Bull v. Scribner, et al.

Case Number: 1:2005cv01255
Filed: October 3, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Arthur L. Alarcon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING 101 Motion for Court to Stop Collection of Filing Fee signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/13/2016. (Jessen, A)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants' 57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/19/2012. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2012.(Flores, E)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER-NOTICE and WARNING of Requirements for Opposing Defendants' 57 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/23/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING 66 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond; ORDER GRANTING 68 Motion to Modify Discovery/Scheduling Order; ORDER Extending Deadlines for all Parties to this action, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/30/2012. New Discovery Cut-off: 11/29/2012; New Dispositive Motions Deadline: 01/29/2013 (Martin-Gill, S)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 43 Motion for leave to amend complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/22/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Furnish Further Information for Initiation of Service of Process, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/7/2011. Response Due in Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel 38 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/17/11. (Verduzco, M)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE: FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 30 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/1/10: The Findings and Recommendations are adopted in full; This action proceeds on the First Amended Complaint, filed February 1, 2008, against Defendants Brown and Rivera; The remaining Defendants are DISMISSED. (Hellings, J)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants; Objections Due in Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/21/2010. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 11/29/2010. (Sant Agata, S)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/24/2009, Recommending that this Action re 18 be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief can be Granted. Matter referred to Judge O'Neill. (Objections to F&R due by 10/19/2009) (Figueroa, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bull v. Scribner, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?