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/16/2010. (Figueroa, O)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 908 Parties Third STIPULATION and ORDER Re: Motion For Attorney's Fees, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/21/2010. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 905 PARTIES' SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 903 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 7/30/2010. (Briefing and argument on Plaintiffs motion for an award of attorneys fees and costs is ordered stayed until 10/28/2010.) (Gaumnitz, R)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re Reasonable and Prudent Alternative Claims (Docs. 230 & 236 ) signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/30/2009. (Jessen, A)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 875 Plaintiffs' And Federal Defendants' STIPULATION And ORDER Extending Deadline For Motion For Attorneys; Fees, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 10/7/2009. (Scrivner, E)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 873 JUDGMENT dated *9/23/2009* signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/23/2009. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that final judgment is entered (1) in favor of Plaintiffs on their first claim for relief; (2) in favor of the Federal Defendants, Defendant-Intervenors, and Joined Parties on Plaintiffs second claim for relief; and (3) in favor of Federal Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors on Plaintiffs third claim for relief. (Jessen, A)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 870 ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 09/01/2009. (Coffman, Lisa)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 862 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER RE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE PROJECT WATER 854 , signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 08/06/2009.
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 835 Memorandum Decision re Reclamation District 108, et al., and Glenn-colusa Irrigation District, et al.s Joint Objection to Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 04/27/09.
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER denying without prejudice 770 Motion for Reconsideration and ordering motion off March 2, 2009 calendar, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 2/12/09.
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER Approving Application to file paper copies of documents in excess of 5 megabytes signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 02/02/2009. (Flores, E)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 769 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 1/14/2009. (Sondheim, M)
September 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NON RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 09/28/05. The court will not relate the current case to case number 88-1658 LKK/GGH. (Brown, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. Norton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?