Hendon v. Baroya et al
Case Number: 1:2005cv01247
Filed: September 30, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER DENYING 239 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration as Untimely signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/11/2020. (Rivera, O)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 232 Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/1/17. (Gonzalez, R)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Denying 222 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/16. (Gonzalez, R)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 177 , 179 and denying as moot Plaintif's Motions in Limine 183 , 187 , 189 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/6/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER VACATING Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/4/16: The January 8, 2016, hearing on the motions for summary judgment and motions in limine is vacated. (Hellings, J)
December 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER DENYING 214 Motion for Copies, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/23/15. (Marrujo, C)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 207 Request for Copies signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER Denying 193 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/20/15. (Gonzalez, R)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Granting Defendants' 196 MOTION for 1-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to to Submit Trial Exhibits, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/7/15. (Gonzalez, R)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment re 192 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/7/15. Telephonic Hearing set for 10/9/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Gonzalez, R)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Denying 150 Plaintiff's Motion for the Attendance of Incarcerated Witness and Further Clarification, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/1/15. (Gonzalez, R)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER re Objections 178 , 181 , 182 to September 25, 2015 Pretrial Statement, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/29/15. (Gonzalez, R)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER Re Motions in Limine, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/24/15: New Hearing Time - 10/23/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Hellings, J)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Setting Trial Date, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/11/15. Jury Trial set for 11/2/2015 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Verduzco, M)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Denying Motion To Reopen Discovery, Without Prejudice (Doc. 161 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/31/2015. (Fahrney, E)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Notice Of Telephonic Status Hearing Before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/23/2015. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/13/2015 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin.)(Fahrney, E)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Denying Amended Motion To Compel (Doc. 156 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/18/2015. (Fahrney, E)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING 152 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/17/2015. (Marrujo, C)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 142 ; ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Griffin From This Action Under Rule 25, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/8/15: The Clerk is DIRECTED to reflect the dismissal of defendant Griffin from the action on the Court's docket. (Hellings, J)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Carlos Hendon, CDCR# J-62763, before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison at U.S. District Court, Courtroom #9, Sacramento, on Thursday, February 12, 2015 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/21/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to Notify Court Whether a Settlement Conference Would be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/1/14: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 125 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docs. 93 , 107 ), signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/22/2014. (Jessen, A)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION RE Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 93 , 107 OBJECTIONS DUE IN THIRTY DAYS, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/26/13: Matter referred to Judge Ishii. (Hellings, J)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motions for Discovery and for Extension of Time 104 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/18/13. (Hellings, J)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING 108 Defendant Pham's Request to File Documents Under Seal; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to File Documents Under Seal 109 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/05/2012. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting Request To File Documents Under Seal (Doc. 94 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/2/2012. (Fahrney, E)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting Leave For Defendant Hoppe To Depose Plaintiff By Video Conference (Doc. 89 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/17/2012. (Fahrney, E)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER COMMENCING DISCOVERY between Plaintiff and Defendant Hoppe, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/26/2012.( Discovery due by 8/1/2012 and Dispositive Motions filed by 10/1/2012) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Denying 71 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/22/12. (Verduzco, M)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER for Plaintiff and Defendant Hoppe to File Status Reports Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/4/11. (Hellings, J)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER for Defendant Hoppe to File Response to 18 Complaint within Twenty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/26/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Permitting Defendants to File Exhibit A to Defendants' 71 Request for Reconsideration by the District Court to Magistrate Judge's Ruling UNDER SEAL signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/22/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 54 Defendants' Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant, DENYING Motion to Require Security and DENYING Motion for Pre-Filing Order; ORDER DECLARING PLAINTIFF to be a Vexatious Litigant Within the Meaning of Section 391(b) of the California Code of Civil Procedure, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/7/2011. (Jessen, A)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 64 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 59 Motion as MOOT; ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion to Strike and Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Opposition Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/15/2010. (Filing Deadline: 1/19/2011.) (Marrujo, C)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING 55 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER Dismissing Defendant Hamilton from this Action Based on Insufficient Information to Effect Service signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/10/2010. Hamilton Terminated from Action. (Flores, E)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 48 Motion to Compel as Untimely signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/8/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 54 (54-2) Motion to receive confidential documents under seal; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk (54-3) to file documents under seal; Defendant shall serve a copy of Exhibit A on the Plaintiff, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/21/2010. (Martin, S)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant Hamilton be DISMISSED from this action, without prejudice re 18 Amended Complaint filed by Carlos Hendon; referred to Judge Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/19/2010. Objections to F&R due by 11/22/2010 (Martin, S)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant Hamilton should not be Dismissed for Failure to Provide Information Sufficient to Effect Service signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/8/2010. Show Cause Response due by 10/12/2010.(Sant Agata, S)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendationis 45 ; ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust 42 , signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/5/2010. (Verduzco, M)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/23/10: Recommending that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust be DENIED 42 ; MOTION to DISMISS referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 8/26/2010. (Hellings, J)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 24 MOTION for EXTENSION TIME to Return Completed Service Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 04/24/2009. (Martin, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendon v. Baroya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?